Martin et al v. HCA-IT&S Field Operations, Inc.
Plaintiff: Carolyn Martin and TROY GOINGS
Defendant: HCA-IT&S FIELD OPERATIONS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2022cv23323
Filed: October 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul C Huck
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 0201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2022 Filing 28 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra: Settlement Conference held on 12/2/2022. The Parties have reached an impasse in this matter. Attorney Appearance(s): Gina Marie Cadogan, Luis Santos, Total time in court: 1 hour 22 minutes. (dgj) Modified on 12/2/2022 (dgj).
December 2, 2022 Filing 27 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #26 Notice of Consent to Join. Parties Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties from the complaint/petition/removal, etc.. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the additional parties. (ls)
December 1, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff. Party(s) Fulton, Gregory added to plaintiffs group of record, represented by Gina Marie Cadogan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join-Fulton, Gregory) (Cadogan, Gina)
November 30, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Filing Amended Statement of Claim by Troy Goings re #7 Statement (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Amended Statement of Claim) (Cadogan, Gina) Modified Text on 11/30/2022 (ls).
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER on Defendant's Motion to Bring Electronic Devices/Equipment into Courthouse for Use at Settlement Conference, ECF No. #22 , and Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Allow Plaintiffs' Electronic Devices in the Courtroom During Court Ordered Settlement Conference, ECF No. #23 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra on 11/29/2022. See attached document for full details. (cor)
November 28, 2022 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom by Troy Goings, Carolyn Martin. Responses due by 12/12/2022 (Cadogan, Gina)
November 28, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom for Use at Settlement Conference by HCA-IT&S Field Operations, Inc.. Responses due by 12/12/2022 (Santos, Luis)
November 23, 2022 Filing 21 RESPONSE to #6 Statement of Claim by Plaintiff Carolyn Martin by HCA-IT&S Field Operations, Inc.. (Kelly, Shannon)
November 23, 2022 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #7 Statement of Claim by Troy Goings by HCA-IT&S Field Operations, Inc.. (Kelly, Shannon)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. The in-person Settlement Conference in this matter is scheduled for 1:00 P.M. on Friday, December 2, 2022, before the undersigned in Courtroom 10-06, 99 N.E. 4th Street, Miami, Florida, 33132. Parties should note that: (1) The Conference shall be conducted without a court reporter and will not be tape recorded. All representations made at the Conference shall remain confidential. However, if a settlement is reached, the Court may require the parties to state the material terms of the agreement on the Court record. (2) The parties are not required to submit any statements/documentation in preparation for the Conference. However, counsel for Plaintiff(s) should be prepared to provide the Court with billing and/or time records to support an award of fees, should the parties decide to reach an agreement on attorneys' fees as part of the settlement. (3) Each counsel is required to meet (either in person or by phone) with their client(s) regarding settlement at least five days prior to the Settlement Conference. (4) Counsel must confer with each other (either in person or by phone) to discuss their respective settlement positions, and to exchange settlement offers before the date of the Settlement Conference set above. (5) The Court does not provide an interpreter for parties who do not speak English. If a party requires an interpreter, it shall be that party's burden to provide one. (6) Although counsel of record may bring laptop computers or cellular phones into the Federal Courthouse, absent an Order of the Court, the parties are not allowed to do so. (7) Counsel shall remind their clients that they must bring proper identification (for example, a driver's license). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra on 11/23/2022. (cor)
November 21, 2022 Filing 18 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #16 Notice (Other). Incorrect Document Link; ERROR - The filed document was not correctly linked to the related docket entry. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the instructions in the CM/ECF Attorney User's Manual. (ls)
November 21, 2022 Filing 17 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #15 Notice (Other). Incorrect Document Link; ERROR - The filed document was not correctly linked to the related docket entry. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the instructions in the CM/ECF Attorney User's Manual. (ls)
November 21, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE by HCA-IT&S Field Operations, Inc. re #8 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint of Withdrawal of Affirmative Defense (Kelly, Shannon) Modified document link on 11/21/2022 (ls).
November 21, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE by HCA-IT&S Field Operations, Inc. re #8 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint of Withdrawal of Affirmative Defense (Kelly, Shannon) Modified document link on 11/21/2022 (ls).
November 14, 2022 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the contact information for attorney Shannon L. Kelly re #11 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name. (cw)
November 11, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Discovery: Notice of Filing Answers to Court's Interrogatories on behalf of Plaintiff Goings by Troy Goings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Documents produced for Notice of Answers to Court's Interrogatories)(Cadogan, Gina)
November 11, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing Discovery: Notice of Filing Answers to Court's Interrogatories on behalf of Plaintiff, Martin by Carolyn Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Documents produced for Notice of Answers to Court's Interrogatories)(Cadogan, Gina)
November 11, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Shannon L. Kelly (Kelly, Shannon)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Regarding Defendant's Affirmative Defenses re #8 Answer to Complaint. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 11/9/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls)
November 8, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Luis Santos on behalf of HCA-IT&S FIELD OPERATIONS, INC.. Attorney Luis Santos added to party HCA-IT&S FIELD OPERATIONS, INC.(pty:dft). (Santos, Luis)
November 8, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by HCA-IT&S FIELD OPERATIONS, INC.. Attorney Shannon L. Kelly added to party HCA-IT&S FIELD OPERATIONS, INC.(pty:dft). (Kelly, Shannon)
November 1, 2022 Filing 7 Statement of: Statement of Claim (FLSA) by TROY GOINGS re #4 Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, (Cadogan, Gina)
October 31, 2022 Filing 6 Statement of: Statement of Claim (FLSA) (Carolyn Martin) by Carolyn Martin re #4 Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, (Cadogan, Gina)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURES TO SET SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. To set the Settlement Conference mandated by the District Court, ECF No. #4 , counsel for Plaintiff shall send an e-mail, to chambers_becerra@flsd.uscourts.gov, on or before the date that Defendants' Responses are due, to schedule a date for the Settlement Conference. The e-mail shall list at least three different dates and times where all counsel and parties are available for the Settlement Conference. These dates must all be within 15 days of the date that Defendants' Responses are due. The Court prefers to set settlement conferences on Tuesdays and Thursdays at 9:00 a.m., 12:00 p.m., or 3:00 p.m. If counsel and the parties are not available on those dates and times, they are permitted to propose other dates and times, but all proposed dates must be within the deadline set above. Plaintiff's counsel shall copy all counsel on the e-mail to chambers. Failure to submit proposed dates by the deadline will result in the Court setting the conference unilaterally. The Settlement Conference will not be continued absent compelling circumstances (i.e., counsel has a conflict with another court hearing). The settlement conference will be conducted in-person. In providing dates for the Settlement Conference, counsel should note that: (1) The Settlement Conference must be attended, except as provided under Local Rule 16.2(e) for public-sector entities, by counsel of record and each party, or representatives of each party with full authority to enter into a complete settlement. (2) In the event that a monetary settlement would be payable from proceeds of an insurance policy, a claims professional/representative(s) from the party's insurer, with full and final authority to authorize payment to settle the matter up to the full limits of the party's policy shall be present. The failure of a party representative with full and final authority to make and accept offers of settlement to attend this Conference may result in the undersigned's sua sponte recommendation to the District Judge that sanctions be entered against the offending party. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra on 10/19/2022. (cor)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Court Practice in Fair Labor Standards Act Cases and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra for Settlement Conference. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 10/17/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls)
October 14, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to HCA-IT&S FIELD OPERATIONS, INC.. (nan)
October 13, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nan)
October 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (FLSA Collective Action) against HCA-IT&S FIELD OPERATIONS, INC.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16021235, filed by Carolyn Martin, TROY GOINGS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Cadogan, Gina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin et al v. HCA-IT&S Field Operations, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Martin
Represented By: Gina Marie Cadogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TROY GOINGS
Represented By: Gina Marie Cadogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCA-IT&S FIELD OPERATIONS, INC.
Represented By: Luis Santos
Represented By: Shannon L. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?