Gutierrez Ceccarelli et al v. TRUIST BANK
Plaintiff: Manuel Piezzini Gutierrez Ceccarelli and Sylvia Marcela Bazo Pita
Defendant: TRUIST BANK and SunTrust Bank
Case Number: 1:2022cv22829
Filed: September 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER administratively closing case in light of #15 Notice of Settlement, which indicates that this matter has settled in full. The parties are hereby notified that, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, they must file a Stipulation or Notice of Dismissal and/or Settlement Agreement along with any other pertinent document necessary to conclude this action. Any pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bhy)
October 28, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Settlement by TRUIST BANK (Agnello, Nicholas)
October 25, 2022 Reset Deadliness TRUIST BANK /answer due 10/28/2022. Per DE#14. (cqs)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting Defendant's #13 Third Unopposed Motion to Extend the Time. Defendant shall file its responsive pleading on or before October 28, 2022. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bhy)
October 24, 2022 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by TRUIST BANK. (Agnello, Nicholas)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting Defendant's #11 Second Unopposed Motion to Extend the Time. Defendant shall file its responsive pleading on or before October 24, 2022. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bhy)
October 17, 2022 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by TRUIST BANK. (Agnello, Nicholas)
October 11, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Sylvia Marcela Bazo Pita, Manuel Piezzini Gutierrez Ceccarelli for dates of 12/19/2022 to 1/4/2023 (Saltiel, Moises)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting Defendant's #8 Unopposed Motion. Defendant shall file its responsive pleading on or before October 17, 2022. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bhy)
September 28, 2022 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by TRUIST BANK. (Agnello, Nicholas)
September 13, 2022 Filing 7 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRUIST BANK identifying Corporate Parent BB&T Corporation, Corporate Parent Truist Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY n/k/a TRUIST, Corporate Parent SunTrust Bank, Corporate Parent SunTrust Banks, Inc. for TRUIST BANK (Agnello, Nicholas)
September 13, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Manuel Piezzini Gutierrez Ceccarelli. TRUIST BANK served on 9/8/2022, response/answer due 9/29/2022. (Saltiel, Moises)
September 13, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas Steven Agnello on behalf of TRUIST BANK. Attorney Nicholas Steven Agnello added to party TRUIST BANK(pty:dft). (Agnello, Nicholas)
September 7, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bhy)
September 6, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to TRUIST BANK. (swr)
September 6, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (swr)
September 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15926373, filed by Manuel Piezzini Gutierrez Ceccarelli, Sylvia Marcela Bazo Pita. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Saltiel, Moises)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gutierrez Ceccarelli et al v. TRUIST BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRUIST BANK
Represented By: Nicholas Steven Agnello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunTrust Bank
Represented By: Nicholas Steven Agnello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Piezzini Gutierrez Ceccarelli
Represented By: Moises Alejandro Saltiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Marcela Bazo Pita
Represented By: Moises Alejandro Saltiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?