United States of America v. Campos et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Javier Campos, JBC Tax Services LLC, WK Tax Services Inc., Cutler Bay Tax Services Inc., N.L.T.S., Inc., Tax Services Group Corp., David DePablo, Krystallee Gonzalez, Alvaro Jauregui, Katya Rojas and Patricia Vanegas
Case Number: 1:2023cv21227
Filed: March 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Lauren Fleischer Louis
Referring Judge: K Michael Moore
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2023 Filing 27 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by United States of America. Patricia Vanegas served on 5/15/2023, response/answer due 6/5/2023. (Fuller, Samuel)
May 22, 2023 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. David DePablo waiver sent on 3/30/2023, response/answer due 5/30/2023. (Fuller, Samuel)
May 22, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bensen V. Solivan on behalf of United States of America. Attorney Bensen V. Solivan added to party United States of America(pty:pla). (Solivan, Bensen)
May 19, 2023 Filing 24 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint for Permanent Injunction by David DePablo. (Garvin, David)
May 18, 2023 Filing 23 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint for Permanent Injunction by Patricia Vanegas. (Garvin, David)
May 18, 2023 Filing 22 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint for Permanent Injunction by Katya Rojas. (Garvin, David)
May 18, 2023 Filing 21 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint for Permanent Injunction by Alvaro Jauregui. (Garvin, David)
May 18, 2023 Filing 20 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint for Permanent Injunction by Krystallee Gonzalez. (Garvin, David)
May 18, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexandra Arlene Garvin on behalf of David DePablo, Krystallee Gonzalez, Alvaro Jauregui, Katya Rojas, Patricia Vanegas. Attorney Alexandra Arlene Garvin added to party David DePablo(pty:dft), Attorney Alexandra Arlene Garvin added to party Krystallee Gonzalez(pty:dft), Attorney Alexandra Arlene Garvin added to party Alvaro Jauregui(pty:dft), Attorney Alexandra Arlene Garvin added to party Katya Rojas(pty:dft), Attorney Alexandra Arlene Garvin added to party Patricia Vanegas(pty:dft). (Garvin, Alexandra)
May 18, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Michael Garvin on behalf of David DePablo, Krystallee Gonzalez, Alvaro Jauregui, Katya Rojas, Patricia Vanegas. Attorney David Michael Garvin added to party David DePablo(pty:dft), Attorney David Michael Garvin added to party Krystallee Gonzalez(pty:dft), Attorney David Michael Garvin added to party Alvaro Jauregui(pty:dft), Attorney David Michael Garvin added to party Katya Rojas(pty:dft), Attorney David Michael Garvin added to party Patricia Vanegas(pty:dft). (Garvin, David)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING PRETRIAL DISCOVERY MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LAUREN F. LOUIS. PURSUANT to 28 U.S.C. 636 and the Magistrate Judge Rules of the Local Rules of the Southern District of Florida, the above-captioned Cause is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis to take all necessary and proper action as required by law with respect to any and all pretrial discovery matters. Any motion affecting deadlines set by the Court's Scheduling Order is excluded from this referral, unless specifically referred by separate Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall comply with Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis's discovery procedures. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore (rfr)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS PRETRIAL ORDER. This order has been entered upon the filing of the complaint. Plaintiff's counsel is hereby ORDERED to forward to all defendants, upon receipt of a responsive pleading, a copy of this Order. It is further ORDERED that S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1 shall apply to this case and the parties shall hold a scheduling conference no later than twenty (20) days after the filing of the first responsive pleading by the last responding defendant, or within sixty (60) days after the filing of the complaint, whichever occurs first. However, if all defendants have not been served by the expiration of this deadline, Plaintiff shall move for an enlargement of time to hold the scheduling conference, not to exceed 90 days from the filing of the Complaint. Within ten (10) days of the scheduling conference, counsel shall file a joint scheduling report. Failure of counsel to file a joint scheduling report within the deadlines set forth above may result in dismissal, default, and the imposition of other sanctions including attorney's fees and costs. The parties should note that the time period for filing a joint scheduling report is not tolled by the filing of any other pleading, such as an amended complaint or Rule 12 motion. The scheduling conference may be held via telephone. At the conference, the parties shall comply with the following agenda that the Court adopts from S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1: (1) Documents (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.1 and 2) - The parties shall determine the procedure for exchanging a copy of, or a description by category and location of, all documents and other evidence that is reasonably available and that a party expects to offer or may offer if the need arises. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(B). (a) Documents include computations of the nature and extent of any category of damages claimed by the disclosing party unless the computations are privileged or otherwise protected from disclosure. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(C). (b) Documents include insurance agreements which may be at issue with the satisfaction of the judgment. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(D). (2) List of Witnesses - The parties shall exchange the name, address and telephone number of each individual known to have knowledge of the facts supporting the material allegations of the pleading filed by the party. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(A). The parties have a continuing obligation to disclose this information. (3) Discussions and Deadlines (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.2) - The parties shall discuss the nature and basis of their claims and defenses and the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case. Failure to comply with this Order or to exchange the information listed above may result in sanctions and/or the exclusion of documents or witnesses at the time of trial. S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.I. The parties are hereby on notice that this Court requires all filings to be formatted in 12 point Times New Roman font and double spaced, including any footnotes, with one inch margins on all sides. Failure to follow these formatting guidelines may result in the filing being stricken, any opposing filing being granted by default, and the imposition of other sanctions, including attorney's fees and costs. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. The parties shall seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing.... Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC, 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted). Pursuant to Administrative Order 2016-70 of the Southern District of Florida and consistent with the Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit's Local Rules and Internal Operating Procedures, within three (3) days of the conclusion of a trial or other proceeding, parties must file via CM/ECF electronic versions of documentary exhibits admitted into evidence, including photographs of non-documentary physical exhibits. The Parties are directed to comply with each of the requirements set forth in Administrative Order 2016-70 unless directed otherwise by the Court.Telephonic appearances are not permitted for any purpose. Upon reaching a settlement in this matter the parties are instructed to notify the Court by telephone and to file a Notice of Settlement within twenty-four (24) hours. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore (rfr)
May 12, 2023 Filing 15 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint for Permanent Injunction by Javier Campos, Cutler Bay Tax Services Inc., JBC Tax Services LLC, N.L.T.S., Inc., Tax Services Group Corp., WK Tax Services Inc.. (Garvin, David)
May 11, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by United States of America. Alvaro Jauregui served on 5/9/2023, response/answer due 5/30/2023. (Fuller, Samuel)
May 9, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by United States of America. Katya Rojas served on 5/4/2023, response/answer due 5/25/2023. (Fuller, Samuel)
April 19, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rolando Casais, Jr on behalf of Javier Campos, Cutler Bay Tax Services Inc., JBC Tax Services LLC, N.L.T.S., Inc., Tax Services Group Corp., WK Tax Services Inc.. Attorney Rolando Casais, Jr added to party Javier Campos(pty:dft), Attorney Rolando Casais, Jr added to party Cutler Bay Tax Services Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Rolando Casais, Jr added to party JBC Tax Services LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Rolando Casais, Jr added to party N.L.T.S., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Rolando Casais, Jr added to party Tax Services Group Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Rolando Casais, Jr added to party WK Tax Services Inc.(pty:dft). (Casais, Rolando)
April 19, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexandra Arlene Garvin on behalf of Javier Campos, Cutler Bay Tax Services Inc., JBC Tax Services LLC, N.L.T.S., Inc., Tax Services Group Corp., WK Tax Services Inc.. Attorney Alexandra Arlene Garvin added to party Javier Campos(pty:dft), Attorney Alexandra Arlene Garvin added to party Cutler Bay Tax Services Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Alexandra Arlene Garvin added to party JBC Tax Services LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alexandra Arlene Garvin added to party N.L.T.S., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Alexandra Arlene Garvin added to party Tax Services Group Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Alexandra Arlene Garvin added to party WK Tax Services Inc.(pty:dft). (Garvin, Alexandra)
April 19, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Michael Garvin on behalf of Javier Campos, Cutler Bay Tax Services Inc., JBC Tax Services LLC, N.L.T.S., Inc., Tax Services Group Corp., WK Tax Services Inc.. Attorney David Michael Garvin added to party Javier Campos(pty:dft), Attorney David Michael Garvin added to party Cutler Bay Tax Services Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David Michael Garvin added to party JBC Tax Services LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Michael Garvin added to party N.L.T.S., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David Michael Garvin added to party Tax Services Group Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney David Michael Garvin added to party WK Tax Services Inc.(pty:dft). (Garvin, David)
April 19, 2023 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. WK Tax Services Inc. waiver sent on 3/30/2023, response/answer due 5/30/2023. (Fuller, Samuel)
April 19, 2023 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Tax Services Group Corp. waiver sent on 3/30/2023, response/answer due 5/30/2023. (Fuller, Samuel)
April 19, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. N.L.T.S., Inc. waiver sent on 3/30/2023, response/answer due 5/30/2023. (Fuller, Samuel)
April 19, 2023 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. JBC Tax Services LLC waiver sent on 3/30/2023, response/answer due 5/30/2023. (Fuller, Samuel)
April 19, 2023 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Javier Campos waiver sent on 3/30/2023, response/answer due 5/30/2023. (Fuller, Samuel)
April 19, 2023 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Cutler Bay Tax Services Inc. waiver sent on 3/30/2023, response/answer due 5/30/2023. (Fuller, Samuel)
March 30, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Javier Campos, Cutler Bay Tax Services Inc., David DePablo, Krystallee Gonzalez, JBC Tax Services LLC, Alvaro Jauregui, N.L.T.S., Inc., Katya Rojas, Tax Services Group Corp., Patricia Vanegas, WK Tax Services Inc.. (aao)
March 29, 2023 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge K. Michael Moore. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (aao)
March 29, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Fuller, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Campos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Samuel G. Fuller
Represented By: Bensen V. Solivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javier Campos
Represented By: David Michael Garvin
Represented By: Alexandra Arlene Garvin
Represented By: Rolando Casais, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JBC Tax Services LLC
Represented By: David Michael Garvin
Represented By: Alexandra Arlene Garvin
Represented By: Rolando Casais, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WK Tax Services Inc.
Represented By: David Michael Garvin
Represented By: Alexandra Arlene Garvin
Represented By: Rolando Casais, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cutler Bay Tax Services Inc.
Represented By: David Michael Garvin
Represented By: Alexandra Arlene Garvin
Represented By: Rolando Casais, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N.L.T.S., Inc.
Represented By: David Michael Garvin
Represented By: Alexandra Arlene Garvin
Represented By: Rolando Casais, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tax Services Group Corp.
Represented By: David Michael Garvin
Represented By: Alexandra Arlene Garvin
Represented By: Rolando Casais, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David DePablo
Represented By: David Michael Garvin
Represented By: Alexandra Arlene Garvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krystallee Gonzalez
Represented By: David Michael Garvin
Represented By: Alexandra Arlene Garvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvaro Jauregui
Represented By: David Michael Garvin
Represented By: Alexandra Arlene Garvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katya Rojas
Represented By: David Michael Garvin
Represented By: Alexandra Arlene Garvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Vanegas
Represented By: David Michael Garvin
Represented By: Alexandra Arlene Garvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?