Johnson v. Acting Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: James Edward Johnson
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi and Acting Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2022cv21659
Filed: May 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Compliance re #7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Service package placed in USM Box. (cqs)
July 27, 2022 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Acting Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (cqs)
July 26, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by James Edward Johnson (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s)) (Bohr, Sarah)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. USM Service Ordered and Summonses NOT provided for USM Service. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 7/25/2022. See attached document for full details. (elk)
May 31, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bhy)
May 31, 2022 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The motion to proceed in forma pauperis is pending (swr)
May 31, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Edward Johnson. (swr)
May 30, 2022 Filing 6 CASE REFERRED to Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres. (swr)
May 30, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pursuant to the Clerks directive of this cause, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (swr)
May 30, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi. Filing fees $ 402.00. IFP Filed, filed by James Edward Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) - Office of the Attorney General, #3 Summon(s) - Office of the General Counsel SSA, #4 Summon(s) - United States Attorney's Office - Miami, #5 Affidavit of Indigency, #6 Marshal form - Office of the Attorney General, #7 Marshal form - Office of the General Counsel SSA, #8 Marshal form - United States Attorney - Miami)Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (Bohr, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Acting Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Edward Johnson
Represented By: Sarah Harriet Bohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Noticing Social Security US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?