Atlas Apartments Acquisitions, LLC et al v. Stifel Nicolaus & Company Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Atlas Apartments Acquisitions, LLC, Atlas Apartment Homes LLC, Atlas Multifamily Three LLC, Atlas MF Mezzanine Borrower LLC, Premier Orlando Portfolio Two LLC, Atlas Alexandria & Parcvue LLC, Atlas Crowntree Lakes LLC, Atlas, Apartment Holdings LLC, P2, Portfolio Managing Member LLC, Atlas Birchwood LLC, Ivankovich Family LLC, Atlas Crowntree Lakes LLC, Apartment Holdings LLC and P2 Portfolio Managing Member LLC
Defendant: Stifel Nicolaus & Company Inc., William Scherr, John Doe 1, Jane Doe 1, Zhu Zhai Holdings Limited, Peter Pui Tak Lee and Jane Doe 2
Case Number: 1:2022cv21469
Filed: May 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO COUNTS 1 AND 2 OF THE COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 7/6/2022. See attached document for full details. (mmd)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PAPERLESS ORDER granting nunc pro tunc #22 #23 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Transfer. Plaintiffs may file a response by July 5, 2022 as requested in the motion and the amended motion. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 7/6/2022. (mmd)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Plaintiff's REPLY to #11 Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue to NDIL by Atlas Apartments Acquisitions, LLC. (Wandner, Jason)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE by Atlas Apartments Acquisitions, LLC re #23 MOTION for Extension of Time PLAINTIFFS AMENDED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT STIFEL SCHERR ZZH AND LEE MOTION TO TRANSFER NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF OF UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME (Wandner, Jason)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time PLAINTIFFS AMENDED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT STIFEL SCHERR ZZH AND LEE MOTION TO TRANSFER by Atlas Apartments Acquisitions, LLC. Responses due by 7/14/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex "1", #2 Exhibit Ex "2", #3 Exhibit Ex "3")(Wandner, Jason)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT STIFEL SCHERR ZZH AND LEE MOTION TO TRANSFER re #15 Statement, by Atlas Apartments Acquisitions, LLC. Responses due by 7/14/2022 (Wandner, Jason)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Atlas Apartments Acquisitions, LLC. (Wandner, Jason)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Atlas Apartments Acquisitions, LLC. Atlas Apartments Acquisitions, LLC served on 6/29/2022, response/answer due 7/20/2022. (Wandner, Jason)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Stifel and Scherr, Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint,,, by Stifel and Scherr ( Responses due by 7/13/2022) by William Scherr, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Inc.. (Dobin, Marc)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE by Atlas Apartments Acquisitions, LLC re #1 Complaint,,, NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF COUNTS 1 AND 2 OF THE COMPLAINT (Wandner, Jason)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 #14 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorneys Sascha N. Rand, Esq. and William R. Sears, Esq. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/21/2022. (mmd)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. Defendants William Scherr and Stifel Nicolaus & Company Inc. may respond to the complaint by no later than 6/29/2022. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/21/2022. (mmd)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Statement of: in Support of Motion to Transfer Non-Served Defendants Zhu Zhai Holdings Limited and Peter Pui Tak Lee's Statement in Support of Motion to Transfer by Peter Pui Tak Lee, Zhu Zhai Holdings Limited re #11 Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue to NDIL (Fordin, Joshua)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for William R. Sears. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15723893 by Peter Pui Tak Lee, Zhu Zhai Holdings Limited. Responses due by 6/30/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of William R. Sears, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - William R. Sears)(Fordin, Joshua)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Sascha N. Rand. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15723821 by Peter Pui Tak Lee, Zhu Zhai Holdings Limited. Attorney Joshua Thaddeus Fordin added to party Peter Pui Tak Lee(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua Thaddeus Fordin added to party Zhu Zhai Holdings Limited(pty:dft). Responses due by 6/30/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Sascha N. Rand, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Sascha N. Rand)(Fordin, Joshua)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,,, Unopposed by William Scherr, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dobin, Marc)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Defendant's MOTION to Change Venue to NDIL by William Scherr, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Inc.. Responses due by 6/29/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dobin, Marc)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. Defendants William Scherr and Stifel Nicolaus & Company Inc. may file a response to the complaint by June 15, 2022. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 6/2/2022. (mmd)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,,, by William Scherr, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dobin, Marc)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by William Scherr, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Inc. (Dobin, Marc)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc Stuart Dobin on behalf of William Scherr, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Inc.. Attorney Marc Stuart Dobin added to party William Scherr(pty:dft), Attorney Marc Stuart Dobin added to party Stifel Nicolaus & Company Inc.(pty:dft). (Dobin, Marc)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to William Scherr, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Inc., Peter Pui Tak Lee, Zhu Zhai Holdings Limited. (mab)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Incorrect case opening information. The Filer selected the incorrect Nature of Suit when filing. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (mab)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Incorrect case opening information. The Filer selected the incorrect Cause of Action when filing. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (mab)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Incorrect case opening information. The Filer selected the incorrect Jurisdiction when filing. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (mab)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mab)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Plaintiffs Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15631787, filed by Atlas Crowntree Lakes LLC, Atlas, Atlas Apartment Homes LLC, Atlas Apartments Acquisitions, LLC, Atlas Alexandria & Parcvue LLC, Atlas Multifamily Three LLC, Portfolio Managing Member LLC, Apartment Holdings LLC, P2, Atlas MF Mezzanine Borrower LLC, Atlas Birchwood LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summons-Stifel, #3 Summon(s) Summons Scherr, #4 Summon(s) Summons Zhu Zhai Holding Limited, #5 Summon(s) Summons Peter Pui Tak, #6 Exhibit Ex 1, #7 Exhibit Ex 2, #8 Exhibit Ex 3, #9 Exhibit Ex 4, #10 Exhibit Ex 5, #11 Exhibit Ex 6, #12 Exhibit Ex 7, #13 Exhibit Ex 8, #14 Exhibit Ex 9, #15 Exhibit Ex 10, #16 Exhibit Ex 11, #17 Exhibit Ex 12, #18 Exhibit Ex 13)(Wandner, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atlas Apartments Acquisitions, LLC et al v. Stifel Nicolaus & Company Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlas Apartments Acquisitions, LLC
Represented By: Jason Matthew Wandner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlas Apartment Homes LLC
Represented By: Jason Matthew Wandner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlas Multifamily Three LLC
Represented By: Jason Matthew Wandner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlas MF Mezzanine Borrower LLC
Represented By: Jason Matthew Wandner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Premier Orlando Portfolio Two LLC
Represented By: Jason Matthew Wandner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlas Alexandria & Parcvue LLC
Represented By: Jason Matthew Wandner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlas Crowntree Lakes LLC, Atlas
Represented By: Jason Matthew Wandner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apartment Holdings LLC, P2
Represented By: Jason Matthew Wandner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Portfolio Managing Member LLC
Represented By: Jason Matthew Wandner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlas Birchwood LLC
Represented By: Jason Matthew Wandner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivankovich Family LLC
Represented By: Jason Matthew Wandner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlas Crowntree Lakes LLC
Represented By: Jason Matthew Wandner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apartment Holdings LLC
Represented By: Jason Matthew Wandner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P2 Portfolio Managing Member LLC
Represented By: Jason Matthew Wandner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stifel Nicolaus & Company Inc.
Represented By: Marc Stuart Dobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Scherr
Represented By: Marc Stuart Dobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhu Zhai Holdings Limited
Represented By: Joshua Thaddeus Fordin
Represented By: Sascha N. Rand
Represented By: William R. Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Pui Tak Lee
Represented By: Joshua Thaddeus Fordin
Represented By: Sascha N. Rand
Represented By: William R. Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?