Eli Lilly And Company v. RXCOMPOUNDSTORE.COM, LLC
Plaintiff: Eli Lilly And Company
Defendant: RXCOMPOUNDSTORE.COM, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv23586
Filed: September 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings per DE 17 as to #9 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Responses due by 11/20/2023 (pcs)
November 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 the Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The Plaintiff shall respond to the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by November 20, 2023. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 11/10/2023. (lcr)
November 9, 2023 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to motion to dismiss or file an amended complaint Plaintiff Eli Lilly and Companys Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time re #9 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Eli Lilly And Company. Responses due by 11/27/2023 (Miller, Brian)
November 2, 2023 Filing 15 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by RXCOMPOUNDSTORE.COM, LLC identifying Corporate Parent EARTH SCIENCE TECH, INC. for RXCOMPOUNDSTORE.COM, LLC (Leyton, Daniel)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Jury Trial set for 10/28/2024 in Miami Division before Judge Roy K. Altman. Calendar Call set for 10/22/2024 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Roy K. Altman. Amended Pleadings due by 12/19/2023. Discovery due by 7/2/2024. Expert Discovery due by 7/2/2024. Joinder of Parties due by 12/19/2023. Mediation Deadline 7/16/2024. In Limine Motions due by 9/23/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 7/24/2024. Motions due by 7/24/2024. Pretrial Stipulation due by 10/14/2024. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and this District's Magistrate Judge Rules, all pretrial non-dispositive and discovery matters are hereby referred to United States Magistrate Lisette M. Reid. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 11/1/2023. See attached document for full details. (rbe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
November 1, 2023 Filing 13 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #12 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (pcs)
October 31, 2023 Filing 12 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by RXCOMPOUNDSTORE.COM, LLC (Leyton, Daniel)
October 31, 2023 Filing 11 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Plaintiffs Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eli Lilly And Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Miller, Brian)
October 31, 2023 Filing 10 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Eli Lilly And Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Joint Proposed Scheduling Order)(Miller, Brian)
October 27, 2023 Filing 9 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by RXCOMPOUNDSTORE.COM, LLC. Responses due by 11/13/2023 (Leyton, Daniel)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORTAND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES Joint Scheduling Report due by 10/31/2023 Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 10/18/2023. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 the Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendant shall respond to the Complaint by October 27, 2023. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 10/17/2023. (lcr)
October 17, 2023 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by RXCOMPOUNDSTORE.COM, LLC. Attorney Daniel Loren Leyton added to party RXCOMPOUNDSTORE.COM, LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leyton, Daniel)
October 6, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Eli Lilly And Company. RXCOMPOUNDSTORE.COM, LLC served on 9/26/2023, response/answer due 10/17/2023. (Miller, Brian)
September 19, 2023 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement Plaintiff Eli Lilly and Companys Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Eli Lilly And Company (Miller, Brian)
September 19, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to RXCOMPOUNDSTORE.COM, LLC. (rbe)
September 19, 2023 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (rbe)
September 19, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RXCOMPOUNDSTORE.COM, LLC. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16928687, filed by Eli Lilly And Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Miller, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eli Lilly And Company v. RXCOMPOUNDSTORE.COM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eli Lilly And Company
Represented By: Brian Paul Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RXCOMPOUNDSTORE.COM, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Loren Leyton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?