FAISON v. HEATH
Plaintiff: MATTHEW FAISON
Defendant: HARLEN HEATH and WARDEN CALHOUN CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION
Case Number: 1:2021cv23574
Filed: October 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
Presiding Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Filing 10 Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks (bb)
October 12, 2021 Filing 9 Case transferred in from Florida Northern; Case Number 5:21-cv-00175. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(bb).
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER adopting Magistrate Judge's #7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. This case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida. The Clerk shall terminate all pending motions and close the case file in this Court. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 10/12/2021. (mb)
October 5, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #7 Objection to Report and Recommendations (amm)
October 4, 2021 Filing 7 OBJECTION to #6 Report and Recommendations by MATTHEW FAISON. (amm)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER and AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO TRANSFER HABEAS CORPUS PETITION: IT is ordered: The Report and Recommendation entered September 7, 2021, ECF No. #3 , is VACATED. The Clerk of Court is directed to substitute Warden, Calhoun Correctional Institution, as Respondent in this case. Petitioner's Motion, ECF No. #4 , is DENIED. IT is recommended that the case file, including any service copies and pending motions, be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, Miami Division, for all further proceedings. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 9/22/2021. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 10/20/2021. (amm)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER and AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO TRANSFER HABEAS CORPUS PETITION: IT is ordered: The Report and Recommendation entered September 7, 2021, ECF No. #3 , is VACATED. The Clerk of Court is directed to substitute Warden, Calhoun Correctional Institution, as Respondent in this case. Petitioner's Motion, ECF No. #4 , is DENIED. IT is recommended that the case file, including any service copies and pending motions, be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, Miami Division, for all further proceedings. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 9/22/2021. (amm)
September 21, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #4 MOTION to Amend and Supplement Pleadings [sic] Also Response to R&R transferring Habeas Corpus Petition Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (amm)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Amend and Supplement Pleadings [sic] Also Response to R&R transferring Habeas Corpus Petition #3 filed by MATTHEW FAISON (amm)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *VACATED per Order #5 *REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO TRANSFER HABEAS CORPUS PETITION: It is RECOMMENDED that the case file, including any service copies and pending motions, be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, Miami Division, for all further proceedings. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 9/7/2021. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 10/5/2021. (amm) Modified on 9/22/2021 (amm).
September 3, 2021 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se. (kjw)
September 3, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (kjw)
August 31, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by MATTHEW FAISON. (1 service copy provided. No IFP filed and no filing fee paid.) (kjw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FAISON v. HEATH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW FAISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARLEN HEATH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARDEN CALHOUN CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?