Gorman v. Breeze Condominium Association, Inc, et al
Plaintiff: Hannah Gorman
Defendant: Breeze Condominium Association, Inc,, Nautica Management, LLC and Richard Muller
Case Number: 1:2023cv24513
Filed: November 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 3601 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #17 Plaintiff Hannah Gorman's Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 2/7/2024. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/23/2024. (dyg)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #16 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Hannah Gorman. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cunningham, Juan)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Breeze Condominium Association, Inc,, Richard Muller, Nautica Management, LLC. Responses due by 1/24/2024. (Jara, Franklin)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Adam Jason Steinberg representing Breeze Condominium Association, Inc, (Defendant) and Nautica Management, LLC (Defendant) and Muller, Richard (Defendant); withdrawn from case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/5/2024. (dyg)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Adam J. Steinberg for / by Breeze Condominium Association, Inc,, Richard Muller, Nautica Management, LLC. Responses due by 1/5/2024 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Steinberg, Adam)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #7 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Responses due by 1/10/2024. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 12/21/2023. See attached document for full details. (dyg)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complaint re #1 Complaint,, #11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Complaint re #1 Complaint,. Filer Selected the Wrong Motion Relief(s); ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order PAPERLESS Motions terminated: #10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, #11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 12/21/2023. (dyg)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Breeze Condominium Association, Inc,. Responses due by 1/3/2024 (Jara, Franklin) Modified Relief on 12/21/2023 (ls). Modified on 12/21/2023 (mf).
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Richard Muller, Nautica Management, LLC. Responses due by 1/3/2024 (Jara, Franklin) Modified Relief on 12/21/2023 (ls). Modified on 12/21/2023 (mf).
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Franklin Antonio Jara on behalf of Breeze Condominium Association, Inc,. Attorney Franklin Antonio Jara added to party Breeze Condominium Association, Inc,(pty:dft). (Jara, Franklin)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Franklin Antonio Jara on behalf of Richard Muller, Nautica Management, LLC. Attorney Franklin Antonio Jara added to party Richard Muller(pty:dft), Attorney Franklin Antonio Jara added to party Nautica Management, LLC(pty:dft). (Jara, Franklin)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Breeze Condominium Association, Inc,, Richard Muller, Nautica Management, LLC. Attorney Adam Jason Steinberg added to party Breeze Condominium Association, Inc,(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Jason Steinberg added to party Richard Muller(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Jason Steinberg added to party Nautica Management, LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Steinberg, Adam)
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Hannah Gorman. Richard Muller served on 12/16/2023, response/answer due 1/8/2024. (Cunningham, Juan)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Hannah Gorman. Nautica Management, LLC served on 11/30/2023, response/answer due 12/21/2023. (Cunningham, Juan)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Hannah Gorman. Breeze Condominium Association, Inc, served on 12/1/2023, response/answer due 12/22/2023. (Cunningham, Juan)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Breeze Condominium Association, Inc,, Richard Muller, and Nautica Management, LLC. (wce)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (wce)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17106290, filed by Hannah Gorman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Breeze Condominium, #3 Summon(s) Nautica Management, #4 Summon(s) Muller)(Cunningham, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gorman v. Breeze Condominium Association, Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Gorman
Represented By: Juan Courtney Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breeze Condominium Association, Inc,
Represented By: Franklin Antonio Jara
Represented By: Adam Jason Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nautica Management, LLC
Represented By: Franklin Antonio Jara
Represented By: Adam Jason Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Muller
Represented By: Franklin Antonio Jara
Represented By: Adam Jason Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?