Conway v. M/Y Utopia IV
Plaintiff: Ronald Conway
Defendant: M/Y Utopia IV, Market America, Inc. and ALM Yacht Management, D.O.O.
Claimant: Utopia Yachting, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv24099
Filed: November 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul C Huck
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2022 Filing 39 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck: Status Conference held on 1/20/2022. Motion held in abeyance: #21 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Arrest Should Not Be Vacated and Request for Hearing. Total time in court: 16 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Tyler Joseph Rauh, Curtis Jay Mase, Jeffrey Adam Neiman, Marcus G. Mahfood. (nsa)
January 18, 2022 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Arrest Should Not Be Vacated and Request for Hearing MOTION to Vacate #6 Order on Emergency Motion with Certification of Emergency, #7 Warrant In Rem Issued filed by M/Y Utopia IV, Utopia Yachting, LLC. (Mahfood, Marcus)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting #36 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR VESSEL TO FILE REPLY MEMORANDUM. Replies due by 1/18/2022. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 1/11/2022. See attached document for full details. (cds)
January 7, 2022 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #35 Response to Motion, by M/Y Utopia IV. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Mahfood, Marcus)
January 4, 2022 Filing 35 RESPONSE to Motion re #21 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Arrest Should Not Be Vacated and Request for Hearing MOTION to Vacate #6 Order on Emergency Motion with Certification of Emergency, #7 Warrant In Rem Issued filed by Ronald Conway. Replies due by 1/11/2022. (Rauh, Tyler)
January 3, 2022 Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ronald Conway. Utopia Yachting, LLC waiver sent on 12/28/2021, response/answer due 2/28/2022. (Rauh, Tyler)
December 29, 2021 Filing 33 Summons Issued as to ALM Yacht Management, D.O.O.. (cds)
December 28, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Ronald Conway re #1 Complaint, filed by Ronald Conway (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons) (Rauh, Tyler)
December 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING AGREED MOTION TO MODIFY SECURITY, granting #28 Agreed MOTION Agreed Motion to Modify Security re #24 Clerks Receipt filed by M/Y Utopia IV. The Court hereby directs the Clerk of Court to return the deposit of $3,000,000 [DE 24] to the Vessel and her owners forthwith. Additional Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) sent to Financial Clerk. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 12/24/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
December 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR VESSEL TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 12/24/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
December 23, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Filing Amended Letter of Undertaking by M/Y Utopia IV re #28 Agreed MOTION Agreed Motion to Modify Security re #24 Clerks Receipt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Amended Letter of Undertaking re DE 28) (Mahfood, Marcus)
December 23, 2021 Filing 28 Agreed MOTION Agreed Motion to Modify Security re #24 Clerks Receipt by M/Y Utopia IV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Letter of Undertaking, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Proposed Order)(Mahfood, Marcus)
December 23, 2021 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #22 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, by M/Y Utopia IV. Attorney Marcus G. Mahfood added to party M/Y Utopia IV(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Ex. A - Proposed Order)(Mahfood, Marcus)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time. Responses due by 1/4/2022. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 12/20/2021. See attached document for full details. (jas)
December 17, 2021 Filing 25 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Owner's Utopia Yachting LLC, on Behalf of Defendant, Motion [ECF No. 21] re #21 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Arrest Should Not Be Vacated and Request for Hearing MOTION to Vacate #6 Order on Emergency Motion with Certification of Emergency, #7 Warrant In Rem Issued by Ronald Conway. Responses due by 1/3/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Rauh, Tyler)
December 15, 2021 Filing 24 Clerks Receipt for Bond received on 12/15/2021 in the amount of $ 3,000,000.00 receipt number FLS100240890. (jcs)
December 13, 2021 Filing 23 Summons Issued as to ALM Yacht Management, D.O.O., M/Y Utopia IV, Market America, Inc. (mee)
December 10, 2021 Filing 22 First AMENDED COMPLAINT Verified In Rem and In Personam Complaint against M/Y Utopia IV, Utopia Yachting, LLC, Market America, Inc., ALM Yacht Management, D.O.O., filed by Ronald Conway. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Summons, #2 Summon(s) Summons, #3 Summon(s) Summons)(Rauh, Tyler)
December 7, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Arrest Should Not Be Vacated and Request for Hearing, MOTION to Vacate #6 Order on Emergency Motion with Certification of Emergency, #7 Warrant In Rem Issued ( Responses due by 12/21/2021) by Utopia Yachting, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bareboat Charter, #2 Exhibit B - Services Agreement)(Mahfood, Marcus)
December 7, 2021 Filing 20 CLAIM Verified Statement of Interest - Claim of Owner by Utopia Yachting, LLC. (Mahfood, Marcus)
December 1, 2021 Filing 19 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #17 ORDER DIRECTING THE RELEASE OF VESSEL. (cds)
December 1, 2021 Filing 18 WARRANT FOR ARREST IN REM Returned Executed as to M/Y Utopia IV, IMO 9851050,MMSI 303455000, 63Meters. (cds)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DIRECTING THE RELEASE OF VESSEL IN ACCORDANCE WITH SUPPLEMENTAL ADMIRALTY RULE E(5) Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 11/23/2021. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
November 23, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Adam Neiman on behalf of M/Y Utopia IV. Attorney Jeffrey Adam Neiman added to party M/Y Utopia IV(pty:dft). (Neiman, Jeffrey)
November 23, 2021 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Bond and Release of Vessel Pursuant to Supplemental Admiralty Rule E(5) by M/Y Utopia IV. Attorney Derick Roberson Vollrath added to party M/Y Utopia IV(pty:dft). Responses due by 12/7/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Vollrath, Derick)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Ronald A. McIntire. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 11/23/2021. (mb01)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Christopher G. Sigmund. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 11/23/2021. (mb01)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Michael A. Barcott. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 11/23/2021. (mb01)
November 22, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Ronald A. McIntire. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15193572 by Ronald Conway. Responses due by 12/6/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Mase, Curtis)
November 22, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Christopher G. Sigmund. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15193554 by Ronald Conway. Responses due by 12/6/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Mase, Curtis)
November 22, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael A. Barcott. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15193476 by Ronald Conway. Responses due by 12/6/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Mase, Curtis)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUBSTITUTE CUSTODIAN, ORDER granting #4 Emergency Motion with Certification of Emergency. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 11/22/2021. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
November 22, 2021 Filing 7 Warrant In Rem Issued as to M/Y Utopia IV. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/22/2021. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing The Issuance of the Warrant of Arrest In Rem,granting #3 Emergency Motion with Certification of Emergency. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 11/22/2021. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
November 22, 2021 Filing 5 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorneys Ronald A. Mcintire, Christopher G. Sigmund and Michael A. Barcott, mailing date November 22, 2021. (cw)
November 22, 2021 Filing 4 EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included for Appointment of Substitute Custodian and to Authorize Movement of Vessel by Ronald Conway. Responses due by 12/6/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Rauh, Tyler)
November 22, 2021 Filing 3 EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included Directing the Clerk to Issue a Warrant of Arrest in Rem by Ronald Conway. Responses due by 12/6/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Warrant for Arrest in Rem)(Rauh, Tyler)
November 22, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
November 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified In Rem Complaint to Enforce Plaintiff's Preferred Maritime Lien against M/Y Utopia IV, Official No. 1305829, MMSI No. 339328000, her engines, tackle, gear, apputenances, etc., in rem. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15191670, filed by Ronald Conway. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rauh, Tyler)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conway v. M/Y Utopia IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Conway
Represented By: Christopher G. Sigmund
Represented By: Michael A. Barcott
Represented By: Ronald A. Mcintire
Represented By: Curtis Jay Mase
Represented By: Tyler Joseph Rauh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/Y Utopia IV
Represented By: Jeffrey Adam Neiman
Represented By: Marcus G. Mahfood
Represented By: Derick Roberson Vollrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Market America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALM Yacht Management, D.O.O.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Utopia Yachting, LLC
Represented By: Marcus G. Mahfood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?