MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv24131
Filed: December 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Jose E Martinez
2 Judge: Alicia M Otazo-Reyes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 2/17/2023. See attached document for full details. (aa00)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES: Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Case No. 22-cv-24133 is CONSOLIDATED with the cases already consolidated under Case No. 22-cv-24131 as follows: The Clerk of Court is instructed to CLOSE Case No. 22-cv-24133 for administrative purposes only. All future filings in the cases shall be made under Case No. 22-cv-24131 only. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/14/2023. See attached document for full details. (nan) Modified to correct Judge signature date on 2/16/2023 (asl).
February 15, 2023 Filing 21 STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER by MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Protective Order)(McGovern, Amanda)
February 3, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Markel Arrizabalaga as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for July 13, 2023 at 9:30 a.m.. (Arrizabalaga, Markel)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Markel Arrizabalaga via Zoom. Mediation Hearing set for 7/13/2023 09:30 AM Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/1/2023. See attached document for full details. (drz)
February 1, 2023 Filing 18 Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Markel Arrizabalaga as Mediator. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McGovern, Amanda)
January 13, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Joseph William Donato, III (Donato, Joseph)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the above-styled cases are CONSOLIDATED as follows: The Clerk of Court is instructed to CLOSE Case No. 22-cv-24149, Case No. 22- cv-24167, and Case No. 22-cv-24169 for administrative purposes only. All future filings in the four cases shall be made in Case No. 22-cv-24131 only. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/12/2023. See attached document for full details. (drz)
January 12, 2023 Filing 15 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Pennekamp, John)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Amended Pleadings due by 3/12/2023., Discovery due by 9/19/2023., Expert Discovery due by 9/19/2023., Joinder of Parties due by 3/12/2023., Mediation Deadline 10/3/2023., In Limine Motions due by 10/11/2023., Dispositive Motions due by 10/11/2023., Motions due by 10/11/2023., Pretrial Stipulation due by 1/2/2024., Jury Trial set for 1/16/2024 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 1/9/2024 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.). Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/11/2023. See attached document for full details. (drz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
January 11, 2023 Filing 13 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Joint Proposed Scheduling Order)(McGovern, Amanda)
January 11, 2023 Filing 12 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSP Recovery Holding Series 01, LLC, Other Affiliate Hazel Holdings I LLC, Other Affiliate Hazel Partners Holdings LLC for MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC (McGovern, Amanda)
January 11, 2023 Filing 11 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #9 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (kpe)
January 10, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Raquel Alicia Toral (Toral, Raquel)
January 10, 2023 Filing 9 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSP Recovery Holding Series 01, LLC for MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC (Toral, Raquel)
January 4, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Raquel Alicia Toral on behalf of MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC. Attorney Raquel Alicia Toral added to party MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC(pty:pla). (Toral, Raquel)
December 29, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company re #5 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report,,, NOTICE OF FILING COPY OF STATE COURT DOCKET SHEET (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet State Court) (Pennekamp, John)
December 27, 2022 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Pennekamp, John)
December 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ON POST-REMOVAL PROCEDURES, AND REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES (Joint Scheduling Report due by 1/12/2023), Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/22/2022. See attached document for full details. (pc)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Jose E. Martinez recused. Case reassigned to Judge Beth Bloom for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 12/22/2022. See attached document for full details. (vjk)
December 22, 2022 Filing 3 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Mercedes M. Rodriguez, mailing date December 22, 2022. (cw)
December 21, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nan)
December 21, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16188870, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint and other State Court Records)(Pennekamp, John) Modified Attachment Descriptions on 12/21/2022 (nan).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC
Represented By: David Lee DaPonte
Represented By: Amanda Marie McGovern
Represented By: Ana C Malave
Represented By: Jimmy Wayne Mintz
Represented By: Jordan Matthew Macejka
Represented By: Mercedes M Rodriguez
Represented By: Natalie Marie Rico
Represented By: Robert Ralph Jimenez
Represented By: Sylmarie Trujillo
Represented By: Raquel Alicia Toral
Represented By: Joseph William Donato, III
Represented By: Erimar Von der Osten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: John Michael Pennekamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?