MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC et al v. THE TRAVELERS CASUALTY COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, SERIES PMPI and MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS SERIES 44, LLC
Defendant: THE TRAVELERS CASUALTY COMPANY, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA, TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY and TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2023cv23156
Filed: August 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2023 Filing 21 Corrected REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS SERIES 44, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, SERIES PMPI. (Susman, Ryan)
October 10, 2023 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS SERIES 44, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, SERIES PMPI. (Susman, Ryan)
October 2, 2023 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by THE TRAVELERS CASUALTY COMPANY, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT, TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY, TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA, TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. Replies due by 10/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Besvinick, Laura)
September 18, 2023 Filing 18 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court by MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS SERIES 44, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, SERIES PMPI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Zurich Order, #2 Exhibit B -Demand Letter and Response, #3 Exhibit C -Demand Letter and Response, #4 Exhibit D- Demand Letter and Response)(Susman, Ryan)
August 29, 2023 Filing 17 Corrected Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE TRAVELERS CASUALTY COMPANY, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT, TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY, TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA, TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent The Phoenix Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent The Travelers Company, Inc. for THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT, TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA; Corporate Parent St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, Corporate Parent The Travelers Company, Inc. for THE TRAVELERS CASUALTY COMPANY; Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent The Travelers Company, Inc. for THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY, TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY, TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Besvinick, Laura)
August 29, 2023 Filing 16 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #13 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement,. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (pcs)
August 28, 2023 Filing 15 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by THE TRAVELERS CASUALTY COMPANY, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT, TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY, TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA, TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Proposed Scheduling Order)(Besvinick, Laura)
August 28, 2023 Filing 14 STATUS REPORT on Removal by THE TRAVELERS CASUALTY COMPANY, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT, TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY, TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA, TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Besvinick, Laura)
August 28, 2023 Filing 13 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE TRAVELERS CASUALTY COMPANY, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT, TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY, TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA, TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Besvinick, Laura)
August 28, 2023 Filing 12 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates Interested Persons by MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS SERIES 44, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, SERIES PMPI identifying Corporate Parent MSPA CLAIMS 1, LLC, a Florida limited liability, Other Affiliate MSP Recovery, LLC, a Florida limited liability company, Other Affiliate MSP Recovery Services, LLC, is the sole member of MSPA Claims 1, LLC, Other Affiliate MSP Recovery, Inc, a Delaware corporation for MSPA Claims 1, LLC; Corporate Parent MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, a Delaware series limited liability company, Other Affiliate VRM MSP Recovery Partners, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, Other Affiliate Virage Recovery, LLC, a Texas limited liability for MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC; Corporate Parent MSP Recovery Claims, Series, LLC, a Delaware series limited liability company, Other Affiliate Hazel Holdings I LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, is the sole member of MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC, Other Affiliate Hazel Partners Holdings, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company for MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS SERIES 44, LLC; Corporate Parent Series PMPI, a designated series of MAO-MSO Recovery II LLC, a Delaware series limited liability company, Other Affiliate Series MRCS, a designated series of MDA, Series LLC, Other Affiliate Virage Recovery Master, LLP, a Delaware Limited Partner for SERIES PMPI (Susman, Ryan)
August 28, 2023 Filing 11 Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement by MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS SERIES 44, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, SERIES PMPI identifying Corporate Parent MSPA CLAIMS 1, LLC, a Florida limited liability, Other Affiliate Lionheart II Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate MSP Recovery, LLC, a Florida limited liability company, Other Affiliate MSP Recovery Services, LLC, is the sole member of MSPA Claims 1, LLC, Other Affiliate MSP Recovery, Inc, a Delaware corporation for MSPA Claims 1, LLC; Corporate Parent MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, a Delaware series limited liability company, Other Affiliate VRM MSP Recovery Partners, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, Other Affiliate VRM MSP Recovery Partners, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, Other Affiliate Series MRCS, a designated series of MDA, Series LLC, Other Affiliate Virage Recovery Master, LLP, a Delaware Limited Partner, Other Affiliate Virage Recovery, LLC, a Texas limited liability for MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC; Corporate Parent MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, a Delaware series limited liability company, Other Affiliate Hazel Holdings I LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, is the sole member of MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC, Other Affiliate Hazel Partners Holdings, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company for MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS SERIES 44, LLC; Corporate Parent MAO-MSO Recovery II LLC, Series PMPI, is a designated series of MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC, a Delaware series limited liability company, Other Affiliate Lionheart II Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate MSP Recovery, LLC, a Florida limited liability company, Other Affiliate MSP Recovery, Inc, a Delaware corporation, Other Affiliate RD Legal Finance, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, Other Affiliate Dersovitz Family Limited Liability Company, a New Jersey limited liability company for SERIES PMPI (Susman, Ryan)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA)
August 24, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Alan C. Turner. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-16870656 by THE TRAVELERS CASUALTY COMPANY, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT, TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY, TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA, TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. Responses due by 9/7/2023 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac, #2 Certification Certification of Alan C. Turner)(Besvinick, Laura)
August 24, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Bryce L. Friedman. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-16870441 by THE TRAVELERS CASUALTY COMPANY, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA, THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT, TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY, TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA, TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. Responses due by 9/7/2023 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac, #2 Certification Certification of Bryce L. Friedman)(Besvinick, Laura)
August 22, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Hy Susman on behalf of MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS SERIES 44, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, SERIES PMPI. Attorney Ryan Hy Susman added to party MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS SERIES 44, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan Hy Susman added to party MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan Hy Susman added to party MSPA Claims 1, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan Hy Susman added to party SERIES PMPI(pty:pla). (Susman, Ryan)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that Defendants shall submit a single combined response or separate answers within the time allowed for the last-served Defendant to respond. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/21/2023. See attached document for full details. (wc)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties due by 8/28/2023. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/21/2023. See attached document for full details. (wc)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. Removal Status Report due by 8/28/2023. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/21/2023. See attached document for full details. (wc)
August 18, 2023 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (rbe)
August 18, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Pure Bill of Discovery) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16855772, filed by Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Indemnity Company Of America, The, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, Travelers Casualty Company, Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut. No Answer Filed. Motion to Dismiss Filed- Exhibit 5 (Attachment#7)- pg. 1-83 . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Full State Court Filings, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Motion for Leave, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - State Court Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Notice of Lack of Prosecution, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Order granting Motion for Leave to file SAC, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Citizenship of Travelers Casualty C, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - Citizenship of Travelers Indemnity Co of CT, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Travelers Indemnity Co, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - Citizenship of Travelers Indemnity Co of America, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 11 - Travelers Casualty & Surety Co, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 12 - Travelers Property Casualty Co of America, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 13 - Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Co, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 14 - Demand 1 Redacted, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 15 - Demand 2 Redacted, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 16 - Demand 3 Redacted, #19 Exhibit Plaintiff Motion for Remand)(Besvinick, Laura) Modified text & attachment description on 8/21/2023 (rbe).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC et al v. THE TRAVELERS CASUALTY COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC
Represented By: Michael O. Mena
Represented By: Francesco Antonio Zincone, III
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Represented By: Jose Alfredo De Armas
Represented By: Ryan Hy Susman
Represented By: Andre J. Vazquez
Represented By: Eduardo Enrique Bertran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSPA Claims 1, LLC
Represented By: Andre J. Vazquez
Represented By: Eduardo Enrique Bertran
Represented By: Jose Alfredo De Armas
Represented By: Michael O. Mena
Represented By: Ryan Hy Susman
Represented By: Francesco Antonio Zincone, III
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SERIES PMPI
Represented By: Andre J. Vazquez
Represented By: Eduardo Enrique Bertran
Represented By: Jose Alfredo De Armas
Represented By: Ryan Hy Susman
Represented By: Francesco Antonio Zincone, III
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Represented By: Michael O. Mena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS SERIES 44, LLC
Represented By: Eduardo Enrique Bertran
Represented By: Francesco Antonio Zincone, III
Represented By: Michael O. Mena
Represented By: Andre J. Vazquez
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Represented By: Jose Alfredo De Armas
Represented By: Ryan Hy Susman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE TRAVELERS CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: Alan C. Turner
Represented By: Bryce L. Friedman
Represented By: Laura Besvinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CONNECTICUT
Represented By: Alan C. Turner
Represented By: Bryce L. Friedman
Represented By: Laura Besvinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY
Represented By: Laura Besvinick
Represented By: Alan C. Turner
Represented By: Bryce L. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: Bryce L. Friedman
Represented By: Laura Besvinick
Represented By: Alan C. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Alan C. Turner
Represented By: Bryce L. Friedman
Represented By: Laura Besvinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY
Represented By: Alan C. Turner
Represented By: Bryce L. Friedman
Represented By: Laura Besvinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: Laura Besvinick
Represented By: Alan C. Turner
Represented By: Bryce L. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?