Florida Veg Investments LLC v. Mi Campo Farmers Market Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Florida Veg Investments LLC and Florida Veg Investments LLC doing business as Mr. Greens Produce
Defendant: Mi Campo Farmers Market Inc., Diosmel Cardenas, Mirena Companioni, Alain E. Companioni, Sr. and Cardenas Ready Cabinets LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv22067
Filed: July 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Referring Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 0499 Agricultural Commodities Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER: In light of the parties' stipulated order, entered July 27, 2022, the Court cancels the hearing currently scheduled for July 29, 2022, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (ntd)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Stipulated Order Under the Perishable Agricultural Commodities Act (7 U.S.C. 499e. Denied as moot: #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Florida Veg Investments LLC. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 7/27/2022. See attached document for full details. (mee)
July 27, 2022 Filing 18 STIPULATION under the Perishable Agricultural Commodities Act by Florida Veg Investments LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Esquivel, Katy)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER, granting #11 Expedited Motion. Plaintiff's motion for a Preliminary Injunction set for 7/29/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 7/20/2022. See attached document for full details. (mee)
July 20, 2022 Filing 16 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Florida Veg Investments LLC. Mirena Companioni served on 7/19/2022, response/answer due 8/9/2022. (Esquivel, Katy)
July 20, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Florida Veg Investments LLC. (Esquivel, Katy)
July 20, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Florida Veg Investments LLC. Diosmel Cardenas served on 7/19/2022, response/answer due 8/9/2022. (Esquivel, Katy)
July 20, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Florida Veg Investments LLC. Cardenas Ready Cabinets LLC served on 7/19/2022, response/answer due 8/9/2022. (Esquivel, Katy)
July 20, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Florida Veg Investments LLC. Alain E. Companioni, Sr served on 7/19/2022, response/answer due 8/9/2022. (Esquivel, Katy)
July 19, 2022 Filing 11 EXPEDITED MOTION To Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction re Set/Reset Motion/R&R Deadlines and Hearings by Florida Veg Investments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Esquivel, Katy)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 7/11/2022. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Order granting 4 Temporary Restraining Order. Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2022 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr. (Responses due by 7/15/2022.) Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 7/8/2022. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
July 8, 2022 Set Hearings per DE #10 Order as to #5 MOTION. Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2022 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr. Responses due by 7/15/2022 (kpe)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for all discovery matters. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 7/8/2022. See attached document for full details. (mee)
July 8, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Attorney Certification Why Notice Should Not Be Required Pursuant to Rule 65(b)(1)(B) by Florida Veg Investments LLC re 4 Exparte document. (Attachments: #1 Attorney Certification Why Notice Should Not Be Required Pursuant to Rule 65(b)(1)(B)) (Esquivel, Katy) Modified text on 7/8/2022 (kpe).
July 8, 2022 Filing 6 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Florida Veg Investments LLC (Esquivel, Katy)
July 8, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Florida Veg Investments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Esquivel, Katy)
July 8, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Diosmel Cardenas, Cardenas Ready Cabinets LLC, Alain E. Companioni, Sr, Mirena Companioni, Mi Campo Farmers Market Inc.. (swr)
July 8, 2022 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 4 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (kpe)
July 7, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (swr)
July 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15773514, filed by Florida Veg Investments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s), #7 Summon(s))(Esquivel, Katy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Florida Veg Investments LLC v. Mi Campo Farmers Market Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida Veg Investments LLC
Represented By: Katy Koestner Esquivel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida Veg Investments LLC doing business as Mr. Greens Produce
Represented By: Katy Koestner Esquivel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mi Campo Farmers Market Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diosmel Cardenas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mirena Companioni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alain E. Companioni, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardenas Ready Cabinets LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?