CARDONA v. INCH
Plaintiff: ANA M CARDONA
Defendant: Mark Inch
Case Number: 1:2021cv23494
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The Respondent's Response to the #7 Order to Show Cause is now due by January 7, 2022. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman (crn)
November 18, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus re #7 Order to Show Cause by Mark Inch. Responses due by 12/2/2021 (Polin, Richard)
October 6, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard L. Polin on behalf of Mark Inch. Attorney Richard L. Polin added to party Mark Inch(pty:dft). (Polin, Richard)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 28 U.S.C. 2254. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 10/4/2021. See attached document for full details. (daa)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE HABEAS PETITIONERS. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 10/4/2021. See attached document for full details. (daa)
October 1, 2021 Filing 5 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman. (jua)
October 1, 2021 Filing 4 Case transferred in from Florida Northern; Case Number 4:21-cv-00398. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(jua).
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The clerk of court shall forthwith transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida for all further proceedings. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 9/30/2021. (jcw)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se (jcw)
September 27, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (jcw)
September 24, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by ANA M CARDONA. (Filing fee was not paid. No service copies filed.) (jcw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARDONA v. INCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANA M CARDONA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Inch
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Represented By: Richard L. Polin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?