GPM INDUSTRIAL, INC. v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES et al
Plaintiff: GPM INDUSTRIAL, INC.
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, TRACY RENAUD and KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II
Consolidated Counter Defendant: Senior Official Performing the Duties of the Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 1:2021cv24007
Filed: November 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. All future filings shall be filed only in GPM Industrial, Inc. v. United States Citizenship & Immigration Services, Case Number 21-civ-24007-MGC. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/22/2021. See attached document for full details. (mee)
December 14, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alessandra Faso on behalf of KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, TRACY RENAUD, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. Attorney Alessandra Faso added to party KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II(pty:dft), Attorney Alessandra Faso added to party TRACY RENAUD(pty:dft), Attorney Alessandra Faso added to party United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft). (Faso, Alessandra)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ENDORSED ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Complaint. Defendants shall file their response to the Complaint on or before February 4, 2022. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/3/2021. (btn)
December 1, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vanessa Molina on behalf of KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, TRACY RENAUD, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. Attorney Vanessa Molina added to party KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II(pty:dft), Attorney Vanessa Molina added to party TRACY RENAUD(pty:dft), Attorney Vanessa Molina added to party United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft). (Molina, Vanessa)
November 29, 2021 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #11 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, by KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, TRACY RENAUD, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Diaz, Natalie)
November 29, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Natalie Diaz on behalf of KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, TRACY RENAUD, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party TRACY RENAUD(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft). (Diaz, Natalie)
November 16, 2021 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Noticing INS Attorney on behalf of TRACY RENAUD, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (jc)
November 15, 2021 Filing 20 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jua)
November 15, 2021 Filing 19 Case transferred in from District of Columbia; Case Number 1:20-cv-01124. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(jua).
November 5, 2021 Cases Consolidated. Case 20cv1127 has been consolidated with case 20cv1124, pursuant to an Order entered 11/05/2021 (zjf)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. Defendants' Motion to Consolidate Cases, Motion to Transfer Case, and Motion for Extension of Time is hereby GRANTED. It is ORDERED that Case No. 1:20-cv-1124 and Case No. 1:20-cv-1127 be CONSOLIDATED and TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida. Defendants' response to the amended complaint in the consolidated action is due within thirty days of the date this case appears on the docket of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida. See Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/05/2021. (lcabj2)
May 20, 2021 Filing 17 REPLY to opposition to motion re #12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Opposed) MOTION to Transfer Case (Opposed) andUnopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond To Amended Complaint Pending Resolution Of Motion filed by TRACY RENAUD, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Simon, Jeremy)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting defendants' #16 motion for extension of time. It is ORDERED that defendants' reply is due by May 21, 2021. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/5/21. (lcabj2)
May 3, 2021 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Consolidate and Transfer by TRACY RENAUD, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy)
April 27, 2021 Filing 15 Memorandum in opposition to re #12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Opposed) MOTION to Transfer Case (Opposed) andUnopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond To Amended Complaint Pending Resolution Of Motion filed by GPM INDUSTRIAL, INC.. (Tetzeli, Helena)
April 27, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Helena M. Tetzeli, I on behalf of GPM INDUSTRIAL, INC. (Tetzeli, Helena)
April 8, 2021 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Opposed) MOTION to Transfer Case (Opposed) andUnopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond To Amended Complaint Pending Resolution Of Motion by GPM INDUSTRIAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pratt, John)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting plaintiff's #13 motion for extension of time. It is ORDERED that plaintiff's response is due by April 27, 2021. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/8/21. (lcabj2)
April 3, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of defendants' pending #12 motion, it is ORDERED that defendants' obligation to respond to the amended complaint is STAYED pending resolution of the motion to consolidate and motion to transfer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/3/21. (lcabj2)
March 30, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Opposed), MOTION to Transfer Case (Opposed) and, Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond To Amended Complaint Pending Resolution Of Motion by TRACY RENAUD, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy)
March 11, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, TRACY RENAUD filed by GPM INDUSTRIAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Pratt, John)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #10 defendants' consent motion for extension of time. It is ORDERED that defendants must answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by March 30, 2021. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/26/21. (lcabj2)
February 25, 2021 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy)
January 30, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #9 defendants' consent motion for extension of time. It is ORDERED that defendants must answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by March 1, 2021. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/30/21. (lcabj2)
January 28, 2021 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #8 defendants' consent motion for extension of time. It is ORDERED that defendants must answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by January 29, 2021. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/28/20. (lcabj2)
October 27, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #7 defendants' consent motion for extension of time. It is ORDERED that defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by October 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/17/20. (DMK)
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of Defendant's #6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint, it is ORDERED that the #6 Motion is GRANTED. Defendants' shall answer or otherwise respond to Complaint by 8/17/2020. SO ORDERED. By Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/9/2020.(jth)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave of Helena Tetzeli to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/9/2020. (zjth) Modified event title on 7/12/2020 (znmw).
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy)
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Helena Tetzeli, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7245249. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GPM INDUSTRIAL, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pratt, John)
June 15, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/1/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/30/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/12/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI served on 5/11/2020; UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 5/11/2020 (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Pratt, John)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued (4) Electronically as to KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmc)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by GPM INDUSTRIAL, INC.. Case related to Case No. 1:20-cv-01127. (Pratt, John)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7075824) filed by GPM INDUSTRIAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)(Pratt, John)
April 30, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GPM INDUSTRIAL, INC. v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GPM INDUSTRIAL, INC.
Represented By: Helena Maria Tetzeli
Represented By: John Patrick Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Natalie Diaz
Represented By: Alessandra Faso
Represented By: Vanessa Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRACY RENAUD
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Natalie Diaz
Represented By: Alessandra Faso
Represented By: Vanessa Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, II
Represented By: Natalie Diaz
Represented By: Alessandra Faso
Represented By: Vanessa Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated counter defendant: Senior Official Performing the Duties of the Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Alessandra Faso
Represented By: Natalie Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?