Regions Bank v. Mi Pulpe, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Regions Bank
Defendant: Mi Pulpe, LLC, MARCO ANTONIO VILLAR MONDRAGON and MARCO ANTONION VILLAR
Case Number: 1:2022cv23920
Filed: December 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 1819 Default of Promissory Note
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE by Regions Bank CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Roza, Francisco)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ON FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT PROCEDURE: Mi Pulpe, LLC response/answer due 2/1/2023; MARCO ANTONIO VILLAR MONDRAGON response/answer due 2/1/2023.( Responses due by 2/1/2023), Administratively Closing Case. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 1/5/2023. See attached document for full details. (pc)
January 4, 2023 Filing 12 Clerk's Entry of Default as to Mi Pulpe, LLC, Marco Antonio Villar Mondragon - Motions Terminated: #11 Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 1/4/2023. (amb)
January 4, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default AGAINST ALL DEFENDANTS as to Mi Pulpe, LLC, MARCO ANTONIO VILLAR MONDRAGON by Regions Bank. (Roza, Francisco)
January 3, 2023 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Regions Bank re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Mi Pulpe, LLC, #2 Affidavit Marco Antonio Villar)(Roza, Francisco)
December 8, 2022 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Mi Pulpe, LLC. (amb)
December 7, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Regions Bank re #1 Complaint, filed by Regions Bank (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Supplement) (Gabsi, Zina)
December 7, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to MARCO ANTONIO VILLAR MONDRAGON. (amb)
December 6, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Regions Bank re #1 Complaint, filed by Regions Bank (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Gabsi, Zina)
December 2, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zina Gabsi on behalf of Regions Bank (Gabsi, Zina)
December 1, 2022 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Alias Not Added. The Filer failed to add the alias information for the party(ies). The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (pc)
December 1, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Mi Pulpe, LLC, MARCO ANTONIO VILLAR MONDRAGON. (pc)
December 1, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pc)
December 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16139928, filed by Regions Bank. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Exhibit PROMISSORY NOTE, #5 Exhibit LOAN AGREEMENT, #6 Exhibit GUARANTY, #7 Exhibit SECURITY AGREEMENT, #8 Exhibit UCCS, #9 Exhibit NOTICE OF DEFAULT AND DEMAND, #10 Exhibit WORKBOOK)(Roza, Francisco)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Regions Bank v. Mi Pulpe, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regions Bank
Represented By: Francisco Javier Roza
Represented By: Zina Gabsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mi Pulpe, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARCO ANTONIO VILLAR MONDRAGON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARCO ANTONION VILLAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?