De La Rosa v. State of Florida et al
Plaintiff: Mickel De La Rosa
Defendant: State of Florida, Jackson Memorial Hospital, Jackson Memorial Hospital "TRUSTS" and Miami-Dade Fire Rescue Dept.
Case Number: 1:2023cv24498
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying as moot #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; denying as moot #5 Motion to Produce; denying as moot #6 Motion to Produce; denying as moot #7 Motion to Produce; denying as moot #8 Motion to Produce; denying as moot #9 Motion for Hearing; denying as moot #11 Motion to Compel; denying as moot #12 Motion to Appoint Special Process Server. ; denying as moot #13 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 12/14/2023. See attached document for full details. (nwn)
December 12, 2023 Filing 14 APPENDIX of Omnibus Motions Filed by Mickel De La Rosa (nwn)
December 12, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Mickel De La Rosa. Responses due by 12/27/2023 (nwn)
December 12, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Service by Clerk of Courts or Marshals to all Defendants; Lawyers- Law Firms by Mickel De La Rosa. Responses due by 12/27/2023 (nwn)
December 12, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for this Court's Ordered Appearance of all Law Firms/Lawyers of Defendants by Mickel De La Rosa. Responses due by 12/27/2023 (nwn)
December 12, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE to the Honorable Judge Gayles in re: to Recusal or Dismissal in this Civil Matter by Mickel De La Rosa (nwn)
December 12, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for a Court Order to the Clerks or Deputies in Charge or Legal Assistants for Oral Initial Arguments via Zoom by Mickel De La Rosa. (nwn)
December 12, 2023 Filing 8 Emergency MOTION Duces Tecnum or Discovery for Court Ordered Subpoenas for all Audio and Videos by Miami-Dade Fire Rescue on 2023 of Plaintif by Mickel De La Rosa. (nwn)
December 12, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION Duces Tecnum for all Video of Vehicle Dash-Cam of Plaintiff on 2023 by Miami-Dade Police Dept. and Miami Dade Fire Rescue Dept. by Mickel De La Rosa. (nwn)
December 12, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION Duces Tecnum for the Entire Video of Plaintiff at Jackson Memorial Hospital from 2023 to 2023 by Mickel De La Rosa. (nwn)
December 12, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION to Produce Duces Tecnum for all Audio Video of City of Miami's Police Officers of Plaintiff on 2023 by Mickel De La Rosa. (nwn)
December 12, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mickel De La Rosa. (Attachments: #1 Account Report)(nwn)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Dismissing Case / Closing Case. (Without Prejudice) Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 11/30/2023. See attached document for full details. (ra)
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Jackson Memorial Hospital, Jackson Memorial Hospital "TRUSTS", Miami-Dade Fire Rescue Dept., State of Florida. Filing fee $ 402.00 Receipt#: (FEE NOT PAID/ NO IFP FILED), filed by Mickel De La Rosa.(amb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De La Rosa v. State of Florida et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mickel De La Rosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson Memorial Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson Memorial Hospital "TRUSTS"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami-Dade Fire Rescue Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?