Joe Hand Promotions, Inc v. Vardi et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc
Defendant: Shawn Vardi and SM Think Clinton LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv20581
Filed: February 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Alicia M Otazo-Reyes
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 0605 Unauthorized publication or use of communications
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. Replies due by 5/2/2022. (Giles, Brian)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER STRIKING #19 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f)/16.1 filed by Shawn Vardi, SM Think Clinton LLC Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/22/2022. See attached document for full details. (cds)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 (STRICKEN PER DE#20 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by SM Think Clinton LLC, Shawn Vardi (Chen, Kir-Sheng) Modified Text on 4/25/2022 (cds).
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Setting Trial And Pre-Trial Schedule, Requiring Mediation, And Referring Certain Matters To Magistrate Judge. ( Amended Pleadings due by 6/21/2022., Discovery due by 11/15/2022., Expert Discovery due by 11/15/2022., Joinder of Parties due by 6/21/2022., Mediation Deadline 11/29/2022., In Limine Motions due by 12/7/2022., Dispositive Motions due by 12/7/2022., Motions due by 12/7/2022., Pretrial Stipulation due by 2/27/2023., Jury Trial set for 3/13/2023 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 3/7/2023 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.) ( Mediation Deadline 11/29/2022.) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/22/2022. See attached document for full details. (kpe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint by SM Think Clinton LLC, Shawn Vardi. Responses due by 4/25/2022 (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(Cantu, Elizabeth)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth E Cantu on behalf of Shawn Vardi (Cantu, Elizabeth)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth E Cantu on behalf of SM Think Clinton LLC (Cantu, Elizabeth)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Striking #9 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by Shawn Vardi by Shawn Vardi. Attorney Elizabeth E Cantu added to party Shawn Vardi(pty:dft). (Cantu, Elizabeth)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Striking #8 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by SM Think Clinton LLC by SM Think Clinton LLC. Attorney Elizabeth E Cantu added to party SM Think Clinton LLC(pty:dft). (Cantu, Elizabeth)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline: SM Think Clinton LLC response/answer due 4/29/2022. SEE DE 11 ORDER (ail)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Clerks Notice to Filer re #9 Notice of Attorney Appearance AND #8 Notice of Attorney Appearance. Login/Signature Block Violation; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The name of attorney e-filing this document via their CM/ECF login does not match the name of attorney on the signature block of the document. The name used for login must match the typed name on signature block of the document. This filing is a violation of Section 3J(1) of CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rule 5.1(b). Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile document pursuant to CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rules. (ail)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ECF No. #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant SM Think Clinton, LLC shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before April 29, 2022. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (mk00)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Complaint by SM Think Clinton LLC. Responses due by 4/14/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Derrevere, Jon)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STRICKEN PER DE #14 .. NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jon Dale Derrevere on behalf of Shawn Vardi. Attorney Jon Dale Derrevere added to party Shawn Vardi(pty:dft). (Derrevere, Jon) Modified on 4/5/2022 (lbc).
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STRICKEN PER DE #13 .. NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jon Dale Derrevere on behalf of SM Think Clinton LLC. Attorney Jon Dale Derrevere added to party SM Think Clinton LLC(pty:dft). (Derrevere, Jon) Modified on 4/5/2022 (lbc).
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. Shawn Vardi served on 3/30/2022, response/answer due 4/20/2022. (Giles, Brian)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/29/2022. See attached document for full details. (ail)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. SM Think Clinton LLC served on 3/17/2022, response/answer due 4/7/2022. (Giles, Brian)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/28/2022. See attached document for full details. (ail)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to SM Think Clinton LLC, Shawn Vardi. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(ail)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ail)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SM Think Clinton LLC, Shawn Vardi. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15431225, filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Giles, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc v. Vardi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc
Represented By: Brian Thomas Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Vardi
Represented By: Elizabeth E Cantu
Represented By: Jon Dale Derrevere
Represented By: Kir-Sheng Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SM Think Clinton LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth E Cantu
Represented By: Jon Dale Derrevere
Represented By: Kir-Sheng Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?