Thant et al. v. Veru, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Ewing, Kenneth Hepp and Dr. Myo Thant
Defendant: Veru, Inc., Mitchell Steiner and Michele Greco
Case Number: 1:2022cv23960
Filed: December 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Joan A Lenard
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
2 Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0078 Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2023 Filing 53 APPENDIX to #52 MOTION TO DISMISS #47 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Class Action Complaint for Violation of The Federal Securities Laws by Michele Greco, Mitchell Steiner, Veru, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Defendants Chart Categorizing the Challenged Statements, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - December 29, 2017 10-K, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - December 10, 2020 10-K, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - February 8, 2021 Press Release, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - February 8, 2021 Investor Call Transcript, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - February 10, 2021 10-Q, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - March 1, 2021 Press Release, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - May 12, 2021 Earnings Call, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - May 19, 2021 Press Release, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - December 2, 2021 10-K, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11 - January 31, 2022 Press Release, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12 - April 11, 2022 Press Release, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13 - May 11, 2022 Press Release, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14 - May 12, 2022 10-Q, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15 - May 12, 2022 Press Release, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16 - May 12, 2022 Earnings Call, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17 - June 7, 2022 Press Release, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 18 - August 11, 2022 10-Q, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 19 - November 9, 2022 Transcript of Pulmonary-Allergy Drugs Advisory Committee Meeting, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 20 - December 5, 2022 10-K, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 21 - February 28, 2023 Declination Report)(Miller, Brian)
November 14, 2023 Filing 52 MOTION TO DISMISS #47 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Class Action Complaint for Violation of The Federal Securities Laws by Michele Greco, Mitchell Steiner, Veru, Inc.. Responses due by 11/28/2023 (Miller, Brian)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #50 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Rachel A. Berger. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filing to Rachel A. Berger at rberger@zlk.com. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 10/18/2023. (ari)
September 18, 2023 Filing 50 Amended MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Rachel A. Berger. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See #48 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Myo Thant. Responses due by 10/2/2023 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Rachel A. Berger, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Cullin)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #48 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Rachel A. Berger. Local counsel did not include a statement consenting to designation as local counsel. For this reason, the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice [ECF No. 48] is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice may be refiled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 9/18/2023. (ari)
September 15, 2023 Filing 48 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for RACHEL A. BERGER. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-16921563 by Myo Thant. Responses due by 9/29/2023 (Attachments: #1 Certification CERTIFICATION OF RACHEL A. BERGER, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion)(O'Brien, Cullin)
September 15, 2023 Filing 47 First AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE FEDERAL SECURTIES LAWS against All Defendants filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Myo Thant. (Attachments: #1 Certification Amended Certification by Dr. Myo Thant, #2 Certification Certification by Karen Brounstein)(O'Brien, Cullin)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS MATTER is before the Court on the Parties' Joint Motion for Entry of Case Management Schedule (DE #43 ) ("Motion"). Upon review of the Motion and the record, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion is GRANTED. The briefing schedule in this matter is as follows:Lead Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint no later than September 15, 2023.Defendants shall file a response to the amended complaint by November 14, 2023. Defendants may file separate answers to the amended complaint. However, in the interest of judicial economy, Defendants shall file any responsive motions to the amended complaint jointly, which shall be no more than thirty (30) pages. If conflicts of position exist, Defendants must timely file a motion for leave to file separate responsive motions, in which they must describe what those conflicts are.Should Defendants chose to file a responsive motion, Lead Plaintiff shall file a response, which shall be no more than thirty (30) pages, by January 15, 2024; and Defendants shall file a reply, which shall be no more than fifteen (15) pages, by February 14, 2024. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 9/12/2023. (er01)
September 12, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings per DE 46 Order. Michele Greco response/answer due 11/14/2023; Mitchell Steiner response/answer due 11/14/2023; Veru, Inc. response/answer due 11/14/2023.( Amended Complaint due by 9/15/2023.), Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline: Michele Greco response/answer due 11/14/2023; Mitchell Steiner response/answer due 11/14/2023; Veru, Inc. response/answer due 11/14/2023. (amb)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS VERU INC., MITCHELL STEINER, AND MICHELE GRECO. ORDER granting #44 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Nikolas Leandro Volosin representing Veru, Inc. (Defendant) and Steiner, Mitchell (Defendant) and Greco, Michele (Defendant); withdrawn from case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 8/30/2023. See attached document for full details. (nan)
August 28, 2023 Filing 44 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Nikolas L. Volosin for / by Veru, Inc.. Responses due by 9/11/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Volosin, Nikolas)
August 1, 2023 Filing 43 Joint MOTION JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE re 14 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer,,,, JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE by Myo Thant. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [PROPOSED] CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE)(O'Brien, Cullin)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying as moot #23 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff ; denying as moot #24 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff ; denying as moot #24 MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel ; granting #16 MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel ; granting #16 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff ; denying as moot #19 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff ; denying as moot #19 MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel ; denying as moot #21 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff ; denying as moot #21 MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/27/2023. See attached document for full details. (amb)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ECF No. #39 Movant Dr. Myo Thant's Motion for Gregory M. Potrepka, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Gregory M. Potrepka may appear and participate in this action as counsel on behalf of Movant Dr. Myo Thant. The Clerk of Court is INSTRUCTED to provide electronic notification of all electronic filing to Gregory M. Potrepka at gpotrepka@zlk.com. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 6/15/2023. (jwn)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ECF No. #38 Movant Dr. Myo Thant's Motion for Shannon L. Hopkins, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Shannon L. Hopkins may appear and participate in this action as counsel on behalf of Movant Dr. Myo Thant. The Clerk of Court is INSTRUCTED to provide electronic notification of all electronic filing to Shannon L. Hopkins at shopkins@zlk.com. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 6/15/2023. (jwn)
June 14, 2023 Filing 39 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Gregory M. Potrepka. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-16691972 by Myo Thant. Responses due by 6/28/2023 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Gregory M. Potrepka, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Cullin)
June 14, 2023 Filing 38 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Shannon L. Hopkins. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-16689154. Filing Fee $ 200.00 by Myo Thant. Responses due by 6/28/2023 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification by Shannon L. Hopkins, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Cullin)
June 6, 2023 Filing 37 Notice of Ninety Days Expiring by Myo Thant re #32 Notice (Other) filed by Kenneth Skolnick, #33 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion, filed by Kranthi Gorlamari, #34 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Myo Thant, #31 Response in Support of Motion,,,,, filed by Myo Thant (O'Brien, Cullin)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Jacob A. Walker ; granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Jeffrey C. Block. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 4/11/2023. See attached document for full details. (pc)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE LISETTE M. REID. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 3/15/2023. See attached document for full details. (pc)
February 28, 2023 Filing 34 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Levi & Korsinsky, LLP MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Dr. Myo Thant DR. MYO THANTS REPLY IN FUTHER SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF filed by Myo Thant. (O'Brien, Cullin)
February 27, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by Kranthi Gorlamari re #17 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff KRANTHI GORLAMARI MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP filed by Kranthi Gorlamari (Desmond, Leo)
February 23, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE by Kenneth Skolnick OF NON-OPPOSITION OF DR. KENNETH SKOLNICK TO COMPETING MOTIONS FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF (Mark, Etan)
February 21, 2023 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Support re #24 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Goldberg Flores LLC MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Lowey Dannenberg, P.C. , #22 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Ryan Manzek , #17 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff KRANTHI GORLAMARI MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP , #21 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Kyle Christoffel MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Scott+Scott Attorneys at Law LLP MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Scott+Scott Attorneys at Law LLP MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Scott+Scott Attorneys at Law LLP , #16 MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Levi & Korsinsky, LLP MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Dr. Myo Thant , #23 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Dr. Kenneth Skolnick AND APPROVAL OF HIS SELECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW, #19 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Kenneth Hepp MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Block & Leviton LLP , #20 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Mehran Motamed MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Pomerantz LLP DR. MYO THANTS RESPONSE IN FUTHER SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND OPPOSITION TO COMPETING LEAD PLAINTIFF MOTIONS filed by Myo Thant. (O'Brien, Cullin)
February 21, 2023 Filing 30 NOTICE by Kyle Christoffel OF NON-OPPOSITION TO COMPETING MOTIONS FOR APPOINTMENT OF LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF SELECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL (Grossman, Lindsey)
February 21, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE by Goldberg Flores LLC NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION OF GOLDBERG FLORES LLC TO THE COMPETING MOTIONS FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF ITS SELECTION OF COUNSEL (Hooker, Lester)
February 21, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE by Kranthi Gorlamari re #24 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Goldberg Flores LLC MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Lowey Dannenberg, P.C. , #22 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Ryan Manzek , #17 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff KRANTHI GORLAMARI MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP , #21 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Kyle Christoffel MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Scott+Scott Attorneys at Law LLP MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Scott+Scott Attorneys at Law LLP MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Scott+Scott Attorneys at Law LLP , #16 MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Levi & Korsinsky, LLP MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Dr. Myo Thant , #23 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Dr. Kenneth Skolnick AND APPROVAL OF HIS SELECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW, #19 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Kenneth Hepp MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Block & Leviton LLP NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION OF KRANTHI GORLAMARI TO COMPETING MOTIONS FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF COUNSEL (Desmond, Leo)
February 21, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE by Kenneth Hepp Notice of Motion of Non-Opposition to competing motions for appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel (Gold, Christopher)
February 21, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by Mehran Motamed re #20 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Mehran Motamed MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Pomerantz LLP filed by Mehran Motamed (Komlossy, Emily)
February 20, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE by Ryan Manzek re #22 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Ryan Manzek NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION OF MOVANT RYAN MANZEK (Rosen, Laurence)
February 6, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Goldberg Flores LLC ( Responses due by 2/21/2023), MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Lowey Dannenberg, P.C. by Goldberg Flores LLC. Attorney Lester Rene Hooker added to party Goldberg Flores LLC(pty:mov). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Affidavit, #4 Exhibit A - Loss Chart, #5 Exhibit B - Certification, #6 Exhibit C - LD resume, #7 Exhibit D - SW resume, #8 Exhibit E - Notice)(Hooker, Lester)
February 6, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Dr. Kenneth Skolnick AND APPROVAL OF HIS SELECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Kenneth Skolnick. Attorney Etan Mark added to party Kenneth Skolnick(pty:mov). Responses due by 2/21/2023 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mark, Etan)
February 6, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Ryan Manzek by Ryan Manzek. Attorney Laurence Matthew Rosen added to party Ryan Manzek(pty:mov). Responses due by 2/21/2023 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosen, Laurence)
February 6, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Kyle Christoffel ( Responses due by 2/21/2023), MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Scott+Scott Attorneys at Law LLP by Kyle Christoffel. Attorney Lindsey Caryn Grossman added to party Kyle Christoffel(pty:mov). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Thomas Laughlin in Support of Motion, #3 Exhibit A - PSLRA Notice, #4 Exhibit B - Loss Chart, #5 Exhibit C - Movant Certification, #6 Exhibit D - Movant Declaration, #7 Exhibit E - Firm Resume of S+S, #8 Exhibit F - Firm Resume of C&L, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Grossman, Lindsey)
February 6, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Mehran Motamed ( Responses due by 2/21/2023), MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Pomerantz LLP by Mehran Motamed. Attorney Emily Cornelia Komlossy added to party Mehran Motamed(pty:mov). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit A-Loss Chart, #3 Exhibit B-PSLRA Notice, #4 Exhibit C-Certification, #5 Exhibit D-Motamed Declaration, #6 Exhibit E-Firm Resume, #7 Exhibit F-Firm Resume, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Komlossy, Emily)
February 6, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Kenneth Hepp ( Responses due by 2/21/2023), MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Block & Leviton LLP by Kenneth Hepp. Attorney Christopher Chagas Gold added to party Kenneth Hepp(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Chris Gold In Support of Motion, #3 Exhibit A - Veru PR, #4 Exhibit B - PSLRA Cert VERU, #5 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, #6 Exhibit D - B&L Firm Resume, #7 Exhibit E - Edelsberg Law Firm Resume, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Gold, Christopher)
February 6, 2023 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #17 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff KRANTHI GORLAMARI MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP filed by Kranthi Gorlamari. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Desmond, Leo)
February 6, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff KRANTHI GORLAMARI ( Responses due by 2/21/2023), MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP by Kranthi Gorlamari. Attorney Leo Wassner Desmond added to party Kranthi Gorlamari(pty:mov). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Desmond, Leo)
February 6, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Levi & Korsinsky, LLP ( Responses due by 2/21/2023), MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Dr. Myo Thant by Myo Thant. Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party Myo Thant(pty:mov). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #2 Affidavit Declaration Attaching Exhibits, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A - PSLRA Certification, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B - Loss Chart, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C - PSLRA Notice, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D - Declaration of Movant, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E - Firm Resume of Levi & Korsinsky, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F - Firm Resume of Cullin O'Brien Law, #9 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion)(O'Brien, Cullin)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 1/5/2023. See attached document for full details. (pc)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS MATTER is before the Court on #11 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint. Having reviewed the Motion and the underlying record, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that #11 Defendants' Motion for Extension is GRANTED as follows:Defendants shall not be required to answer or otherwise respond to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint until after the Court appoints lead Plaintiff(s) and lead counsel, and said lead Plaintiff(s) either file(s) an amended consolidated complaint or designates an operative complaint.Within seven (7) days after the entry of an order appointing lead Plaintiff(s) and lead counsel, lead counsel for the appointed lead Plaintiff(s) shall advise counsel for Defendants whether lead Plaintiff(s) intend to proceed with #1 the Complaint or file an amended complaint, and counsel for lead Plaintiff(s) and Defendants shall meet and confer and submit to the Court a proposed schedule for the filing of an amended complaint and/or the briefing of Defendants' motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 1/5/2023. (sgm)
January 3, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nikolas Leandro Volosin on behalf of Michele Greco, Mitchell Steiner, Veru, Inc.. Attorney Nikolas Leandro Volosin added to party Michele Greco(pty:dft), Attorney Nikolas Leandro Volosin added to party Mitchell Steiner(pty:dft), Attorney Nikolas Leandro Volosin added to party Veru, Inc.(pty:dft). (Volosin, Nikolas)
December 29, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samantha J. Kavanaugh on behalf of Michele Greco, Mitchell Steiner, Veru, Inc.. Attorney Samantha J. Kavanaugh added to party Michele Greco(pty:dft), Attorney Samantha J. Kavanaugh added to party Mitchell Steiner(pty:dft), Attorney Samantha J. Kavanaugh added to party Veru, Inc.(pty:dft). (Kavanaugh, Samantha)
December 29, 2022 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Michele Greco, Mitchell Steiner, Veru, Inc.. Attorney Brian Paul Miller added to party Michele Greco(pty:dft), Attorney Brian Paul Miller added to party Mitchell Steiner(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Brian)
December 29, 2022 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Veru, Inc. (Miller, Brian)
December 14, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Christopher Ewing. Veru, Inc. served on 12/8/2022, response/answer due 12/29/2022. (Gold, Christopher)
December 7, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jeffrey C. Block. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-16154073 by Christopher Ewing. Responses due by 12/21/2022 (Gold, Christopher)
December 7, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jake A. Walker. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-16154062 by Christopher Ewing. Responses due by 12/21/2022 (Gold, Christopher)
December 7, 2022 Filing 6 AMENDED Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Judge Joan A. Lenard no longer assigned to case. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (jmd)
December 6, 2022 Filing 5 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Jeffrey C. Block and Jacob A. Walker, mailing date December 6, 2022, (pt)
December 6, 2022 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT Certification Pursuant to Federal Securities Laws signed by: Plaintiff, Christopher K. Ewing re #1 Complaint by Christopher Ewing (Gold, Christopher)
December 5, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Veru, Inc.. (pc)
December 5, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Joan A. Lenard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pc)
December 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16148138, filed by Christopher Ewing. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Gold, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thant et al. v. Veru, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Ewing
Represented By: Christopher Chagas Gold
Represented By: Jacob A. Walker
Represented By: Scott Adam Edelsberg
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Hepp
Represented By: Christopher Chagas Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Myo Thant
Represented By: Gregory M. Potrepka
Represented By: Shannon Lee Hopkins
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Represented By: Rachel A. Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veru, Inc.
Represented By: Nikolas Leandro Volosin
Represented By: Brian Paul Miller
Represented By: Samantha J. Kavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Steiner
Represented By: Samantha J. Kavanaugh
Represented By: Brian Paul Miller
Represented By: Nikolas Leandro Volosin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Greco
Represented By: Brian Paul Miller
Represented By: Nikolas Leandro Volosin
Represented By: Samantha J. Kavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?