Geller et al v. White
Plaintiff: Joseph S. Geller, Christopher Benjamin, Kevin D. Chambliss, Michael C Grieco, Felicia S. Robinson, Robert Dempster, Maria Elena Lopez and Florida Democratic Party
Defendant: Christina White
Case Number: 1:2022cv20508
Filed: February 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2022 Filing 17 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT as to a Certified Copy of #15 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court. (caw)
March 18, 2022 Filing 16 Transmittal Letter Sent with Certified Copy of Order of Remand to: 11th Judicial Court - Miami-Dade County, FL. State Court Case Number: 22-001393-CA-01. (caw)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Agreed MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Kevin D. Chambliss, Florida Democratic Party, Joseph S. Geller, Christopher Benjamin, Maria Elena Lopez, Robert Dempster, Michael C Grieco, Felicia S. Robinson. This matter is remanded to the Circuit Court of the Eleventh Judicial Circuit of Florida, in and for Miami-Dade County (previously docketed as Circuit Case No. 2022-001393-CA-01 (24)). Closing Case. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/17/2022. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
March 17, 2022 Filing 14 Agreed MOTION to Remand to State Court by Christopher Benjamin, Kevin D. Chambliss, Robert Dempster, Florida Democratic Party, Joseph S. Geller, Michael C Grieco, Maria Elena Lopez, Felicia S. Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order on Joint Motion to Remand)(Kuehne, Benedict)
March 17, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE by Christopher Benjamin, Kevin D. Chambliss, Robert Dempster, Florida Democratic Party, Joseph S. Geller, Michael C Grieco, Maria Elena Lopez, Felicia S. Robinson re #12 Order on Motion to Continue, of Filing Amended State Court Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended State Court Complaint) (Kuehne, Benedict)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Joint Motion to Reschedule Status Conference to Allow Additional Time for Parties to Confer. Status Conference rescheduled to 3/18/2022 12:30 PM in Miami Division before Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/8/2022. See attached document for full details. (wc)
March 7, 2022 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Continue Status Conference To Enable Parties to Further Meet and Confer re 10 Notice re Hearing, #9 Order Setting Status Conference, by Christopher Benjamin, Kevin D. Chambliss, Robert Dempster, Florida Democratic Party, Joseph S. Geller, Michael C Grieco. Responses due by 3/21/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order on Joint Motion to Reschedule Status Conference)(Kuehne, Benedict)
February 28, 2022 Filing 10 PAPERLESS NOTICE resetting Hearing: **TIME CHANGE ONLY** Status Conference reset for 3/8/2022 04:30 PM in Miami Division before Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Prior to your courthouse visit, please # click here to view our COVID-19 Rules and Procedures. (ps1)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Status Conference: Status Conference set for 3/8/2022 12:30 PM in Miami Division before Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. The Order Requiring a Removal Status Report [ECF No. #5 ] and the Order Requiring Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties [ECF No.[ 6]] are set SET ASIDE. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 2/22/2022. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
February 22, 2022 Filing 8 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Status Conference held on 2/22/2022. Total time in court: 10 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Benedict P. Kuehne, Marc A Burton, Richard Jay Burton, Oren Rosenthal, Michael Beny Valdes, Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, 305-523-5518 / Stephanie_McCarn@flsd.uscourts.gov. (pn00)
February 18, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Beny Valdes on behalf of Christina White. Attorney Michael Beny Valdes added to party Christina White(pty:dft). (Valdes, Michael)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties by 3/7/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 2/18/2022. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Requiring a Removal Status Report by 3/7/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 2/18/2022. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
February 18, 2022 Filing 4 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference, re: Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed in State Court, set for 2/22/2022 08:00 AM in Miami Division before Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. The parties are to appear in person for this hearing. 30 minutes has been set aside for the status conference. Prior to your courthouse visit, please # click here to view our COVID-19 Rules and Procedures. (ps1)
February 18, 2022 Filing 3 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Carl Christian Sautter, mailing date February 18, 2022. (cw)
February 18, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
February 18, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Verified Complaint for Issuance of Writ of Mandamus, Injunction, and Declaratory Judgment) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15412385, filed by Christina White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Motion for Temporary Injunction, #3 Exhibit Motion for Pro Hac Vice, #4 Exhibit Notice of Filing - Volume 1, #5 Exhibit Notice of Filing - Volume 2, #6 Exhibit Notice of Filing - Volume 3, #7 Exhibit Notice of Filing - Volume 4, #8 Exhibit Notice of Filing - Volume 5, #9 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Request for Production, #10 Exhibit Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories, #11 Exhibit Plaintiff's Request for Admissions, #12 Exhibit Notice of Hearing, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rosenthal, Oren) No Answer/Motion to Dismiss filed. Modified on 2/18/2022 (pcs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geller et al v. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph S. Geller
Represented By: Benedict P. Kuehne
Represented By: Carl Christian Sautter
Represented By: Michael T. Davis
Represented By: Richard Jay Burton
Represented By: Joseph Scott Geller
Represented By: Marc A Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Benjamin
Represented By: Benedict P. Kuehne
Represented By: Carl Christian Sautter
Represented By: Joseph Scott Geller
Represented By: Marc A Burton
Represented By: Michael T. Davis
Represented By: Richard Jay Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin D. Chambliss
Represented By: Benedict P. Kuehne
Represented By: Carl Christian Sautter
Represented By: Joseph Scott Geller
Represented By: Marc A Burton
Represented By: Michael T. Davis
Represented By: Richard Jay Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael C Grieco
Represented By: Benedict P. Kuehne
Represented By: Carl Christian Sautter
Represented By: Joseph Scott Geller
Represented By: Marc A Burton
Represented By: Michael T. Davis
Represented By: Richard Jay Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia S. Robinson
Represented By: Benedict P. Kuehne
Represented By: Carl Christian Sautter
Represented By: Joseph Scott Geller
Represented By: Marc A Burton
Represented By: Michael T. Davis
Represented By: Richard Jay Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Dempster
Represented By: Benedict P. Kuehne
Represented By: Carl Christian Sautter
Represented By: Joseph Scott Geller
Represented By: Marc A Burton
Represented By: Michael T. Davis
Represented By: Richard Jay Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Elena Lopez
Represented By: Benedict P. Kuehne
Represented By: Carl Christian Sautter
Represented By: Joseph Scott Geller
Represented By: Marc A Burton
Represented By: Michael T. Davis
Represented By: Richard Jay Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida Democratic Party
Represented By: Benedict P. Kuehne
Represented By: Carl Christian Sautter
Represented By: Joseph Scott Geller
Represented By: Marc A Burton
Represented By: Michael T. Davis
Represented By: Richard Jay Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina White
Represented By: Michael Beny Valdes
Represented By: Oren Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?