Anderson, Jr v. Commissioner of Social Security et al
Plaintiff: Alex Anderson, Jr
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Unknown Defendant
Case Number: 1:2022cv20900
Filed: March 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Alicia M Otazo-Reyes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 427 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Alex Anderson, Jr. Commissioner of Social Security served on 4/23/2022, response/answer due 6/22/2022. See DE #12 for image. (pc)
May 3, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, (no response/answer filing deadline set) (pc)
April 29, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of filing by Alex Anderson, Jr. (pc)
April 26, 2022 Filing 10 RESPONSE to the Court's Instructions pertaining too Summonses re: 4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Alex Anderson, Jr. (pc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/27/2022: #1 Exhibit) (pc).
April 26, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Compliance re #8 Order (Placed copy of Order in mailbox for U.S. Marshall Service). (pc)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE re 4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/26/2022. See attached document for full details. (pc)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER PROVIDING INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/29/2022. See attached document for full details. (pc)
March 29, 2022 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance. Packet prepared & placed in FTL U.S.M. box re 4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint, filed by Alex Anderson, Jr, #5 Summons Issued as to USA. (ebz)
March 29, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, Unknown Defendant (Social Security Admin. Rep.) (ebz)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Granting to the extent that the plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case, or to prepay costs such as for service of process. USM Service ordered . Summonses provided for issuance by Clerk for USM Service. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
March 24, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Alex Anderson, Jr. (mab)
March 24, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom and Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pursuant to the Clerks directive of this cause, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mab)
March 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security and Unknown Defendant. Filing fees $ 402.00. IFP filed by Alex Anderson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (mab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson, Jr v. Commissioner of Social Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Anderson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Noticing Social Security US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Defendant
Represented By: Noticing Social Security US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?