House et al v. University of Miami
Plaintiff: Grant House, Sedona Prince and Tymir Oliver
Defendant: University of Miami
Case Number: 1:2022cv20194
Filed: January 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Melissa Damian
Referring Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2022 Filing 16 REPLY to #15 Response/Reply (Other) [Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Compliance With a Rule 45 Subpoena, or, in the Alternative, to Transfer the Motion], by Grant House, Tymir Oliver, Sedona Prince. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Calvar, Cristina)
February 18, 2022 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, by University of Miami. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Declaration of Jennifer Strawley)(Lines, Matthew)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time.THIS CAUSE is before the Court on Defendant University of Miami's Agreed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond in Opposition to and Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel (the "Agreed Motion"), [ECF No. #13 ], filed January 28, 2022. THE COURT has considered the Agreed Motion and the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the Agreed Motion [ECF No. #13 ] is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED and ADJUDGED that Defendant, University of Miami, shall file a response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Compliance with a Rule 45 Subpoena, or, in the Alternative, to Transfer the Motion (the "Motion to Compel") [ECF No. #1 ] no later than Friday, February 18, 2022. Plaintiffs shall have fourteen (14) days from the filing date of Defendant's response to file a reply in support of their Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian on 1/31/2022. (mfo)
January 28, 2022 Filing 13 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond in Opposition to and Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel re #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, by University of Miami. Attorney Matthew Lee Lines added to party University of Miami(pty:dft). Responses due by 2/11/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lines, Matthew)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF RECUSAL AND ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 1/20/2022. See attached document for full details. (vjk)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants #5 and #6 counsel's motions to appear pro hac vice. Attorneys Jeanifer E. Parsigian and Adam I. Dale, both of the law firm of Winston & Strawn, LLP, are given permission to appear and participate in this matter on behalf of the Plaintiff-Petitioners in this case. The Clerk is directed to provide these attorneys with notification of all electronic filings via the email addresses set forth in the motions. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr (kbe)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING DE #1 MOTION to United States Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for either an order or a report and recommendations, consistent with 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1 of the Local Magistrate Judge Rules. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 1/19/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes)
January 19, 2022 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance re 7 Order. Case converted to civil case. (pes)
January 18, 2022 Filing 8 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Grant House, Tymir Oliver, Sedona Prince (Calvar, Cristina)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER: Because this is a contested proceeding, the Court directs the Clerk of Court to redesignate this matter as a civil case. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (kbe)
January 18, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Adam I. Dale. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15324462 by Grant House, Tymir Oliver, Sedona Prince. Responses due by 2/1/2022 (Calvar, Cristina)
January 18, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jeanifer E. Parsigian. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15324421 by Grant House, Tymir Oliver, Sedona Prince. Responses due by 2/1/2022 (Calvar, Cristina)
January 18, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Grant House, Tymir Oliver, Sedona Prince (Calvar, Cristina)
January 18, 2022 Filing 3 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorneys Adam I. Dale and Jeanifer E. Parsigian, mailing date January 18, 2022. (cw)
January 14, 2022 Filing 2 Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (mab)
January 14, 2022 Filing 1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena to Enforce from Another District (Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Compliance with Rule 45 Subpoena, or, in the Alternative, to Transfer the Motion). Filing fee $49.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15320355, filed by Grant House, Tymir Oliver, Sedona Prince. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Calvar, Cristina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: House et al v. University of Miami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grant House
Represented By: Adam I. Dale
Represented By: Jeanifer E. Parsigian
Represented By: Cristina Isabel Calvar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sedona Prince
Represented By: Adam I. Dale
Represented By: Jeanifer E. Parsigian
Represented By: Cristina Isabel Calvar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tymir Oliver
Represented By: Adam I. Dale
Represented By: Jeanifer E. Parsigian
Represented By: Cristina Isabel Calvar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Miami
Represented By: Matthew Lee Lines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?