Zeflon, LLC v. En Corp USA et al
Plaintiff: Zeflon, LLC
Defendant: En Corp USA, Encorp Switzerland AG and Does 1 to 10
Case Number: 1:2022cv23661
Filed: November 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul C Huck
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2023 Filing 20 Defendant, ENCORP USA'S ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by En Corp USA. (Ejenbaum, Mauricio)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING SECOND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT. Response/Answer due 1/6/2023. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 12/28/2022. See attached document for full details. (pc)
December 28, 2022 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer filed by Zeflon, LLC. Replies due by 1/4/2023. (Mayberg, Menachem)
December 27, 2022 Filing 17 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by En Corp USA. (Ejenbaum, Mauricio)
December 6, 2022 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the contact information for attorney Mauricio Jose Ejenbaum re #12 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name. (cw)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Yisrael Hiller. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 12/6/2022. See attached document for full details. (cds)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting in Part #7 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 12/6/2022. See attached document for full details. (cds)
December 6, 2022 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the primary email information for attorney Mauricio Jose Ejenbaum re #12 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name. The Court is not responsible for updating secondary email addresses. (cw)
December 6, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Mauricio Jose Ejenbaum (Ejenbaum, Mauricio)
December 6, 2022 Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline: En Corp USA response/answer due 12/27/2022. PER DE#14 (cds)
December 5, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Yisrael Heller. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-16145926. Filing Fee $ 200.00 by En Corp USA. Responses due by 12/19/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Yisrael Heller)(Ejenbaum, Mauricio)
December 5, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Striking #8 Defendant's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Yisrael Heller. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-16145926 filed by En Corp USA by En Corp USA (Ejenbaum, Mauricio)
December 5, 2022 Filing 9 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #8 Defendant's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Yisrael Heller. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-16145926. Proposed Order Docketed as Main Document; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then resubmit the proposed order as instructed in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures (drz)
December 5, 2022 Filing 8 STRICKEN PER DE#10 -Defendant's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Yisrael Heller. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-16145926 by En Corp USA. Responses due by 12/19/2022 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Yisrael Heller)(Ejenbaum, Mauricio) Modified on 12/5/2022 (drz).
December 5, 2022 Filing 7 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to plaintiffs' complaint by En Corp USA. Attorney Mauricio Jose Ejenbaum added to party En Corp USA(pty:dft). Responses due by 12/19/2022 (Ejenbaum, Mauricio)
November 10, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to En Corp USA. (drz)
November 9, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE by Zeflon, LLC Summons En Corp USA (Mayberg, Menachem)
November 8, 2022 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (nan)
November 8, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE by Zeflon, LLC re #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet (Mayberg, Menachem)
November 8, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nan)
November 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-16084040, payment transferred from : 22-cv-23652-XXXX Zeflon LLC v. En Corp USA, filed by Zeflon, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Mayberg, Menachem)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zeflon, LLC v. En Corp USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zeflon, LLC
Represented By: Menachem Mendel Mayberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: En Corp USA
Represented By: Mauricio Jose Ejenbaum
Represented By: Yisrael Hiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encorp Switzerland AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?