Everett v. Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Tanisa Tamito Everett
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2022cv20640
Filed: March 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Alicia M Otazo-Reyes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Tanisa Tamito Everett. U.S. Attorney served on 3/14/2022, response/answer due 5/13/2022. (ls)
March 8, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Katherine Olivia Palacios-Moreno on behalf of Tanisa Tamito Everett. Attorney Katherine Olivia Palacios-Moreno added to party Tanisa Tamito Everett(pty:pla). (Palacios-Moreno, Katherine)
March 3, 2022 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance re #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, (ls)
March 3, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ls)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. USM Service ordered . Summonses provided for issuance by Clerk for USM Service. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/3/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls)
March 2, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tanisa Tamito Everett. (mab)
March 2, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom and Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pursuant to the Clerks directive of this cause, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mab)
March 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Tanisa Tamito Everett against Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fees $ 402.00. IFP Filed, filed by Tanisa Tamito Everett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Forma Pauperis, #3 Summon(s))Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (Oliver, Rogelio)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Everett v. Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanisa Tamito Everett
Represented By: Rogelio Ramon Oliver
Represented By: Katherine Olivia Palacios-Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Noticing Social Security US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?