GAUTIER v. MONTA et al
Plaintiff: CASSANDRA GAUTIER
Defendant: MARTIN D. MONTA, ROYAL TRUCK LEASING, LLC and HANSEN & ADKINS AUTO TRANSPORT, INC.
Case Number: 1:2022cv23296
Filed: October 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Referring Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying #7 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 12/6/2022. See attached document for full details. (scn)
December 2, 2022 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 Second MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by CASSANDRA GAUTIER. (Fahey, Leah)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER: striking 15 the Court's order regarding the joint discovery and conference plan. The Court observes that the parties filed the joint discovery and conference plan (ECF No. 10) immediately prior to the entry of the scheduling order (ECF No. 11). Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (cst)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (STRICKEN PER DE#16) PAPERLESS ORDER: requiring the parties to file their joint discovery plan and conference report. Previously, the Court entered its scheduling order over the parties failure to abide by the Court's order to file the joint discovery plan and conference report along with a proposed scheduling order. (ECF No. 11.) In doing so, the Court ordered the parties to file the joint discovery plan and conference report by November 28, 2022. To date, the parties have not filed the report. The Court orders the parties to submit their joint discovery plan and conference report by December 5, 2022. Future violations of the Court's orders will result in sanctions, up to and including the striking of a party's pleadings or dismissal of this case. Cf. Powell v. Siegal, 447 F. App'x 92, 94 (11th Cir. 2011) ("Rule 16(f) authorizes a court to impose sanctions, including dismissal under Rule 37(b)(2)(A)(v), if a party fails to obey a pretrial order."). Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (cst) Text Modified on 11/29/2022 (scn).
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER: granting the Plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time to file a reply in support of her second motion to remand. #13 . The Plaintiff shall file her reply no later than December 2, 2022. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (cst)
November 22, 2022 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Remand by CASSANDRA GAUTIER. Responses due by 12/6/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Fahey, Leah)
November 22, 2022 Reset Deadline per DE#14 as to #7 Second MOTION to Remand to State Court. Replies due by 12/2/2022. (scn)
November 21, 2022 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 Second MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by HANSEN & ADKINS AUTO TRANSPORT, INC., ROYAL TRUCK LEASING, LLC. Replies due by 11/28/2022. (Nicklaus, Edward)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: JURY TRIAL set for 10/23/2023 in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr. CALENDAR CALL set for 10/17/2023 at 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation Deadline 7/20/2023. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr., on 11/17/2022. See attached document for full details. (caw) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
November 17, 2022 Filing 10 REPORT REGARDING Scheduling Conference by CASSANDRA GAUTIER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Balkan, Adam)
November 16, 2022 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to MARTIN D. MONTA. (scn)
November 16, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by CASSANDRA GAUTIER (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Balkan, Adam)
November 7, 2022 Filing 7 Second MOTION to Remand to State Court by CASSANDRA GAUTIER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Second Motion for Remand)(Fahey, Leah)
October 18, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Leah Marie Fahey on behalf of CASSANDRA GAUTIER. Attorney Leah Marie Fahey added to party CASSANDRA GAUTIER(pty:pla). (Fahey, Leah)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 10/13/2022. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Requiring Compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 10/12/2022. See attached document for full details. (scn)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge: ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 10/12/2022. See attached document for full details. (scn)
October 11, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (scn)
October 11, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16013961, filed by ROYAL TRUCK LEASING, LLC, MARTIN D. MONTA, HANSEN & ADKINS AUTO TRANSPORT, INC. (No Answer filed/No Motion to Dismiss filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Stat Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Company Snapshot, #4 Exhibit 3 - Court's Order, #5 Exhibit 4 - Defendant's Evidence of Citizen of Alabama, #6 Exhibit 5 - Demand Notice, #7 Exhibit 6 - State Court Filings, #8 Exhibit 7 - Answer to Complaint, #9 Exhibit 8 - Notice to State Court)(Nicklaus, Edward) Text Modified on 10/12/2022 (scn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GAUTIER v. MONTA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CASSANDRA GAUTIER
Represented By: Adam Mark Balkan
Represented By: Jared Francis Bossola
Represented By: Leah Marie Fahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTIN D. MONTA
Represented By: Edward Randall Nicklaus
Represented By: Michael Faustino Amezaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROYAL TRUCK LEASING, LLC
Represented By: Edward Randall Nicklaus
Represented By: Michael Faustino Amezaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HANSEN & ADKINS AUTO TRANSPORT, INC.
Represented By: Edward Randall Nicklaus
Represented By: Michael Faustino Amezaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?