Salazar Cano v. The Equal Employment Opportunity Commision (EEOC) et al
Plaintiff: Cesar A. Salazar Cano
Defendant: The Equal Employment Opportunity Commision (EEOC), Florida Commission on Human Relations(FCHR) and Broward County Public School(BCPS)
Case Number: 1:2022cv20530
Filed: February 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR PROTECTION: DE #20 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/19/2022. See attached document for full details. (pc)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Defendant's REPLY to #12 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS) by Broward County Public School(BCPS). (Burke, Michael)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PETITION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST THE DEFENDANTS by Cesar A. Salazar Cano. (pc)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying #16 Motion to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to The Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (EEOC). Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/18/2022. See attached document for full details. (pc)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STRICKEN PER ORDER DE #19 :SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Cesar A. Salazar Cano. The Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (EEOC) served on 3/10/2022, response/answer due 5/9/2022. (mr1) Modified text on 4/19/2022 (mr1) per DE #19 .
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STRICKEN PER ORDER DE #19 : Clerks Non-Entry of Default as to The Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (EEOC) - Motions Terminated: #16 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default, Reason: Answer deadline has NOT lapsed. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 4/18/2022. (pc) Modified text on 4/19/2022 per DE #19 (mr1).
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to The Equal Employment Opportunity Commision (EEOC), MOTION to Appoint Counsel ( Responses due by 5/2/2022) by Cesar A. Salazar Cano. (pc)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Cesar A. Salazar Cano. Replies due by 4/25/2022. (pc)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Cesar A. Salazar Cano. Broward County Public School(BCPS) served on 4/5/2022, response/answer due 4/26/2022. (pc)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE (Proof of Service for Defendant School Board of Broward County due 4/15/2022). Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/8/2022. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Broward County Public School(BCPS). Attorney Michael Thomas Burke added to party Broward County Public School(BCPS)(pty:dft). Responses due by 4/22/2022 (Burke, Michael)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Broward County Public School(BCPS), Florida Commission on Human Relations(FCHR), The Equal Employment Opportunity Commision (EEOC). (amb) (Main Document 11 replaced on 4/4/2022) (amb).
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE. It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that, within seven (7) days of perfecting service upon Defendants, Plaintiff shall file proof of such service with the Court. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/25/2022. See attached document for full details. (scn)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of filing copy of communication sent to defendants by Cesar A. Salazar Cano (pc)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Notice and Consent to Jurisdiction US Magistrate Judge NOT SIGNED by all parties. Filed by Cesar A. Salazar Cano (ls)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/22/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Requiring Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/22/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Broward County Public School(BCPS), Florida Commission on Human Relations(FCHR). (cds)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to The Equal Employment Opportunity Commision (EEOC)(cds)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 2/22/2022 in the amount of $ 402.00, receipt number FLS000015216 (cds)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Broward County Public School(BCPS), Florida Commission on Human Relations(FCHR), The Equal Employment Opportunity Commision (EEOC). Filing fees $ 402.00, filed by Cesar A. Salazar Cano. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Summon(s))(cds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salazar Cano v. The Equal Employment Opportunity Commision (EEOC) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar A. Salazar Cano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Equal Employment Opportunity Commision (EEOC)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Commission on Human Relations(FCHR)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broward County Public School(BCPS)
Represented By: Michael Thomas Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?