French v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Dawn Michelle French
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America and FMR LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv24274
Filed: December 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2022 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to FMR LLC. (kpe)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America shall not file a response to the Second Amended Complaint until all Defendants have been served. Once all Defendants have been served, Defendants shall submit a single combined response or separate answers within the time allowed for the last-served Defendant to respond. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/21/2022. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time. Joint Scheduling Report due by 2/22/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/21/2022. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
January 20, 2022 Filing 17 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dawn Michelle French (Dabdoub, Edward)
January 20, 2022 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Scheduling Report re #9 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report by Dawn Michelle French. Responses due by 2/3/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dabdoub, Edward)
January 20, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Dawn Michelle French re #14 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal filed by Dawn Michelle French (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Dabdoub, Edward)
January 20, 2022 Filing 14 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DISABILITY BENEFITS against Life Insurance Company of North America, FMR LLC, filed by Dawn Michelle French(Dabdoub, Edward) Modified text on 1/20/2022 to reflect correct filer (bb).
January 19, 2022 Filing 13 Amended Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Life Insurance Company of North America identifying Corporate Parent New York Life Insurance Company for Life Insurance Company of North America (Gerson, Shari)
January 19, 2022 Filing 12 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Life Insurance Company of North America identifying Corporate Parent New York Life Insurance Company for Life Insurance Company of North America (Gerson, Shari)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint; Life Insurance Company of North America. Response/Answer to Amended Complaint due 1/21/2022. The deadline contained in the Order entered on December 21, 2021 [ECF No. #9 ] shall not be extended. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/6/2022. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
January 5, 2022 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal by Life Insurance Company of North America. Attorney Shari Lyn Gerson added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gerson, Shari)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties by 1/20/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/21/2021. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
December 21, 2021 Filing 8 Clerks Notice to Filer re #6 Summons Returned Executed,. Incorrect Service Date Entered; ERROR - The incorrect service date was entered. The correction was made by the Clerk and filing was re-docketed, See DE# 7 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (cds)
December 21, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Dawn Michelle French. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 12/20/2021, response/answer due 1/10/2022.(For Image See DE#6 ) (cds)
December 21, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Dawn Michelle French. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 12/16/2021, response/answer due 1/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Dabdoub, Edward)
December 10, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DISABILITY BENEFITS against Life Insurance Company of North America, filed by Dawn Michelle French.(Dabdoub, Edward)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that the Complaint #1 is DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff has until December 15, 2021 to submit an amended complaint curing the deficiencies. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/8/2021. See attached document for full details. (wc)
December 8, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (pcs)
December 7, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
December 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DISABILITY BENEFITS against Life Insurance Company of North America. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15227477, filed by Dawn Michelle French. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Dabdoub, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: French v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Michelle French
Represented By: Edward Philip Dabdoub
Represented By: Emily Colares Quirino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Shari Lyn Gerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMR LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?