Boyle v. TracFone Wireless, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Richard Gerard Boyle
Defendant: TracFone Wireless, Inc. and Magen Menendez
Case Number: 1:2023cv24504
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING #18 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 1/18/2024. See attached document for full details. (caw)
January 9, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION to Alter or Amend #6 Judgment Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59(e), by Richard Gerard Boyle. Responses due by 1/23/2024. (scn)
January 4, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE TO COURT Re: Returned privileged mail - missing Court Control Number ("CCN") by Richard Gerard Boyle. (caw)
December 21, 2023 Filing 16 Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re #10 Notice of Appeal, filed by Richard Gerard Boyle. Date received by USCA: 12/19/2023. USCA Case Number: 23-14100-C. (jgo)
December 20, 2023 Filing 15 Important NOTICE to Clerk of Court by Richard Gerard Boyle. (kpe)
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #13 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis without prejudice. Motions to appeal in forma pauperis are governed by 28 U.S.C. 1915 and Rule 24 of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. A proper motion to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") on appeal requires (1) an affidavit that (2) shows in detail the party's inability to pay or to give security for fees and costs, (3) claims an entitlement to redress, and (4) states the issues that the party intends to present on appeal. See Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(1). Boyle's IFP Motion does not say which issues he intends to present on appeal. See generally IFP Motion [ECF No. #13 ]. Having failed to meet all of the requirements of Rule 24, Boyle's IFP Motion is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 12/19/2023. (cps)
December 19, 2023 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE of Mailing Pro Se Instructions to Richard Gerard Boyle re #10 Notice of Appeal. (apz)
December 19, 2023 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Order under appeal, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #12 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
December 18, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Richard Gerard Boyle (construed from Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs). (apz)
December 18, 2023 Filing 12 Second Notice of Appeal re #6 Order Dismissing/Closing Case by Richard Gerard Boyle. IFP Filed. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under All Forms and look for Transcript Order Form #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms. (apz) Modified text on 12/19/2023 (apz).
December 18, 2023 Filing 9 Clerk NOTICE of Compliance re 8 Paperless Order: a new copy of Order [ECF No. 6] was mailed to the Plaintiff. The "court control number" was included on Plaintiff's mailing envelope. (kma)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER requiring the Clerk of the Court to send the Plaintiff a new copy of our December 1, 2023 Order [ECF No. #6 ]. On December 14, 2023, the Plaintiff sent an "Important Notice to the Clerk of Court" explaining that "mail from your court was 'Returned to Sender' because it was missing the [court control number]." Notice to Clerk [ECF No. #7 ] at 1. The Plaintiff is currently incarcerated at a facility run by the Pennsylvania Department of Corrections, and the Department requires that all legal mail have a "court control number... placed on the exterior of the envelope." Travillion v. Pa. Dep't of Corr., 2023 WL 6796538, at *2 (M.D. Pa. Oct. 13, 2023). We've since received a "court control number" from the Pennsylvania Department of Corrections and the Clerk has added it to the Plaintiff's mailing address on file. Accordingly, we now ORDER the Clerk to send the Plaintiff a new copy of our December 1, 2023 Order [ECF No. #6 ], taking care to include the "court control number" on its mailing envelope. If the Plaintiff believes that late notice of our December 1, 2023 Order affected any of his rights, then he is welcome to file an appropriate motion. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 12/18/2023. (cps)
December 15, 2023 Filing 10 Notice of Appeal re #6 Order Dismissing/Closing Case by Richard Gerard Boyle. Receipt#: Filing Fee: NOT PAID. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under All Forms and look for Transcript Order Form #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms. (apz)
December 15, 2023 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Order under appeal, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #10 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
December 14, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COURT by Richard Gerard Boyle. (caw)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM; DENYING ALL PENDING MOTIONS AS MOOT; AND CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 12/1/2023. See attached document for full details. (caw)
November 27, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION to Request The Court to Order Marshal Service to Serve Each Defendant without Cost to Plaintiff by Richard Gerard Boyle. Responses due by 12/11/2023 (Attachments: #1 Order)(kma)
November 27, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel by Richard Gerard Boyle. Responses due by 12/11/2023 (kma)
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Richard Gerard Boyle. (kma)
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman (kma)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Magen Menendez, TracFone Wireless, Inc.. Filing fee $ 402.00 (IFP Motion filed), filed by Richard Gerard Boyle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - T, #3 Certificate of Service)(kma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyle v. TracFone Wireless, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Gerard Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TracFone Wireless, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magen Menendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?