Itow.Boats, LLC v. M/V Summertime et al
Plaintiff: Itow.Boats, LLC
Defendant: M/V Summertime, Wilson Lopez, Sonia Sibaja, Wilson Lopez, M.D. and Sonia A. Sibaja
Case Number: 1:2023cv22475
Filed: July 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Becerra
Referring Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS: GRANTING #19 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by M/V Summertime, Sonia A. Sibaja, Wilson Lopez, M.D. Joint Status Report due by 10/24/2023. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 8/25/2023. See attached document for full details. (wce)
August 24, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE by Wilson Lopez, M.D., M/V Summertime, Sonia A. Sibaja re #19 MOTION to Compel Arbitration of No Objection by Plaintiff (Cooke, Adam)
August 23, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Wilson Lopez, M.D., M/V Summertime, Sonia A. Sibaja. Responses due by 9/6/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Cooke, Adam)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING BENCH TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Calendar Call set for 8/6/2024 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II. Bench Trial set for 8/12/2024 in Miami Division before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II. Amended Pleadings due by 10/2/2023. Discovery due by 4/16/2024. Expert Discovery due by 4/16/2024. Fact Discovery due by 4/16/2024. Joinder of Parties due by 10/2/2023. Mediation Deadline 4/23/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 4/30/2024. Motions due by 4/30/2024. Pretrial Stipulation due by 5/28/2024. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 8/21/2023. See attached document for full details. (scn)
August 18, 2023 Filing 17 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Itow.Boats, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Scheduling Order)(Siracusa, John)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Defendants' Second Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants shall respond to the Complaint on or before August 23, 2023. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 8/17/2023. (pwn)
August 17, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE by Wilson Lopez, M.D., M/V Summertime, Sonia A. Sibaja re #14 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer of No Objection (Cooke, Adam)
August 16, 2023 Filing 14 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Wilson Lopez, M.D., M/V Summertime, Sonia A. Sibaja. Attorney Adam B. Cooke added to party Wilson Lopez, M.D.(pty:dft), Attorney Adam B. Cooke added to party M/V Summertime (pty:dft), Attorney Adam B. Cooke added to party Sonia A. Sibaja(pty:dft). (Cooke, Adam)
August 11, 2023 Filing 13 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Itow.Boats, LLC identifying Other Affiliate John M. Siracusa, Esq., Other Affiliate Joseph W. Janssen, III, Esq., Other Affiliate Jarvis Osorio for Itow.Boats, LLC (Janssen, Joseph)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Defendants' Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants shall respond to the Complaint on or before August 16, 2023. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 8/2/2023. (pwn)
August 2, 2023 Filing 11 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Wilson Lopez, M.D., M/V Summertime, Sonia A. Sibaja. (Pennekamp, John)
August 2, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Michael Pennekamp on behalf of Wilson Lopez, M.D., M/V Summertime, Sonia A. Sibaja. Attorney John Michael Pennekamp added to party Wilson Lopez, M.D.(pty:dft), Attorney John Michael Pennekamp added to party M/V Summertime (pty:dft), Attorney John Michael Pennekamp added to party Sonia A. Sibaja(pty:dft). (Pennekamp, John)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REQUIRING COMBINED RESPONSES: It is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that all Defendants shall submit a single combined response or separate answers within the time allowed for the last-served Defendant to respond. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 7/24/2023. See attached document for full details. (scn)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES: Joint Scheduling Report due by 8/18/2023. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 7/24/2023. See attached document for full details. (scn)
July 24, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Itow.Boats, LLC. Wilson Lopez, M.D. served on 7/12/2023, response/answer due 8/2/2023. (Siracusa, John)
July 24, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Itow.Boats, LLC. Sonia A. Sibaja served on 7/12/2023, response/answer due 8/2/2023. (Siracusa, John)
July 5, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Wilson Lopez, M.D., Sonia A. Sibaja. (scn)
July 5, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Itow.Boats, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s)) (Siracusa, John)
July 5, 2023 Filing 3 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) will not be issued. Attorney or Pro Se party's return address is not listed. Filer may file a Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) with the corrected summons attached. (rbe)
July 4, 2023 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (rbe)
July 4, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Itow.Boats, LLC. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16737489, filed by Itow.Boats, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Siracusa, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Itow.Boats, LLC v. M/V Summertime et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Itow.Boats, LLC
Represented By: John Marcus Siracusa
Represented By: Joseph William Janssen, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Summertime
Represented By: John Michael Pennekamp
Represented By: Adam B. Cooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonia Sibaja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson Lopez, M.D.
Represented By: Adam B. Cooke
Represented By: John Michael Pennekamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonia A. Sibaja
Represented By: Adam B. Cooke
Represented By: John Michael Pennekamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?