MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC et al v. ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC and MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC
Defendant: ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company, ACE Insurance Company of the Midwest, ACE FIRE UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY and ACE American Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2023cv23018
Filed: August 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Alicia M Otazo-Reyes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting In-Person Hearing on #13 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand for 10/24/2023 at 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 10/4/2023. (aa00)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REFERRING #13 MOTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Motions referred to Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/3/2023. See attached document for full details. (nwn)
October 2, 2023 Filing 21 Plaintiff's REPLY to #13 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court and Attorney's Fees by MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Zurich Complaint)(Susman, Ryan)
September 25, 2023 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by ACE American Insurance Company, ACE FIRE UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY, ACE Insurance Company of the Midwest, ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Replies due by 10/2/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Hall, Alexander)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #14 Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 10/12/2023. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (jg01)
September 22, 2023 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Susman, Ryan)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Harry R. Schafer. Mediation Hearing set for 5/29/2024 11:00 AM. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/21/2023. See attached document for full details. (nwn)
September 21, 2023 Filing 16 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #15 Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing,. Mediator Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties from the complaint/petition/removal, etc. or the mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the mediator. (cds)
September 21, 2023 Filing 15 Plaintiff's NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Mediator, Harry R. Schafer Selected/Added MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC as Mediator. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Scheduling Mediation)(Susman, Ryan)
September 14, 2023 Filing 14 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, by ACE American Insurance Company, ACE FIRE UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY, ACE Insurance Company of the Midwest, ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Responses due by 9/28/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hall, Alexander)
September 11, 2023 Filing 13 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court by MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Zurich Order)(Susman, Ryan)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Amended Pleadings due by 10/30/2023., Discovery due by 5/28/2024., Expert Discovery due by 5/28/2024., Joinder of Parties due by 10/30/2023., Mediation Deadline 6/11/2024., In Limine Motions due by 9/9/2024., Dispositive Motions due by 6/18/2024., Motions due by 6/18/2024., Pretrial Stipulation due by 9/9/2024., Jury Trial set for 9/23/2024 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 9/17/2024 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 6/11/2024.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/31/2023. See attached document for full details. (nwn) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
August 31, 2023 Filing 11 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates Interested Persons by MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSP Recovery Claims, Series, LLC, a Delaware series limited liability company, Other Affiliate VRM MSP Recovery Partners, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, Other Affiliate Virage Recovery Master, LLP, a Delaware Limited Partner and Series MRCS, a designated series of MDA Series, LLC, a series limited liability company, Other Affiliate Virage Recovery, LLC, a Texas limited liability for MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC; Corporate Parent MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC, a Delaware series limited liability company, Other Affiliate Hazel Holdings I LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, is the sole member of MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC, Other Affiliate Hazel Partners Holdings, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company for MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC (Susman, Ryan)
August 31, 2023 Filing 10 Initial Disclosure(s) by MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC (Susman, Ryan)
August 31, 2023 Filing 9 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Susman, Ryan)
August 31, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Hy Susman on behalf of MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC. Attorney Ryan Hy Susman added to party MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan Hy Susman added to party MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC(pty:pla). (Susman, Ryan)
August 14, 2023 Filing 7 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACE American Insurance Company, ACE FIRE UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY, ACE Insurance Company of the Midwest, ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Greenberg, Valerie)
August 14, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Compliance Filing State Court Action Docket Sheet by ACE American Insurance Company, ACE FIRE UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY, ACE Insurance Company of the Midwest, ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company re #4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report,,, Set Response/Answer Due Deadline,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: State Court Action Docket Sheet) (Greenberg, Valerie)
August 11, 2023 Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline: ACE American Insurance Company response/answer due 9/14/2023; ACE FIRE UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY response/answer due 9/14/2023; ACE Insurance Company of the Midwest response/answer due 9/14/2023; ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company response/answer due 9/14/2023. PER DE#5 (cds)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant have through and including September 14, 2023, to respond to the Second Amended Class Action Complaint. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (jg01)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON POST-REMOVAL PROCEDURES, AND REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES ( Joint Scheduling Report due by 8/31/2023), ACE American Insurance Company response/answer due 8/17/2023; ACE FIRE UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY response/answer due 8/17/2023; ACE Insurance Company of the Midwest response/answer due 8/17/2023; ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company response/answer due 8/17/2023. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/10/2023. See attached document for full details. (nwn)
August 11, 2023 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, by ACE American Insurance Company, ACE FIRE UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY, ACE Insurance Company of the Midwest, ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Greenberg, Valerie)
August 10, 2023 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nwn)
August 10, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16832359, filed by ACE American Insurance Company, ACE Insurance Company of the Midwest, ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Second Amended Complaint, #3 State Court Complaint, #4 State Court Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit State Court Record Part 1 of 2, #7 Exhibit State Court Record Part 2 of 2)(Greenberg, Valerie) No Answer/Motion to Dismiss Filed. Modified text & attachment description on 8/10/2023 (nwn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC et al v. ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC
Represented By: Alexis Fernandez
Represented By: Jose Alfredo De Armas
Represented By: Ryan Hy Susman
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Represented By: Jose Alfredo De Armas
Represented By: Alexis Fernandez
Represented By: Ryan Hy Susman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Valerie B. Greenberg
Represented By: Alexander Julian Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE Insurance Company of the Midwest
Represented By: Alexander Julian Hall
Represented By: Valerie B. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE FIRE UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Alexander Julian Hall
Represented By: Valerie B. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE American Insurance Company
Represented By: Alexander Julian Hall
Represented By: Valerie B. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?