Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company v. Miller
Counter Defendant: Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company
Counter Claimant: Dina Miller
Case Number: 1:2023cv24060
Filed: October 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 pd
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Amended Pleadings due by 2/6/2024., Discovery due by 8/6/2024., Expert Discovery due by 8/6/2024., Joinder of Parties due by 2/6/2024., Mediation Deadline 8/20/2024., In Limine Motions due by 11/18/2024., Dispositive Motions due by 8/28/2024., Pretrial Stipulation due by 11/18/2024., Jury Trial set for 12/2/2024 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 11/26/2024 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.), (Mediation Deadline 8/20/2024.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/8/2023. See attached document for full details. (pc) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
December 8, 2023 Filing 57 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company (Goldman, Jacqueline)
December 7, 2023 Filing 56 Plaintiff Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company's ANSWER to Counterclaim by Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company. (Goldman, Jacqueline)
November 30, 2023 Filing 55 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company by Dina Miller. (Raab, Daniel)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #53 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Dina Miller. Response/Answer due 11/30/2023. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (jg01)
November 28, 2023 Filing 53 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Dina Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Raab, Daniel)
November 16, 2023 Filing 52 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company (Goldman, Jacqueline)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 PAPERLESS ORDER granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Report and Response to Complaint, ECF No. #50 . Defendant shall file a Response to the Complaint on or before November 29, 2023. The Parties shall file a Joint Scheduling Report on or before December 8, 2023. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ab04)
November 15, 2023 Filing 50 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Dina Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Raab, Daniel)
November 15, 2023 Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline per DE 51 Order. Dina Miller response/answer due 11/29/2023., Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Dina Miller response/answer due 11/29/2023.( Joint Scheduling Report due by 12/8/2023) (amb)
November 14, 2023 Filing 49 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jacqueline Louise Goldman on behalf of Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company. Attorney Jacqueline Louise Goldman added to party Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company(pty:pla). (Goldman, Jacqueline)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Joint Scheduling Report due by 11/15/2023 Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/25/2023. See attached document for full details. (pc)
October 25, 2023 Filing 47 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Tyler M. Campbell and Kate L. McDonald, mailing date October 25, 2023, (pt)
October 24, 2023 Filing 46 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb)
October 24, 2023 Filing 45 Case transferred in from Colorado; Case Number 1:23-cv-00214. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(bb).
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER accepting #43 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. Defendant's Motion (ECF No. #26 ) is GRANTED IN PART with respect to the request for a transfer, and the Clerk is directed to TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida. Defendant's Motion is otherwise DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/23/2023.(jtorr, )
October 4, 2023 Filing 43 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re #26 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Dina Miller. The Court recommends: (1) Plaintiffs request for transfer under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) be GRANTED; (2) Plaintiffs request for dismissal under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(3) be DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 10/04/2023. (jcharl, )
June 20, 2023 Filing 42 REPLY TO THE PLAINTIFF CLEAR SPRING PROPERTY AND CASUALTY COMPANYS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR TRANSFER THE CASE by Defendant Dina Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit)(Raab, Daniel)
June 13, 2023 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM regarding #26 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Dina Miller. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 6/13/2023. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 6/13/2023. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 6/13/2023. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec)
June 12, 2023 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-00214-RM. (athom, )
June 9, 2023 Filing 37 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #36 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-00214-REB. (Text Only Entry) (csarr, )
June 9, 2023 Filing 36 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company All parties do not consent.. (Campbell, Tyler)
June 6, 2023 Filing 35 RESPONSE to #26 MOTION to Transfer Case and/or Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email Chain, #2 Exhibit 2 - Miller Application)(Campbell, Tyler)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's #31 Motion to Stay the Proceedings or if Not Granted a One Week Extension of Time to Submit a Proposed Scheduling Order and an Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent. For good cause shown, and based on Plaintiff's lack of opposition, the case is stayed pending resolution of Defendant's #26 Motion to Dismiss and/or Transfer the Case for Forum Non-Conveniens. The stay has no impact on the #26 Motion to Dismiss and/or Transfer briefing schedule. Additionally, the parties shall submit an Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent form on or before June 9, 2023. The deadline to file a proposed scheduling order is VACATED and will be reset, if necessary, after the resolution of Defendant's #26 Motion to Dismiss and/or Transfer. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 5/26/2023. Text Only Entry(mdblc1)
May 26, 2023 Filing 33 RESPONSE to #31 MOTION to Stay re 28 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File,, filed by Plaintiff Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company. (Campbell, Tyler)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff shall file a brief response indicating whether it opposes Plaintiff's #31 Motion to Stay the Proceedings on or before May 30, 2023. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 5/26/2023. Text Only Entry (mdblc1)
May 25, 2023 Filing 31 MOTION to Stay re 28 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File,, by Defendant Dina Miller. (Raab, Daniel)
May 16, 2023 Filing 30 STIPULATION for Extension of Time by Plaintiff Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company. (Campbell, Tyler)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 THIRD AMENDED ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Consent Form due by 6/2/2023. Proposed Scheduling Order due 6/2/2023. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 5/1/2023. (evaug)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER granting in part the #27 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Submit a Proposed Scheduling Order and an Election on Concerning Consent/Non-Consent. The #25 Second Amended Initial Case Deadlines are VACATED and will be reset by separate order. To the extent that the parties seek to stay the case pending the Court's ruling on #26 Defendant Dina Miller's Motion to Dismiss and/or Transfer the Case for Forum Non Conveniens, the parties must file a motion to stay addressing the requisite factors. See String Cheese Incident, LLC v. Stylus Shows, Inc., No. 1:02-CV-01934-LTB-PA, 2006 WL 894955, at *2 (D. Colo. Mar. 30, 2006). By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 5/1/2023. Text Only Entry(mdblc1)
May 1, 2023 Filing 27 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to to Submit a Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Dina Miller. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order)(Raab, Daniel)
April 25, 2023 Filing 26 MOTION to Transfer Case by Defendant Dina Miller. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Raab, Daniel)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SECOND AMENDED ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Consent Form due by 5/2/2023. Proposed Scheduling Order due 5/2/2023. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 4/20/2023. (evaug )
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven William Block terminated by Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 4/20/2023. Text Only Entry(evaug )
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER granting #22 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Submit a Proposed Scheduling Order and Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent. The initial case deadlines are VACATED and will be reset by separate order. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 4/19/2023. Text Only Entry(mdblc1)
April 19, 2023 Filing 22 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit a Proposed Scheduling Order and an Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent by Plaintiff Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Campbell, Tyler)
April 19, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Dina Miller. (Block, Steven)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER granting #19 Defendant Dina Miller's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to File a Response to the Complaint. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the #1 Complaint on or before April 25, 2023. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 4/14/2023. Text Only Entry(mdblc1)
April 14, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant Dina Miller. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Raab, Daniel)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER: The #17 Notice of Withdrawal is STRICKEN for failure to comply with Local Attorney Rule 5(b). To the extent that Mr. Block seeks to withdraw from this case, he must file a motion showing good cause to do so. See D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(b). By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 4/14/2023. Text Only Entry (mdblc1)
April 14, 2023 Filing 17 STRICKEN NOTICE of Withdrawal of Steven W. Block by Defendant Dina Miller (Block, Steven) Modified pursuant 18 on 4/14/2023 (csarr, ).
April 13, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daniel W. Raab on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Daniel W. Raab added to party Dina Miller(pty:dft) (Raab, Daniel)
April 12, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Steven William Block on behalf of Dina MillerAttorney Steven William Block added to party Dina Miller(pty:dft) (Block, Steven)
March 27, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Tyler M. Campbell on behalf of Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company (Campbell, Tyler)
March 22, 2023 Filing 13 ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Tyler M. Campbell failed to pay the 2022 Biennial Fee. Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(a) and District Court General Order 2022-7, counsel was administratively removed from the court's attorney roll. Counsel must submit another bar application though PACER, pay the application fee, and, upon reinstatement, file a Notice of Entry of Appearance to continue as counsel of record in this case. Please visit and fully review the 2022 Biennial Renewal Fee page before contacting the court for assistance: #Biennial / Renewal Fee Information | US District Court of Colorado (uscourts.gov). (Text Only Entry) (mfred)
March 22, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company. Dina Miller served on 3/21/2023, answer due 4/11/2023. (Campbell, Tyler)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Consent Form due by 4/17/2023. Proposed Scheduling Order due 4/17/2023. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 3/17/2023. (evaug)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Scheduling Order and Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent of U.S. Magistrate. The initial case deadlines are VACATED and will be reset by separate order. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 03/15/23. Text Only Entry(mdblc2)
March 15, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Scheduling Order and Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent of U.S. Magistrate by Plaintiff Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Feb. 3, 2023 Letter)(Campbell, Tyler)
January 26, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (csarr, )
January 26, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Dina Miller by Plaintiff Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company. (McDonald, Kate)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Consent Form due by 3/15/2023. Proposed Scheduling Order due 3/15/2023. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 1/25/2023. (evaug )
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Consent Form due by 3/15/2023. Proposed Scheduling Order due 3/15/2023. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 1/25/2023. (evaug)
January 25, 2023 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No Summons Issued. (jcharl, )
January 25, 2023 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. Text Only Entry. (jcharl, )
January 25, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kate L. McDonald on behalf of Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company (McDonald, Kate)
January 25, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Dina Miller (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8900931)Attorney Kate L. McDonald added to party Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company(pty:pla), filed by Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Policy, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(McDonald, Kate)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company v. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company
Represented By: Jacqueline Louise Goldman
Represented By: Kate L. McDonald
Represented By: Tyler M. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Dina Miller
Represented By: Daniel Warren Raab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?