Bella Vista Lote 56, S.A. et al v. BRP US Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bella Vista Lote 56, S.A. and Lorenzo Figueroa
Defendant: BRP US Inc., Bombardier Recreational Products Inc. and BRP Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv21411
Filed: May 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Bella Vista Lote 56, S.A., Lorenzo Figueroa (Ayala Maura, Eduardo)
June 27, 2022 Civil Case Terminated, per #22 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. Closing Case. (ps1)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 6/24/2022. See attached document for full details. (mdc)
June 23, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE by Bella Vista Lote 56, S.A., Lorenzo Figueroa re #18 Order, (Ayala Maura, Eduardo)
June 23, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Ivy Softness on behalf of BRP Inc., BRP US Inc., Bombardier Recreational Products Inc.. Attorney Melissa Ivy Softness added to party BRP Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Melissa Ivy Softness added to party BRP US Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Melissa Ivy Softness added to party Bombardier Recreational Products Inc.(pty:dft). (Softness, Melissa)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that Plaintiffs shall file a notice by June 23, 2022, indicating whether they require jurisdictional discovery to adequately respond to the Motion to Dismiss #16 , and if so, what the requested discovery consists of. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/22/2022. See attached document for full details. (wc)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Setting Trial and Pretrial Schedule, Requiring Mediation, and Referring Certain Matters to Magistrate Judge: Trial set for two-week period beginning 6/20/2023 in Miami Division before Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Calendar Call set for 6/13/2023 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Motions to amend pleadings or join parties due by 8/2/2022. All Discovery, including Expert Discovery, due by 12/28/2022. Mediation Deadline 1/4/2023. In Limine Motions due by 2/7/2023. Motions due by 1/11/2023. Pretrial Stipulation due by 2/7/2023. REFERRING CASE to Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Discovery Matters. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/21/2022. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
June 21, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by BRP Inc., BRP US Inc., Bombardier Recreational Products Inc.. Responses due by 7/5/2022 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Charles-Andre Girard on behalf of Bombardier Recreational Products, Inc., #2 Affidavit of Charles-Andre Girard on behalf of BRP Inc., #3 Affidavit of Michael Schroeder on behalf of BRP US Inc.)(Sarason, Scott)
June 20, 2022 Filing 15 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by BRP Inc., BRP US Inc., Bombardier Recreational Products Inc. (Sarason, Scott)
June 20, 2022 Filing 14 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Bella Vista Lote 56, S.A., Lorenzo Figueroa (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order)(Ayala Maura, Eduardo)
June 17, 2022 Filing 13 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Bella Vista Lote 56, S.A., Lorenzo Figueroa (Ayala Maura, Eduardo)
June 10, 2022 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bella Vista Lote 56, S.A., Lorenzo Figueroa. BRP Inc. waiver sent on 6/9/2022, response/answer due 9/7/2022. (Ayala Maura, Eduardo)
June 10, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bella Vista Lote 56, S.A., Lorenzo Figueroa. Bombardier Recreational Products Inc. waiver sent on 6/9/2022, response/answer due 9/7/2022. (Ayala Maura, Eduardo)
June 8, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Bella Vista Lote 56, S.A., Lorenzo Figueroa. BRP US Inc. served on 6/1/2022, response/answer due 6/22/2022. (Ayala Maura, Eduardo)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that Defendants shall submit a single, combined response or separate answers to the Complaint within the time permitted by the Rules. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file proof of service by June 10, 2022. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/8/2022. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties by 6/20/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/8/2022. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
June 8, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott M. Sarason on behalf of BRP Inc., BRP US Inc., Bombardier Recreational Products Inc.. Attorney Scott M. Sarason added to party BRP Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Scott M. Sarason added to party BRP US Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Scott M. Sarason added to party Bombardier Recreational Products Inc.(pty:dft). (Sarason, Scott)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER requiring service be perfected by 8/3/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/20/2022. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
May 6, 2022 Filing 5 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Bella Vista Lote 56, S.A. (Ayala Maura, Eduardo)
May 6, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to BRP Inc., Bombardier Recreational Products Inc. (bb)
May 6, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BRP US Inc. (bb)
May 5, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb)
May 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BRP Inc., BRP US Inc., Bombardier Recreational Products Inc.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15617338, filed by Bella Vista Lote 56, S.A., Lorenzo Figueroa. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s))(Ayala Maura, Eduardo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bella Vista Lote 56, S.A. et al v. BRP US Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bella Vista Lote 56, S.A.
Represented By: Eduardo Ayala Maura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Figueroa
Represented By: Eduardo Ayala Maura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRP US Inc.
Represented By: Scott M. Sarason
Represented By: Melissa Ivy Softness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bombardier Recreational Products Inc.
Represented By: Scott M. Sarason
Represented By: Melissa Ivy Softness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRP Inc.
Represented By: Scott M. Sarason
Represented By: Melissa Ivy Softness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?