XYZ Corporation v. The Individuals, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Plaintiff: XYZ Corporation
Defendant: THE INDIVIDUALS, PARTNERSHIPS AND UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIATIONS IDENTIFIED ON SCHEDULE A,, The Individuals, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A, SDPEIA and Zeeyoocc
Case Number: 1:2023cv23380
Filed: September 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Referring Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants #25 , counsel's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Attorney Shan Zhu is given permission to appear and participate in this matter on behalf of the Defendants Zhuhai Saide Cross-border E-Commerce Co., Ltd. and Shenzhen Zeyou Zhicheng Technology Co., Ltd. The Clerk is directed to provide this attorney with notification of all electronic filings via the email address set forth in the Motion. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (abo)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Shan Zhu. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17039063 by SDPEIA, Zeeyoocc. Responses due by 11/15/2023 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Liu, Jianyin)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jianyin Liu on behalf of SDPEIA, Zeeyoocc. Attorney Jianyin Liu added to party SDPEIA(pty:dft), Attorney Jianyin Liu added to party Zeeyoocc(pty:dft). (Liu, Jianyin)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr: Zoom Meeting re Motion held on 10/31/2023 re 12 Plaintiff's EX PARTE MOTION Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by XYZ Corporation. Total time in court: 5 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Humberto Rubio, Jr, and Felipe Rubio. No appearance on behalf of defendants. Court Reporter: Mary Ann Casale, 305-523-5632 / MaryAnn_Casale@flsd.uscourts.gov. (jh)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order Granting 12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by XYZ Corporation. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 10/31/2023. (scn) Modified Document Type on 10/31/2023 (scn). Modified by unsealing document on 11/1/2023 per Chambers (kpe). (Main Document 22 replaced on 11/1/2023) (kpe).
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER: The login credentials for the October 31, 2023, videoconference hearing at 9:15 am, on 12 the Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction are as follows: Please join ZoomGov meeting: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1602664969?pwd=cml4L2xlbWs3RTk4Zi9oUFY1Vkkwdz09. Meeting ID: 160 266 4969 and passcode: 928848.Parties and counsel must abide by the following:Counsel must meet (in person, on the phone, via videoconference, or on some other similar platform) with their clients before the hearing to discuss measures that will ensure that both counsel and client have the ability to participate in a Zoom videoconference, with a stable internet connection. In particular, clients unfamiliar with Zoom should do an advance practice run at the location where they will participate in the hearing. If a client plans to be at home, and if there will be multiple users of Wi-Fi during the hearing, then the demand on Wi-Fi may cause the client's internet connection to be unstable. Good troubleshooting tips include rebooting the Wi-Fi router before the Zoom session, locating the device near the router during the Zoom session, and minimizing the interference of other devices on the Wi-Fi bandwidth. See https://blog.zoom.us/enhancing-wifi-powered-zoom-meeting/. If there is any doubt about a client's ability to maintain a stable connection to Zoom during their participation in the hearing, then counsel shall make arrangements for the client to participate at counsel's office.Each participant must log in ten minutes early and verify that they have a stable connection, transmitting and receiving clear video and audio, without any glitches.A hearing by videoconferencing is the digital equivalent of an actual, in-court hearing, so counsel and parties are expected to dress as though they are in an actual federal courtroom.Those granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (abo)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 21 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1078471)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Summons Issued as to The Individuals, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. (kpe)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by XYZ Corporation (Rubio, Humberto)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 15 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (kpe)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 16 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (amb)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 17 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (amb)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 14 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1078471)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 13 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1078471)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 10 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1078471)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 11 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1078471)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 12 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1078471)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER to show cause. This matter is before the Court on an independent review of the record. On September 14, 2023, the Court granted the Plaintiff's ex parte motion for leave to file under seal and to temporarily proceed under a pseudonym. (See ECF No. 7.) The order required that the Plaintiff file the requested materials under seal by September 15, 2023. Despite the fact that the Court's order was entered approximately a month ago, the majority of those materials have not been filed, including the Plaintiff's anticipated motions for a temporary restraining order, for alternate service of process, and for leave to conduct expedited third party discovery. The Plaintiff's failure is significant not only because it is in direct violation of the Court's order, but also because the Plaintiff's ability to continue proceeding under a pseudonym was made contingent on the outcome of its anticipated request for a temporary restraining order. Accordingly, by October 20, 2023, the Plaintiff shall either (i) file all the outstanding materials under seal or (ii) show good cause for its failure to abide by the Court's September 14, 2023, order. The Plaintiff is warned that its failure to abide by this order may result in the entry of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (abo)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 8 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1078471)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants #5 the Plaintiff's ex parte motion for leave to file under seal and to temporarily proceed under a pseudonym. The Court, having reviewed the motion, the record, and the relevant legal authorities, finds good cause to grant the motion. By September 15, 2023, the Plaintiff shall file the following documents under seal in accordance with Local Rule 5.4(b): (1) Amended Complaint and supporting Exhibits; (2) Schedule "A" to the Amended Complaint; (3) Summons; (4) Ex Parte Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Order Restraining Transfer of Assets, and supporting materials; (5) Ex Parte Motion for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process, and supporting materials; and (6) Motion for Leave to Conduct Expedited Third Party Discovery, and supporting materials. The Clerk of Court is directed to maintain these documents under seal pending service and the Court's resolution of the Plaintiff's forthcoming request for ex parte relief. Within seven (7) days of the Court's ruling on the Plaintiff's request for ex parte relief, the Plaintiff must move to unseal these documents and add all of the Defendants as parties through CM-ECF. In addition, the Court also grants the Plaintiff's motion for leave to temporarily proceed under a pseudonym. The Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed under a pseudonym only until such time as the Defendants have been served with the temporary restraining order, if granted, and the Plaintiff has subpoenaed the relevant third-party payment processors and online marketplaces to instruct them to restrain Defendants' assets and suspend their online stores. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (abo)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Goodman's Discovery Procedures Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 9/14/2023. See attached document for full details. (cpa)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by XYZ Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Rubio, Humberto)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 9/7/2023. See attached document for full details. (pc)
September 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (wce)
September 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (wce)
September 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THE INDIVIDUALS, PARTNERSHIPS AND UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIATIONS IDENTIFIED ON SCHEDULE A,. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16892322, filed by XYZ Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Rubio, Humberto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: XYZ Corporation v. The Individuals, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XYZ Corporation
Represented By: Humberto Rubio, Jr.
Represented By: Felipe Rubio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE INDIVIDUALS, PARTNERSHIPS AND UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIATIONS IDENTIFIED ON SCHEDULE A,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Individuals, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SDPEIA
Represented By: Jianyin Liu
Represented By: Shan Zhu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zeeyoocc
Represented By: Jianyin Liu
Represented By: Shan Zhu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?