Bueno et al v. GoodLeap, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ana Bueno and Niurka Figueredo
Defendant: GoodLeap, LLC and Modern Concepts Construction, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv24484
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER Administratively Closing Case. Pursuant to [ECF No. 14], this case is hereby administratively closed. The parties shall provide the Court with joint status reports every sixty (60) days regarding the status of the arbitration proceedings. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 12/22/2023. (mei)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration. The parties shall provide the Court with joint status reports every sixty (60) days regarding the status of the arbitration proceedings. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 12/22/2023. See attached document for full details. (mei)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER on #8 Motion to Compel Arbitration. On December 18, 2023, Plaintiffs filed their Response to Defendant GoodLeap, LLC's Motion to Compel Arbitration, [ECF No. 12]. In their response, Plaintiffs represent that they do not oppose Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration. However, Defendant Modern Concepts Construction, LLC has not yet indicated its position on arbitration. Further, it appears that Defendant Modern Concepts Construction, LLC has also failed to join in or consent to the notice of removal. See Removal Status Report, [ECF No. 9]. Accordingly, on or before December 21, 2023, Defendant Modern Concepts Construction, LLC shall file a status report with the Court indicating its position regarding arbitration, as well as its position on removal. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 12/18/2023. (mei)
December 18, 2023 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Ana Bueno, Niurka Figueredo. Replies due by 12/27/2023. (Vidales, Andres)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #10 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Goodleaps Motion to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration. Plaintiff has not provided the Court with good cause to extend the deadline. Moreover, the Court encourages Plaintiff to consider the Order it entered compelling arbitration under what appears to be an identical contract in Baldassarre v. GoodLeap, LLC (0:23-cv-61931-RAR) in deciding whether to oppose arbitration. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 12/15/2023. (mei)
December 15, 2023 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Ana Bueno, Niurka Figueredo. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vidales, Andres)
December 13, 2023 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT of REMOVAL by GoodLeap, LLC (Labarge, Sophie)
December 4, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by GoodLeap, LLC. Responses due by 12/18/2023 (Anderson, Terrance)
November 29, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Civil Cover Sheet by GoodLeap, LLC. (Anderson, Terrance)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING REMOVAL STATUS REPORT. Removal Status Report due by 12/13/2023. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II, on 11/28/2023. See attached document for full details. (caw)
November 28, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sophie Madeleine Labarge on behalf of GoodLeap, LLC. Attorney Sophie Madeleine Labarge added to party GoodLeap, LLC(pty:dft). (Labarge, Sophie)
November 28, 2023 Filing 4 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Joseph Kennett, mailing date November 28, 2023, (pt)
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (caw)
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (caw)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Bueno v. Modern Concepts Construction, LLC) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17099075, filed by GoodLeap, LLC.(Anderson, Terrance) Modified on 11/28/2023: State Court Complaint beginning on page 10. No Answer/Motion to Dismiss filed (caw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bueno et al v. GoodLeap, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Bueno
Represented By: Andres Felipe Vidales
Represented By: Reginald John Clyne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Niurka Figueredo
Represented By: Andres Felipe Vidales
Represented By: Reginald John Clyne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoodLeap, LLC
Represented By: Terrance Wayne Anderson, Jr.
Represented By: Sophie Madeleine Labarge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Modern Concepts Construction, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Kennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?