Not a Real Holding Company Inc. v. The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations identified on Schedule A
Plaintiff: Not a Real Holding Company Inc.
Defendant: The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations identified on Schedule A, ERAY SUPPLIES AND DESIGNS, HANVN, LATINDAY 97540235, MaiLanShop, Tanuki Studio, Defendant Number 6, alondra, 50starscorner, alienscenter, Customization Trend, Footwearmerch, GangsterTshirts, Muz, musicdope80s, paesanotshirts, pamotee, puppy printy, quiltblanket, shopofix, Unifinz, vesles2014s, voilastickers, VuAk Store, WANCANA, Mygem, DESIREBUY Clothes, bibile-30, cryin93, famyfashion, karencanavanprs, KitOmega, pfyshop and Muffiz
Case Number: 1:2023cv24471
Filed: November 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Trademark
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER re 40 Clerk's Entry of Default, filed by 50starscorner, MaiLanShop, Footwearmerch, voilastickers, shopofix, vesles2014s, Unifinz, ERAY SUPPLIES AND DESIGNS, alienscenter, karencanavanprs, VuAk Store, Customization Trend, musicdope80s, Mygem, Tanuki Studio, puppy printy, KitOmega, WANCANA, alondra, Defendant Number 6, GangsterTshirts, Muz, HANVN, quiltblanket; Response to this Order due by 1/31/2024. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/17/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
January 17, 2024 Filing 40 Clerk's Entry of Default as to 50starscorner, Customization Trend, Defendant Number 6, ERAY SUPPLIES AND DESIGNS, Footwearmerch, GangsterTshirts, HANVN, KitOmega, MaiLanShop, Muz, Mygem, Tanuki Studio, Unifinz, VuAk Store, WANCANA, alienscenter, alondra, karencanavanprs, musicdope80s, puppy printy, quiltblanket, shopofix, vesles2014s, voilastickers Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 1/17/2024. (drz)
January 17, 2024 Filing 39 Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction re 38 Clerk's Entry/Non-Entry of Default,. Correction Other. Terminated Defendant included in Default by Clerk in Error. (drz)
January 17, 2024 Filing 37 Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction re 35 Clerk's Entry/Non-Entry of Default,,. Correction Other. Clerk included Plaintiff in Clerk's Default. Clerk will re-enter a new Clerk's Default. (drz)
January 17, 2024 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 38 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (drz)
January 16, 2024 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 35 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (drz)
January 16, 2024 Filing 36 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Certain Defendants Only by Not a Real Holding Company Inc. (Guerra, Richard)
January 15, 2024 Filing 34 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Certain Defendants Only by Not a Real Holding Company Inc. (Guerra, Richard)
January 15, 2024 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Not a Real Holding Company Inc. re #32 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to 50starscorner, Customization Trend, Defendant Number 6, ERAY SUPPLIES AND DESIGNS, Footwearmerch, GangsterTshirts, HANVN, KitOmega, MaiLanShop, Muffiz, Muz, Mygem, Tanuki Studio, Unifinz, VuAk Store (Guerra, Richard)
January 15, 2024 Filing 32 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to 50starscorner, Customization Trend, Defendant Number 6, ERAY SUPPLIES AND DESIGNS, Footwearmerch, GangsterTshirts, HANVN, KitOmega, MaiLanShop, Muffiz, Muz, Mygem, Tanuki Studio, Unifinz, VuAk Store, WANCANA, alienscenter, alondra, famyfashion, karencanavanprs, musicdope80s, paesanotshirts, puppy printy, quiltblanket, shopofix, vesles2014s, voilastickers by Not a Real Holding Company Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A - Defaulting Defendants, #2 Affidavit of Richard Guerra)(Guerra, Richard)
January 15, 2024 Filing 31 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Certain Defendants Only by Not a Real Holding Company Inc. (Guerra, Richard)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER re #21 Service (Proof) by Publication filed by Not a Real Holding Company Inc.; Plaintiff shall submit a motion for entry of Clerk's defaults against the remaining Defendants no later than January 16, 2024. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/11/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER requiring Plaintiff perfect service by 2/24/2024. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/11/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
January 4, 2024 Filing 28 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Certain Defendants Only by Not a Real Holding Company Inc. (Guerra, Richard)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #6 Plaintiff's Ex Parte MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Order Restraining Transfer of Asset. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/28/2023. See attached document for full details. (wc)
December 28, 2023 Filing 26 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Motion Hearing held on 12/28/2023 re #6 EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Order Restraining Transfer of Asset filed by Not a Real Holding Company Inc.. Total time in court: 0 hour(s) : 3 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Richard Guerra. Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, 305-523-5518 / Stephanie_McCarn@flsd.uscourts.gov. (rpr)
December 27, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE of Compliance re #24 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (All docket entries Unsealed) (amb)
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Unseal. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to unseal all docket entries in this case and place them on the public docket. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/27/2023. See attached document for full details. (wc)
December 26, 2023 Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) terminated. (incorrect event used by filer) (drz)
December 26, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION to Unseal Docket by Not a Real Holding Company Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guerra, Richard)
December 26, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE by Not a Real Holding Company Inc. of Filing Proposed Order Granting Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Guerra, Richard)
December 26, 2023 Filing 21 Certificate of Service by Not a Real Holding Company Inc. Executed 12/26/2023 Claims/Positions/Written Defenses/Answers/etc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A to the Complaint)(Guerra, Richard) Modified text on 12/27/2023 (drz).
December 20, 2023 Filing 20 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Muffiz. (Guerra, Richard)
December 19, 2023 Filing 19 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #17 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF,,. Parties Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties from the Notice of Entries of Parties Listed into CM/ECF. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the additional party. (Muffiz nor added by attorney) (drz)
December 19, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Compliance by Not a Real Holding Company Inc. re #11 Order, (Guerra, Richard)
December 19, 2023 Filing 17 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): ERAY SUPPLIES AND DESIGNS, HANVN, LATINDAY 97540235, MaiLanShop, Tanuki Studio, Defendant Number 6, alondra, 50starscorner, alienscenter, Customization Trend, Footwearmerch, GangsterTshirts, Muz, musicdope80s, paesanotshirts, pamotee, puppy printy, quiltblanket, shopofix, Unifinz, vesles2014s, voilastickers, VuAk Store, WANCANA, Mygem, DESIREBUY Clothes, bibile-30, cryin93, famyfashion, karencanavanprs, KitOmega and pfyshop. (Guerra, Richard)
December 15, 2023 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations identified on Schedule A. (drz)
December 15, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Not a Real Holding Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Guerra, Richard)
December 13, 2023 Filing 14 Notice of Filing Seizure Bond in the amount of $10000.00 posted by Not a Real Holding Company Inc. Approved by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (pc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/14/2023: #1 Supplemental Sheet) (drz).
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time. Preliminary Injunction Hearing reset for 12/28/2023 01:00 PM in Miami Division before Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/6/2023. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
December 5, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Not a Real Holding Company Inc.. Responses due by 12/19/2023 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Richard Guerra, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guerra, Richard)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #9 Notice of Filing Exhibit A filed by Not a Real Holding Company Inc.; Plaintiff must add all the Defendants as parties through CM-ECF within five (5) days of service upon the Defendants and file a notice of compliance. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/4/2023. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
December 3, 2023 Filing 9 Sealed Document Notice of Filing Sealed Schedule A to the Complaint re DE#7 Order on Motion to Seal by Not a Real Holding Company Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A to the Complaint) (Guerra, Richard) Modified to Unseal per DE #24 on 12/27/2023 (amb).
December 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Ex Parte Motion. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 12/11/2023 02:00 PM in Miami Division before Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/2/2023. See attached document for full details. (amb) Modified to Unseal per DE #24 on 12/27/2023 (amb).
December 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Ex Parte Motion for Alternate Service. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/2/2023. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Seal. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/1/2023. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
November 30, 2023 Filing 6 EX PARTE MOTION for Entry of Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Order Restraining Transfer of Asset by Not a Real Holding Company Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A to the Complaint, #2 Affidavit of Stewart Miller, #3 Exhibit 1 Part 1 to Declaration of Stewart Miller, #4 Exhibit 1 Part 2 to Declaration of Stewart Mille, #5 Exhibit 1 Part 3 to Declaration of Stewart Mille, #6 Affidavit of Richard Guerra, #7 Text of Proposed Order) (Guerra, Richard) Modified to Unseal per DE #24 on 12/27/2023 (amb).
November 30, 2023 Filing 5 EX PARTE MOTION for Order Authorizing Alternate Service of Process on Defendants by Not a Real Holding Company Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Richard Guerra, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Guerra, Richard) Modified to Unseal per DE #24 on 12/27/2023 (amb).
November 30, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Seal Schedule A to the Complaint per Local Rule 5.4 by Not a Real Holding Company Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Guerra, Richard)
November 26, 2023 Filing 3 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK. (wce)
November 26, 2023 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (wce)
November 26, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations identified on Schedule A. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17095689, filed by Not a Real Holding Company Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Guerra, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Not a Real Holding Company Inc. v. The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations identified on Schedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Not a Real Holding Company Inc.
Represented By: Richard Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations identified on Schedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERAY SUPPLIES AND DESIGNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HANVN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LATINDAY 97540235
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MaiLanShop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanuki Studio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant Number 6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: alondra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 50starscorner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: alienscenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Customization Trend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Footwearmerch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GangsterTshirts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: musicdope80s
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: paesanotshirts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: pamotee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: puppy printy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: quiltblanket
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shopofix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unifinz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: vesles2014s
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: voilastickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VuAk Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WANCANA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mygem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DESIREBUY Clothes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: bibile-30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cryin93
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: famyfashion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: karencanavanprs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KitOmega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: pfyshop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muffiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?