Patt v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Richard Patt
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. a Foreign corporation doing business as Audi of America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv21585
Filed: May 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Alicia M Otazo-Reyes
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Joseph P. Farina. Mediation Hearing set for 1/10/2023. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 7/15/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Joesph P Farina as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 1/10/2023 at 10:00 am. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rojas, Pablo)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ECF No. #16 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Selection of Mediator and Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation. The parties shall have up and until July 15, 2022 to file a notice and proposed order scheduling mediation. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (gm00)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to file their Notice of Selection of Mediator and Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation by Richard Patt. Responses due by 7/19/2022 (Rojas, Pablo)
June 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Howard Grant Law. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Howard Grant Law. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15743386 by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. Responses due by 7/8/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification Ex. A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Ex. B)(Bernstein, Matthew)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Defendant's REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Bernstein, Matthew)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Setting Trial and Pre-Trial Schedule, Requiring Mediation: Amended Pleadings due by 8/15/2022. Discovery due by 3/21/2023. Expert Discovery due by 3/21/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 8/15/2022. Mediation Deadline 4/4/2023. In Limine Motions due by 4/12/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 4/12/2023. Motions due by 4/12/2023. Pretrial Stipulation due by 7/3/2023. Jury Trial set for 7/17/2023 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom. Calendar Call set for 7/11/2023 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom. Discovery matters are referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/14/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Richard Patt (Rojas, Pablo)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Bernstein, Matthew)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Bernstein, Matthew)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B)(Bernstein, Matthew)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Richard Patt. Replies due by 6/21/2022. (Rojas, Pablo)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. Responses due by 6/14/2022 (Geraghty, William)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response by May 31, 2022 to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. Responses due by 6/7/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Geraghty, William)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Post-Removal Procedures, and Requiring Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Joint Scheduling Report due by 6/13/2022. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 5/23/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ail)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15658698, filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. d/b/a Audi of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Geraghty, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patt v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Patt
Represented By: Pablo Rojas
Represented By: Steven Craig Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. a Foreign corporation doing business as Audi of America, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew David Bernstein
Represented By: William Patrick Geraghty
Represented By: Howard Grant Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?