Munoz v. Rite Tire of Okeechobee, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Numa Fernando Munoz
Defendant: Rite Tire of Okeechobee, LLC, Manny's Bulk Express, Inc., Synagro South, LLC, Argelio Salazar, Lakeshore Mechanics, Inc., State National Insurance Company, Inc., QEO Group, LLC and QEO Group of Florida, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv23746
Filed: October 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2021 Filing 40 Transmittal Letter Sent with Order Remanding to: Circuit Court for the Eleventh Judicial Circuit in and for Miami-Dade County. State Court Case Number: 16-0211832 CA 05 (Attachments: #1 transmittal letter and Order Remanding) (dj)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Order Remanding Case to State Court, Closing Case. Granting #30 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand filed by Numa Fernando Munoz. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/20/2021. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
December 14, 2021 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to Motion re #30 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand filed by Numa Fernando Munoz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Wolk, William)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion. Responses due by 12/7/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/6/2021. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
December 6, 2021 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re #30 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand filed by QEO Group of Florida, LLC, QEO Group, LLC, State National Insurance Company, Inc.. Attorney Michelle Alexa Juarez added to party QEO Group of Florida, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michelle Alexa Juarez added to party QEO Group, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michelle Alexa Juarez added to party State National Insurance Company, Inc.(pty:dft). Replies due by 12/13/2021. (Juarez, Michelle)
December 6, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE of Mediation Hearing. Mediation Hearing set for 3/11/2022. (Jack, Lewis)
December 6, 2021 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #30 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand by QEO Group of Florida, LLC, QEO Group, LLC, State National Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jordan)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Lewis N. Jack, Jr. Mediation Hearing set for 3/11/2022 10:00 AM. The parties are reminded that a report of the mediation is due within seven (7) days of the mediation conference. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/2/2021. See attached document for full details. (wc)
December 1, 2021 Filing 32 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #31 Order to Show Cause by State National Insurance Company, Inc., QEO Group of Florida, LLC, QEO Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jordan)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Order Referring Case to Mediation; the parties shall submit a proposed order scheduling mediation by 12/1/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/30/2021. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
November 21, 2021 Filing 30 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand by Numa Fernando Munoz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Declaration of Heather Estrada, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 - Rite Tire 2019 Annual Report, #3 Exhibit Rite Tire Motion for Attorney's Fees & Entry of Judgment, #4 Exhibit Rite Tire Return of Service)(Wolk, William)
November 21, 2021 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rite Tire of Okeechobee, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Rite Tire of Okeechobee, LLC for Rite Tire of Okeechobee, LLC (Garnett, Matthew)
November 21, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Stanley Garnett on behalf of Rite Tire of Okeechobee, LLC (Garnett, Matthew)
November 21, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE by Rite Tire of Okeechobee, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), . Attorney Matthew Stanley Garnett added to party Rite Tire of Okeechobee, LLC(pty:dft). (Garnett, Matthew)
November 20, 2021 Filing 26 Second Certificate of Other Affiliates by Numa Fernando Munoz identifying Corporate Parent Rite Tire of Okeechobee, LLC, Corporate Parent Rite Tire of Okeechobee for Numa Fernando Munoz (Eaton, Douglas)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 11/10/2021. See attached document for full details. (mdc)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Setting Trial and Pretrial Schedule, Requiring Mediation, and Referring Certain Matters to Magistrate Judge: Trial set for two-week period beginning 9/26/2022 in Miami Division before Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Calendar Call set for 9/20/2022 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Motions to amend pleadings or join parties due by 1/10/2022. All Discovery due by 5/30/2022. Mediation Deadline 6/6/2022. In Limine Motions due by 7/12/2022. Pre-Trial Motions due by 6/14/2022. Pretrial Stipulation due by 7/12/2022. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Discovery Matters. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/8/2021. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
November 5, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE by State National Insurance Company, Inc. re #3 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines Notice of Filing State Court Records (Part 2 - Final) (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket, #2 Docket No. 918 (Part 1), #3 Docket No. 918 (Part 2), #4 Docket No. 919-920, #5 Docket No. 921 (Part 1), #6 Docket No. 921 (Part 2), #7 Docket No. 922-1020, #8 Docket No. 1021-1031, #9 Docket No. 1032-1043, #10 Docket No. 1044-1091, #11 Docket No. 1092-1210, #12 Docket No. 1211-1309, #13 Docket No. 1310-1346, #14 Docket No. 1347, #15 Docket No. 1348-1352, #16 Docket No. 1353-1372, #17 Docket No. 1373-1419, #18 Docket No. 1420-1421, #19 Docket No. 1422, #20 Docket No. 1424-1435, #21 Docket No. 1436-1456) (Cohen, Jordan)
November 5, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE by State National Insurance Company, Inc. re #3 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines Notice of Filing State Court Records (Part 1) (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket, #2 8-12-2016 through 10-17-2016 (No Docket No. Issued), #3 Docket No. 1-52, #4 Docket No. 53-133, #5 Docket No. 134-209, #6 Docket No. 210-343, #7 Docket No. 344-468, #8 Docket No. 469-496, #9 Docket No. 497-511, #10 Docket No. 512-550, #11 Docket No. 551-588, #12 Docket No. 584-644, #13 Docket No. 645-704, #14 Docket No. 705-775, #15 Docket No. 776-855, #16 Docket No. 856-872, #17 Docket No. 873-885, #18 Docket No. 886, #19 Docket No. 887-916, #20 Docket No. 917) (Cohen, Jordan)
November 5, 2021 Filing 21 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by QEO Group of Florida, LLC, QEO Group, LLC, State National Insurance Company, Inc. (Cohen, Jordan)
November 5, 2021 Filing 20 Defendant's Removal Status Report to #3 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines by State National Insurance Company, Inc.. (Cohen, Jordan)
November 5, 2021 Filing 19 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Numa Fernando Munoz (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eaton, Douglas)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying as moot #17 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file his motion to remand on or before November 21, 2021. Should the motion to remand be denied, the Court will instruct Plaintiff to respond to the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/4/2021. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
November 4, 2021 Filing 17 First MOTION for Extension of Time Respond re #16 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #8 Order,, Set Response/Answer Due Deadline, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Numa Fernando Munoz. Responses due by 11/18/2021 (Eaton, Douglas)
November 2, 2021 Filing 16 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #8 Order,, Set Response/Answer Due Deadline, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by QEO Group of Florida, LLC, QEO Group, LLC, State National Insurance Company, Inc.. Responses due by 11/16/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Cohen, Jordan)
November 2, 2021 Filing 15 Defendant's RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S OCTOBER 29, 2021 ORDER by Manny's Bulk Express, Inc.. (Kessler, Edwina)
October 29, 2021 Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline: Lakeshore Mechanics, Inc. response/answer due 11/2/2021; Manny's Bulk Express, Inc. response/answer due 11/2/2021; QEO Group of Florida, LLC response/answer due 11/2/2021; QEO Group, LLC response/answer due 11/2/2021; Rite Tire of Okeechobee, LLC response/answer due 11/2/2021; State National Insurance Company, Inc. response/answer due 11/2/2021; Synagro South, LLC response/answer due 11/2/2021. (ls)(per DE #'s 12-14)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Defendants are instructed to comply with the instructions contained in the October 29, 2021 Order [ECF No. 8] by Tuesday, November 2, 2021: separate answers or a combined motion. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Defendants are instructed to comply with the instructions contained in the October 29, 2021 Order [ECF No. 8] by Tuesday, November 2, 2021: separate answers or a combined motion. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Defendants are instructed to comply with the instructions contained in the October 29, 2021 Order [ECF No. 8] by Tuesday, November 2, 2021: separate answers or a combined motion. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA)
October 29, 2021 Filing 11 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by QEO Group of Florida, LLC. Attorney Jordan Scott Cohen added to party QEO Group of Florida, LLC(pty:dft). Responses due by 11/12/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Cohen, Jordan)
October 29, 2021 Filing 10 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by QEO Group, LLC. Attorney Jordan Scott Cohen added to party QEO Group, LLC(pty:dft). Responses due by 11/12/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Cohen, Jordan)
October 29, 2021 Filing 9 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by State National Insurance Company, Inc.. Responses due by 11/12/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Cohen, Jordan)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that on or before October 29, 2021, Defendants shall submit a single combined response or separate answers to the removed Fifth Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/29/2021. See attached document for full details. (wc)
October 27, 2021 Filing 7 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Numa Fernando Munoz identifying Other Affiliate Plante Law Group for Numa Fernando Munoz (Eaton, Douglas)
October 27, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Douglas Fredric Eaton on behalf of Numa Fernando Munoz (Eaton, Douglas)
October 27, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Gregg Wolk on behalf of Numa Fernando Munoz. Attorney William Gregg Wolk added to party Numa Fernando Munoz(pty:pla). (Wolk, William)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties due by 11/5/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/25/2021. See attached document for full details. (wc)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. Removal Status Report due by 11/5/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/25/2021. See attached document for full details. (wc)
October 22, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs)
October 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Fifth Amended Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15117601, filed by State National Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Affidavit, #4 State Docket, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cohen, Jordan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munoz v. Rite Tire of Okeechobee, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Numa Fernando Munoz
Represented By: Douglas Fredric Eaton
Represented By: Hector J. Lombana
Represented By: Maria Isabel Hoelle
Represented By: William Gregg Wolk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Tire of Okeechobee, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Stanley Garnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manny's Bulk Express, Inc.
Represented By: Edwina Victoria Kessler
Represented By: Paula C. Kessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synagro South, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Argelio Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeshore Mechanics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State National Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jordan Scott Cohen
Represented By: Michelle Alexa Juarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QEO Group, LLC
Represented By: Jordan Scott Cohen
Represented By: Michelle Alexa Juarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QEO Group of Florida, LLC
Represented By: Jordan Scott Cohen
Represented By: Michelle Alexa Juarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?