MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC et al v. Security National Insurance Company
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC and MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC
Defendant: Security National Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2023cv23194
Filed: August 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2023 Filing 22 Plaintiff's REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC. (Susman, Ryan)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #20 the Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The Plaintiffs shall respond to the Motion to Dismiss by October 25, 2023. The Defendant shall file a reply in support of its Motion to Dismiss by November 9, 2023. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 10/10/2023. (lcr)
October 10, 2023 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #11 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, by MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Susman, Ryan)
October 5, 2023 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Security National Insurance Company. Replies due by 10/12/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hall, Alexander)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #17 the Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendant shall file a reply in support of its Motion to Dismiss by October 25, 2023. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 10/3/2023. (lcr)
October 3, 2023 Filing 17 Defendant's REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, filed by Security National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Greenberg, Valerie)
October 2, 2023 Reset Deadlines as to #11 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, . Responses due by 10/11/2023 per d.e. 16 Order. (mee)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 the Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The Plaintiffs shall respond to the Motion to Dismiss by October 11, 2023. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 10/2/2023. (lcr)
October 2, 2023 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #11 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, by MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Susman, Ryan)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION before Harry R. Schafer. Mediation Hearing set for 5/15/2024 at 12:00 PM, via videoconference. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 9/26/2023. See attached document for full details. (caw)
September 26, 2023 Filing 13 Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Mediator, Harry R. Schafer Selected/Added MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC as Mediator. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Scheduling Mediation)(Susman, Ryan)
September 21, 2023 Filing 12 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court by MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Zurich Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B -Demand Letter and Response, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C -Demand Letter and Response, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D- Composite)(Susman, Ryan)
September 20, 2023 Filing 11 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, by Security National Insurance Company. Responses due by 10/4/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hall, Alexander)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: JURY TRIAL set for 9/9/2024 in Miami Division before Judge Roy K. Altman. CALENDAR CALL set for 9/3/2024 at 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Roy K. Altman. Amended Pleadings due by 10/24/2023. Discovery due by 5/14/2024. Expert Discovery due by 5/14/2024. Fact Discovery due by 5/14/2024. Joinder of Parties due by 10/24/2023. Mediation Deadline 5/28/2024. In Limine Motions due by 8/5/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 6/5/2024. Motions due by 6/5/2024. Pretrial Stipulation due by 8/26/2024. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation Deadline 5/28/2024. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid all pretrial non-dispositive and discovery matters. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 9/6/2023. See attached document for full details. (caw) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
September 5, 2023 Filing 9 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Susman, Ryan)
September 5, 2023 Filing 8 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates Interested Persons by MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, a Delaware series limited liability company, Other Affiliate VRM MSP Recovery Partners, LLC, A Delaware limited liability company, Other Affiliate Virage Recovery Master, LLP, a Delaware Limited Partner and Series MRCS, a designated series of MDA Series, LLC, a series limited liability company, Other Affiliate Virage Recovery, LLC, a Texas limited liability for MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC; Corporate Parent MSPA CLAIMS 1, LLC, a Florida limited liability, Other Affiliate MSP Recovery, LLC, Other Affiliate MSP Recovery Services, LLC, is the sole member of MSPA Claims 1, LLC, Other Affiliate MSP Recovery, Inc, a Delaware corporation for MSPA Claims I, LLC (Susman, Ryan)
September 5, 2023 Filing 7 Initial Disclosure(s) 26(a)(1) by MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC (Susman, Ryan)
September 5, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Hy Susman on behalf of MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims I, LLC. Attorney Ryan Hy Susman added to party MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan Hy Susman added to party MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan Hy Susman added to party MSPA Claims I, LLC(pty:pla). (Susman, Ryan)
August 29, 2023 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT by Security National Insurance Company (Greenberg, Valerie)
August 24, 2023 Filing 4 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Security National Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Bristol West Holdings, Inc. for Security National Insurance Company (Greenberg, Valerie)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REQUIRING REMOVAL STATUS REPORT AND JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT. Removal Status Report due by 8/30/2023. Joint Scheduling Report due by 9/5/2023. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 8/22/2023. See attached document for full details. (caw)
August 22, 2023 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (wce)
August 22, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16862866, filed by Security National Insurance Company. (2nd Amended Complaint Ex.1 PG.6. Motion to Dismiss Ex.1 PG.2, No Answer Filed.)(Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, # (2nd Amended Complaint Pg6. Motion to Dismiss Pg2.)(2) Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit State Court Record)(Greenberg, Valerie) Modified Text on 8/22/2023 (wce).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC et al v. Security National Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC
Represented By: Jose Alfredo De Armas
Represented By: Alexis Fernandez
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Represented By: Ryan Hy Susman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSPA Claims I, LLC
Represented By: Alexis Fernandez
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Represented By: Jose Alfredo De Armas
Represented By: Ryan Hy Susman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Represented By: Jose Alfredo De Armas
Represented By: Alexis Fernandez
Represented By: Ryan Hy Susman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security National Insurance Company
Represented By: Valerie B. Greenberg
Represented By: Alexander Julian Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?