MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC v. American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC
Defendant: American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company and IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2023cv20108
Filed: January 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2023 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION TO DISMISS #15 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Smith, Nicole)
February 21, 2023 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION TO DISMISS #15 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. Replies due by 2/28/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Rico, Natalie)
February 6, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS #15 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Responses due by 2/21/2023 (Smith, Nicole)
January 31, 2023 Filing 17 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American Family Insurance Mutual Holding Company for American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Smith, Nicole)
January 27, 2023 Filing 16 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC identifying Corporate Parent VRM MSP Recovery Partners, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, Corporate Parent Virage Recovery Master LP, Corporate Parent Series MRCS, a designated series of MDA, Series LLC, Corporate Parent MDA Series LLC for MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC (Rico, Natalie)
January 27, 2023 Filing 15 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company, filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Rico, Natalie)
January 26, 2023 Filing 14 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Scheduling Order)(Cristobal, Mercedes)
January 26, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Compliance by American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company re #6 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report,, Set/Reset Deadlines, (Smith, Nicole)
January 26, 2023 Filing 12 STATUS REPORT on Removal by American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Smith, Nicole)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #10 the Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Complaint. The Defendant must file its response to the Complaint by February 6, 2023. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman (bto)
January 20, 2023 Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline per DE 11 Order. American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company response/answer due 2/6/2023. (amb)
January 18, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Smith, Nicole)
January 17, 2023 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Mercedes Rodriguez Cristobal has provided this Court with a current Certificate of Good Standing from The Florida Bar, and her bar member status with The Florida Bar is now eligible to practice law in Florida, Member in Good Standing. Therefore, Attorney Mercedes Rodriguez Cristobal's status in this Court's Bar is now in good standing. (pt)
January 13, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC re 4 Clerk's Notice - Attorney Admissions,,,,, Notice of Good Standing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing Mercedes Rodriguez Cristobal) (Cristobal, Mercedes)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING REMOVAL STATUS REPORT AND JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, ( Status Report due by 1/27/2023.) Joint Scheduling Report due by 1/27/2023. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 1/13/2023. See attached document for full details. (cds)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Case Number 23-cv-20112-RKA and Case Number 23-cv-20124-RKA are hereby CONSOLIDATED into Case Number 23-cv-20108-RKA. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 1/12/2023. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-20108-RKA, 1:23-cv-20112-RKA, 1:23-cv-20124-RKA (mab)
January 12, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE by American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Removal in State Court 35675) (Duke, Samantha)
January 12, 2023 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney Mercedes Rodriguez Cristobal, Florida Bar Number 492345. Please note that your member status on The Florida Bar website indicates your status is: Delinquent Fees Not Eligible to Practice Law in Florida. Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Rules Governing the Admission, Practice, Peer Review, and Discipline of Attorneys, Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, [t]o remain an attorney in good standing of the bar of this Court, each member must remain an active attorney in good standing of The Florida Bar. Additionally, Rule 9(c) requires you to notify this Court within thirty (30) days of your inactive status with The Florida Bar. Rule 9(c) further dictates that [u]pon receipt of notice of such action, the attorneys ability to practice before this Court shall be administratively suspended and the attorney may not resume practice before this Court until they certify that they are an active attorney in good standing with The Florida Bar. Therefore your status with this Courts Bar will be changed to suspended as [t]here is no inactive status other than for government attorneys in this Court. A Clerk's Notice has been docketed in all of your open cases. (cw)
January 11, 2023 Filing 3 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (nwn)
January 11, 2023 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nwn)
January 11, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16232135, filed by American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company f/ka IDS Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint & Amended Complaint Claim 518559-2)(Duke, Samantha) No Answer/Motion To Dismiss Filed. Modified Text/Attachment Description on 1/11/2023 (nwn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC v. American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Emily Carson Burke
Represented By: Nicole Sieb Smith
Represented By: Samantha Crawford Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Emily Carson Burke
Represented By: Nicole Sieb Smith
Represented By: Samantha Crawford Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC
Represented By: Mercedes Rodriguez Cristobal
Represented By: Natalie Marie Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?