Southeast Farms, Inc. v. American Fruit & Produce, Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Southeast Farms, Inc.
Defendant: American Fruit & Produce, Corp., Hugo Acosta, Jr., David Acosta, Michael Acosta and Daniel Acosta
Case Number: 1:2022cv23723
Filed: November 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Lisette M Reid
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 0499 Agricultural Commodities Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Southeast Farms, Inc. (De Falco, Steven)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS MATTER is before the Court on the Stipulation for Settlement #19 indicating that the Parties have reached a settlement of this matter. Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that on or before January 12, 2023, Plaintiff shall file a notice of voluntary dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Should Plaintiff file a notice of voluntary dismissal, the dismissal of this matter will be effective and self-executing upon its filing.Alternatively, if the Parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction beyond the aforementioned deadline, they are advised that they must file the settlement agreement for review--or a notice indicating the settlement agreement in full has already been filed to the docket--and file a joint stipulation of dismissal, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), that complies with the Court's Practices and Procedures and the Eleventh Circuit's holding in Anago Franchising, Inc. v. Shaz, LLC, 677 F.3d 1272 (11th Cir. 2012). All hearings and deadlines are CANCELED. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. This case is CLOSED for administrative purposes. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 12/13/2022. (nlf)
December 12, 2022 Filing 19 STIPULATION for Settlement under the Perishable Agricultural Commodities Act of 1930 by Southeast Farms, Inc. (De Falco, Steven) Modified Text on 12/13/2022 (ls).
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING Plantiff's Motions for Temporary Restraining Order #13 and for Preliminary Injunction #16 . THIS MATTER is before the Court sua sponte upon review of the record. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and the Magistrate Rules of the Local Rules for the Southern District of Florida, Plaintiff's Motions for Temporary Restraining Order #13 and for Preliminary Injunction #16 are REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid for report and recommendation. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 11/29/2022. (nlf)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS MATTER is before the Court sua sponte upon review of the record. In light of the Amended Complaint #12 filed on November 29, 2022 by Plaintiff, Plaintiff's earlier-filed Motion for Preliminary Injunction #9 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 11/29/2022. (nlf)
November 29, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction [DE 14] [DE 15] by Southeast Farms, Inc.. (De Falco, Steven)
November 29, 2022 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #13 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order With Notice and Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by Southeast Farms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - PACA License, #2 Exhibit 2 - PACA License, #3 Exhibit 3 - Trust Chart-Invoices, #4 Exhibit 4 - Blue Book Report)(De Falco, Steven)
November 29, 2022 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order With Notice and Motion for Expedited Discovery by Southeast Farms, Inc.. (De Falco, Steven)
November 29, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order With Notice and Motion for Expedited Discovery by Southeast Farms, Inc.. Responses due by 12/13/2022 (De Falco, Steven)
November 29, 2022 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Southeast Farms, Inc..(De Falco, Steven)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER STRIKING 5 Sealed Filing filed by Southeast Farms, Inc., 6 Sealed Filing filed by Southeast Farms, Inc., 7 Sealed Filing, filed by Southeast Farms, Inc., 8 Sealed Filing filed by Southeast Farms, Inc. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 11/16/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes)
November 15, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Southeast Farms, Inc.. (De Falco, Steven)
November 15, 2022 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 5 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (969255)
November 15, 2022 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 7 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (969255)
November 15, 2022 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 6 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (969255)
November 15, 2022 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 8 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (969255)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE AND PROCEDURES: ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Notice of Court Practice. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 11/14/2022. See attached document for full details. (nan)
November 14, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Daniel Acosta, David Acosta, Hugo Acosta, Jr, Michael Acosta, American Fruit & Produce, Corp.. (aao)
November 14, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southeast Farms, Inc. (De Falco, Steven)
November 14, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (aao)
November 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16098569, filed by Southeast Farms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) -American Fruit & Produce, #3 Summon(s) Hugo Acosta, Jr., #4 Summon(s) David Acosta, #5 Summon(s) Michael Acosta, #6 Summon(s) Daniel Acosta)(De Falco, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southeast Farms, Inc. v. American Fruit & Produce, Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southeast Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M. De Falco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Fruit & Produce, Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugo Acosta, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?