MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC v. American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC
Defendant: American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company and IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2023cv20105
Filed: January 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Alicia M Otazo-Reyes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1395 HHS: Adverse Reimbursement Review
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION before Joseph Matthews. Mediation Hearing set for 4/6/2023 at 01:00 PM. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/23/2023. See attached document for full details. (caw)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Supplemental NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Joseph M. Matthews as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 4/6/2023 at 1:00 p.m.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Joint Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation)(Rico, Natalie)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER: THIS CAUSE is before the Court upon a sua sponte review of the record. On February 2, 2023, the Court ordered the parties to jointly file a proposed order scheduling mediation, setting forth their selected mediator pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, and a time, date, and place for mediation. ECF No. #14 ("Scheduling Order "). On February 23, 2023, the parties filed a notice of mediator selection, but failed to designate a time for the mediation. ECF No. #16 ("Notice"). Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that no later than March 1, 2023, the parties shall file a supplemental notice and proposed order scheduling mediation, as required by the Scheduling Order. Failure to comply will result in sanctions, including, but not limited to, dismissal without prejudice without further notice. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (aun)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Joseph M. Matthews as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 4/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Joint Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation)(Rico, Natalie)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Smith, Nicole)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Amended Pleadings due by 4/3/2023. Discovery due by 8/22/2023. Fact Discovery due by 8/22/2023. Expert Discovery due by 8/22/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 4/3/2023. Mediation Deadline 9/5/2023. In Limine Motions due by 9/13/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 9/13/2023. Motions due by 9/13/2023. Pretrial Stipulation due by 12/4/2023. JURY TRIAL set for 12/18/2023 at 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom. CALENDAR CALL set for 12/12/2023 at 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation Deadline 9/5/2023. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/2/2023. See attached document for full details. (caw) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASE. 23-cv-20118-BB is consolidated with 23-cv-20105-BB. All future filings in the three cases shall be made under Case No. 23-cv-20105 only. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/1/2023. See attached document for full details. (jas)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. Replies due by 2/8/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Rico, Natalie)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Scheduling Order)(Macejka, Jordan)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC identifying Corporate Parent VRM MSP Recovery Partners, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, Corporate Parent Virage Recovery Master LP, Corporate Parent Series MRCS, a designated series of MDA, Series LLC, Corporate Parent MDA, Series LLC for MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC (Rico, Natalie)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American Family Insurance Mutual Holding Company for American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Smith, Nicole)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Responses due by 2/1/2023 (Smith, Nicole)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE by American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company re #4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report,, Set Response/Answer Due Deadline, Notice of Filing Docket Sheets of State Court Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Docket State Court Case 35872, #2 Exhibit B - Docket State Court Case 35658) (Duke, Samantha)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES: ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Case No. 23-cv-20120 and Case No. 23-cv-20106 are CONSOLIDATED into Master Case No. 23-cv-20105 as follows: 1. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to CLOSE Case No. 23-cv-20120 and Case No. 23-cv-20106 for administrative purposes only. 2. All future filings in the three cases shall be made under Case No. 23-cv-20105 only. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/12/2023. See attached document for full details. (caw) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/12/2023. See attached document for full details. (caw)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE by American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Notice of Filing in State Court File 35872) (Duke, Samantha)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON POST-REMOVAL PROCEDURES, AND REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. (Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties due by 2/1/2023), American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company response/answer to complaint due 1/18/2023. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/11/2023. See attached document for full details. (jas)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (aao)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (aao)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16231852, filed by American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company f/ka IDS Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court filings/Amended Complaint Claim 518559-1)No Answer/Motion to Dismiss. (Duke, Samantha) Modified attached on 1/11/2023 (aao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC v. American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Emily Carson Burke
Represented By: Nicole Sieb Smith
Represented By: Samantha Crawford Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Emily Carson Burke
Represented By: Samantha Crawford Duke
Represented By: Nicole Sieb Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC
Represented By: Jordan Matthew Macejka
Represented By: Natalie Marie Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?