Coleman et al v. Burger King Corporation
Plaintiff: Walter Coleman, Marco DiLeonardo, Matthew Fox, Madelyn Salzman, Sha Badgett, Chris Sours, Sybil Peachlum, Jared Drucker, Victor Castillo, Anthony Scott, Andrew Lingoes, Dana Dillon, Angela Runner, Jesus Mendez, Richard Moore, Carl Anello, John Passarella, William Malfese, Michael Mrofchak and Summer Adamski
Defendant: Burger King Corporation
Case Number: 1:2022cv20925
Filed: March 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2022 Filing 19 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 6/3/2022 03:00 PM before Judge Roy K. Altman. The Meeting ID is 161 2752 2255. The Passcode is 7777. (kmz)
May 2, 2022 Filing 18 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Burger King Corporation, filed by Marco DiLeonardo, Walter Coleman, Matthew Fox, Madelyn Salzman, Sha Badgett, Chris Sours, Sybil Peachlum, Jared Drucker, Victor Castillo, Anthony Scott, Andrew Lingoes, Dana Dillon, Angela Runner, Jesus Mendez, Richard Moore, Carl Anello, John Passarella, William Malfese, Michael Mrofchak, Summer Adamski.(Russo, Anthony)
April 26, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings per DE 17 Order. Joint Scheduling Report due by 6/14/2022 (ebz)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 the Motion for an Extension of Time to File the Joint Scheduling Report. The parties shall file the Joint Scheduling Report by June 14, 2022. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 4/26/2022. (kmz)
April 25, 2022 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Deadline for Filing Scheduling Report by Burger King Corporation. Responses due by 5/9/2022 (Joblove, Michael)
April 25, 2022 Filing 15 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Burger King Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Burger King Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Restaurant Brands International, Inc. for Burger King Corporation (Joblove, Michael)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney James C. Kelly, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 4/18/2022. See attached document for full details. (drz)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Jeffrey Jacobson, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 4/18/2022. See attached document for full details. (drz)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Joint Scheduling Report due by 4/29/2022 Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 4/15/2022. See attached document for full details. (drz)
April 15, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for James C. Kelly. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15563329 by Walter Coleman, Marco DiLeonardo, Matthew Fox, Madelyn Salzman. Responses due by 4/29/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russo, Anthony)
April 15, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Madelyn Salzman, Walter Coleman, Matthew Fox, Marco DiLeonardo. Burger King Corporation waiver sent on 4/12/2022, response/answer due 6/13/2022. (Russo, Anthony)
April 14, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Anthony Panzavecchia on behalf of Walter Coleman, Marco DiLeonardo, Matthew Fox, Madelyn Salzman. Attorney Mark Anthony Panzavecchia added to party Walter Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Anthony Panzavecchia added to party Marco DiLeonardo(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Anthony Panzavecchia added to party Matthew Fox(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Anthony Panzavecchia added to party Madelyn Salzman(pty:pla). (Panzavecchia, Mark)
April 13, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jeffrey Jacobson. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15556372 by Burger King Corporation. Responses due by 4/27/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joblove, Michael)
April 13, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael D Joblove on behalf of Burger King Corporation. Attorney Michael D Joblove added to party Burger King Corporation(pty:dft). (Joblove, Michael)
March 29, 2022 Filing 6 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney James C. Kelly, mailing date March 29, 2022, (pt)
March 29, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Burger King Corporation. (drz)
March 28, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE by Walter Coleman, Marco DiLeonardo, Matthew Fox, Madelyn Salzman Proposed Summons (Russo, Anthony)
March 28, 2022 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Attorney or Pro Se party's return address is not listed. (drz)
March 28, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
March 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Burger King Corporation. Filing fees $ 402.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-15510972, payment transferred from : 22CV20925 Coleman et al. vs. Burger King Corporation, filed by Madelyn Salzman, Walter Coleman, Matthew Fox, Marco DiLeonardo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Russo, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman et al v. Burger King Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Coleman
Represented By: Anthony John Russo, Jr.
Represented By: James C. Kelly
Represented By: Mark Anthony Panzavecchia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco DiLeonardo
Represented By: Anthony John Russo, Jr.
Represented By: James C. Kelly
Represented By: Mark Anthony Panzavecchia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Fox
Represented By: Anthony John Russo, Jr.
Represented By: Mark Anthony Panzavecchia
Represented By: James C. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madelyn Salzman
Represented By: Anthony John Russo, Jr.
Represented By: James C. Kelly
Represented By: Mark Anthony Panzavecchia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sha Badgett
Represented By: Anthony John Russo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Sours
Represented By: Anthony John Russo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sybil Peachlum
Represented By: Anthony John Russo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Drucker
Represented By: Anthony John Russo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Castillo
Represented By: Anthony John Russo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Scott
Represented By: Anthony John Russo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Lingoes
Represented By: Anthony John Russo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Dillon
Represented By: Anthony John Russo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Runner
Represented By: Anthony John Russo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Mendez
Represented By: Anthony John Russo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Moore
Represented By: Anthony John Russo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Anello
Represented By: Anthony John Russo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Passarella
Represented By: Anthony John Russo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Malfese
Represented By: Anthony John Russo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Mrofchak
Represented By: Anthony John Russo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summer Adamski
Represented By: Anthony John Russo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burger King Corporation
Represented By: Michael D Joblove
Represented By: Jeffrey Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?