MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv24250
Filed: December 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PAPERLESS ORDER dismissing case with prejudice pursuant to the parties' #24 Joint Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 6/16/2023. (mja)
June 15, 2023 Filing 24 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint by MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Malave, Ana)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER administratively closing case in light of #22 Notice of Settlement, which indicates that this matter has settled in full. The parties are hereby notified that, within sixty (60) days of the date of this Order, they must file a Stipulation or Notice of Dismissal along with any other pertinent document necessary to conclude this action. Any pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 4/12/2023. (mja)
April 12, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Settlement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Pennekamp, John)
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 MSP's Motion to Extend Time to Join Parties, to File Motions to Amend the Complaint, and to File Witness List and #17 MSP's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint on or before May 11, 2023. The Parties shall join any additional parties on or before May 11, 2023, and submit written lists containing the names and addresses of all witnesses intended to be called at trial on or before June 2, 2023. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 3/28/2023. (mja)
March 28, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings per DE 21 Order. Amended Complaint due by 5/11/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 5/11/2023. (amb)
March 22, 2023 Filing 20 Plaintiff's REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Join Parties, to file Motions to Amend the Complaint, and to file Witness List filed by MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC. (Malave, Ana)
March 15, 2023 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Join Parties, to file Motions to Amend the Complaint, and to file Witness List , #17 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Replies due by 3/22/2023. (Pennekamp, John)
March 13, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings per DE 18 Order re #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Join Parties, to file Motions to Amend the Complaint, and to file Witness List . Responses due by 3/15/2023 (amb)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER. On or before March 15, 2023, Defendant shall file a response to #12 MSP's Motion to Extend Time to Join Parties, to File Motions to Amend the Complaint, and to File Witness List and #17 MSP's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 3/13/2023. (mja)
March 10, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Amended Complaint)(Malave, Ana)
March 10, 2023 Filing 16 Witness List by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.. (Pennekamp, John)
March 10, 2023 Filing 15 Witness List by MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC.. (Malave, Ana)
March 6, 2023 Filing 14 STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER by MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Protective Order)(McGovern, Amanda)
March 1, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings per DE 13 Order re #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Join Parties, to file Motions to Amend the Complaint, and to file Witness List . Responses due by 3/8/2023. (amb)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER. On or before March 8, 2023, Defendant shall file a response to #12 MSP's Motion to Extend Time to Join Parties, to File Motions to Amend the Complaint, and to File Witness List. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 3/1/2023. (mja)
March 1, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Join Parties, to file Motions to Amend the Complaint, and to file Witness List by MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC. Responses due by 3/15/2023 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Malave, Ana)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 2/13/2023. See attached document for full details. (mdc)
January 26, 2023 Reset (to reflect year 2024) Jury Trial for 1/16/2024 before Judge Darrin P. Gayles. per DE #10 (mr1)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 1/16/2021 before Judge Darrin P. Gayles., Calendar Call set for 1/10/2024 09:30 AM before Judge Darrin P. Gayles., Status Conference set for 11/1/2023 10:00 AM before Judge Darrin P. Gayles.), ( Mediation Deadline 10/9/2023.). Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 1/24/2023. See attached document for full details. (drz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
January 20, 2023 Filing 9 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Proposed Order)(Malave, Ana)
January 20, 2023 Filing 8 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSP Recovery Holding Series 01, LLC, Other Affiliate Hazel Holdings I LLC, Other Affiliate Hazel Partners Holdings LLC for MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC (Malave, Ana)
January 20, 2023 Filing 7 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Pennekamp, John)
January 13, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ana C Malave on behalf of MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC. Attorney Ana C Malave added to party MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC(pty:pla). (Malave, Ana)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Pursuant to S.D. Fla. Local Rule 16.1, on or before January 20, 2023, the parties shall prepare and file a Joint Scheduling Report, as well as Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements.The parties shall also file a Proposed Scheduling Order, adhering to the format and guidance of the attached form. If the parties deviate in any way from that format and guidance, they shall contemporaneously submit a written explanation, which provides their purported justification for each and every deviation. If the parties fail to submit such written explanation, the Court may enter a Scheduling Order that does not take into account the parties' proposed dates.Failure to comply with this Order shall be grounds for dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 1/6/2023. (mja)
January 6, 2023 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Pennekamp, John)
December 30, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 12/30/2022. (mja)
December 30, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pc)
December 30, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16205553, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record)(Pennekamp, John) (Complaint pg. 1 of Exh. A, No Answer/Motion to Dismiss Filed) Modified text on 12/30/2022 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC
Represented By: Robert Ralph Jimenez
Represented By: Amanda Marie McGovern
Represented By: Jimmy Wayne Mintz
Represented By: Sylmarie Trujillo
Represented By: Ana C Malave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: John Michael Pennekamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?