Associated Energy Group, LLC v. Department of Defense et al
Plaintiff: ASSOCIATED ENERGY GROUP, LLC
Defendant: Department of Defense and Defense Logistics Agency
Case Number: 1:2023cv24284
Filed: November 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Becerra
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #22 the Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendants shall respond to the Plaintiffs Complaint by January 22, 2024. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 12/19/2023. (lcr)
December 19, 2023 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Defense Logistics Agency, Department of Defense. Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party Defense Logistics Agency(pty:dft), Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party Department of Defense(pty:dft). (Raurell, Carlos)
December 6, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Geraldine Patrizia Asher on behalf of Associated Energy Group, LLC. Attorney Geraldine Patrizia Asher added to party Associated Energy Group, LLC(pty:pla). (Asher, Geraldine)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part #19 the Plaintiff's Motion for a Corrected Deadline for Defendants' Response/Answer. Under the Freedom of Information Act ("FOIA"), a government agency has thirty days after service of the complaint to file an answer. See 5 U.S.C. 552(a)(4)(C) ("Notwithstanding any other provision of law, the defendant shall serve an answer or otherwise plead to any complaint made under this subsection within thirty days after service upon the defendant of the pleading in which such complaint is made, unless the court otherwise directs for good cause shown."). Our Multiple Defendants Order, see #6 , provides that "[t]he time for responsive pleadings -- for all Defendants -- begins to run once all Defendants have either (1) been served or (2) waived service." Id. at 6. Here, the Department of Defense was served on November 22, 2023. See #11 Notice of Service. Thus the deadline for both Defendants to respond is December 22, 2023. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 12/6/2023. (lcr)
December 6, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION to Amend/Correct Deadline for Defendants' Response/Answer by Associated Energy Group, LLC. Responses due by 12/20/2023 (Roberts, Joel)
December 1, 2023 Filing 18 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #11 Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es), #10 Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es), #12 Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es), #13 Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see 14 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, 15 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, 16 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, 17 Summons Returned Executed as to USA. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ebz)
December 1, 2023 Filing 17 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Associated Energy Group, LLC. Defense Logistics Agency served on 11/15/2023, response/answer due 1/16/2024. See DE #13 for image. (ebz)
December 1, 2023 Filing 16 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Associated Energy Group, LLC. U.S. Attorney served on 11/21/2023, response/answer due 1/22/2024. See DE #12 for image. (ebz)
December 1, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Associated Energy Group, LLC. Department of Defense served on 11/22/2023, response/answer due 1/22/2024. See DE #11 for image. (ebz)
December 1, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Associated Energy Group, LLC. U.S. Attorney General served on 11/24/2023, response/answer due 1/23/2024. See DE #10 for image. (ebz)
December 1, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Notice of Service of Summons and Complaint - Director Defense Logistics Agency by Associated Energy Group, LLC re #3 Summons Issued as to USA, #1 Complaint, filed by Associated Energy Group, LLC (Roberts, Joel)
December 1, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Notice of Service of Summons and Complaint - U.S. Attorney SDF by Associated Energy Group, LLC re #3 Summons Issued as to USA, #1 Complaint, filed by Associated Energy Group, LLC (Roberts, Joel)
December 1, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Notice of Service of Summons and Complaint - Secretary of Defense by Associated Energy Group, LLC re #3 Summons Issued as to USA, #1 Complaint, filed by Associated Energy Group, LLC (Roberts, Joel)
December 1, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Notice of Service of Summons and Complaint - U.S. Attorney General by Associated Energy Group, LLC re #3 Summons Issued as to USA, #1 Complaint, filed by Associated Energy Group, LLC (Roberts, Joel)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 and #8 , the Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Kevin T. Barnett and Todd J. Canni may appear and participate in this action on behalf of the Plaintiff, Associated Energy Group, LLC. The Clerk of Court shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to kbarnett@bakerlaw.com and tcanni@bakerlaw.com. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 11/15/2023. (lcr)
November 14, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Todd J. Canni. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17071296 by Associated Energy Group, LLC. Responses due by 11/28/2023 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Roberts, Joel)
November 14, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Kevin T. Barnett. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17071252 by Associated Energy Group, LLC. Responses due by 11/28/2023 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Roberts, Joel)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER IN CASES WITH MULTIPLE DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 11/13/2023. See attached document for full details. (caw)
November 9, 2023 Filing 5 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Todd J. Canni and Kevin Barnett, mailing date November 9, 2023, (pt)
November 9, 2023 Filing 4 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by ASSOCIATED ENERGY GROUP, LLC (Roberts, Joel)
November 9, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Defense Logistics Agency, Department of Defense, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (caw)
November 8, 2023 Filing 2 Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (caw)
November 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (FREEDOM OF INFORMATION ACT) against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17058970, filed by ASSOCIATED ENERGY GROUP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AEG Request, #2 Civil Cover Sheet AEG FOIA Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s) DOD Summons, #4 Summon(s) DLA Summons, #5 Summon(s) US Attorney Summons, #6 Summon(s) AG Summons)(Roberts, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Associated Energy Group, LLC v. Department of Defense et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASSOCIATED ENERGY GROUP, LLC
Represented By: Joel Edward Roberts
Represented By: Kevin Barnett
Represented By: Todd J. Canni
Represented By: Geraldine Patrizia Asher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Defense
Represented By: Carlos Javier Raurell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defense Logistics Agency
Represented By: Carlos Javier Raurell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?