McNair v. TrueCore Behavioral Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Geneva McNair
Defendant: Javontate Richardson, TrueCore Behavioral Solutions, LLC, Miami-Dade Public School District, Secretary Simone Marstiller, Florida Department of Juvenile Justice, Miami Girls Academy Detention Center, Javonte Deverner Richardson, Javontate Jamarie Richardson, BHSH Holdings, Rashara Z. Smith, State of Florida and Does 1-20
Case Number: 1:2021cv24094
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Miami-Dade Public School District. (Jones, Michele)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michele Lara Jones on behalf of Miami-Dade Public School District. Attorney Michele Lara Jones added to party Miami-Dade Public School District(pty:dft). (Jones, Michele)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #7 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, filed by Geneva McNair. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Return of Service Florida Department of Juvenile Justice, #2 Summon(s) Summons Florida Department of Juvenile Justice, #3 Affidavit Return of Service Simone Marstiller, #4 Summon(s) Summons Simone Marstiller)(Gary, Willie)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Summons Issued as to BHSH Holdings and TrueCore Behavioral Solutions, LLC (jbs)
December 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE by Geneva McNair re 15 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, Summons(es) Notice of Filing Summons for Issuance (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Summons BHSH Holdings, #2 Summon(s) Summons Truecore) (Gary, Willie)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The party(ies) on the summons(es) does not match the initiating documents (jao)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Simone Marstiller, Miami-Dade Public School District, Rashara Z Smith. (jao).
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE by Geneva McNair Notice of Filing Summons for Issuance (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Summons Simone Marstiller, #2 Summon(s) Summons Miami Dade Public School District, #3 Summon(s) Summons Truecore Behavioral Solutions,, #4 Summon(s) Summons BHSH Holdings, #5 Summon(s) Summons Rashara Z. Smith) (Gary, Willie)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 9 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney, into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): BHSH Holdings and Rashara Z Smith. (Gary, Willie)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The party(ies) on the summons(es) does not match the initiating documents. (jao)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Florida Department of Juvenile Justice, Miami Girls Academy Detention Center, Javontate Jamarie Richardson. (jao)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Clerks Notice to Filer re #7 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,. Parties/Mediator Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties from the complaint/petition/removal, etc. or the mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the additional parties/mediator. (jao)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE by Geneva McNair re 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case Notice of Filing Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gary, Willie)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Geneva McNair. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) BHSC Holdings, #2 Summon(s) DJJ, #3 Summon(s) Miami Girls Academy, #4 Summon(s) Richardson, #5 Summon(s) Truecore)(Gary, Willie)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 11/22/2021. (jsi)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Alias Not Added. The Filer failed to add the alias information for the party(ies). The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (jao)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (jao)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Parties Not Added. The Filer failed to add all parties associated with the case. Filer is instructed to add the additional parties by filing a Notice of Entry of Parties. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (jao)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15189582, filed by Geneva McNair.(Gary, Willie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNair v. TrueCore Behavioral Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javontate Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TrueCore Behavioral Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami-Dade Public School District
Represented By: Michele Lara Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Simone Marstiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Department of Juvenile Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami Girls Academy Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javonte Deverner Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javontate Jamarie Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BHSH Holdings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rashara Z. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geneva McNair
Represented By: Willie Edward Gary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?