Socket Solutions, LLC v. Import Global, LLC
Plaintiff: Socket Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Import Global, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv24517
Filed: November 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Lauren Fleischer Louis
Referring Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 0271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Filing 24 Plaintiff's REPLY in Support of its Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Socket Solutions, LLC. (Stearns, Jason)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REFERRING MOTION. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 636(b)(1)(A) and the Magistrate Judge Rules of the Local Rules of the Southern District of Florida, the above-styled case is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis to take all action as required by law on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, ECF No. #12 . Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 1/19/2024. See attached document for full details. (rbe)
January 19, 2024 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Import Global, LLC. Replies due by 1/26/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Affidavit DECLARATION)(Lieberman, Mendy)
January 16, 2024 Filing 21 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II: Zoom Status Conference held on 1/16/2024. Attorney Appearance(s): Mendy Lieberman, David Fink, Jason Paul Stearns, Edward H. Rice, Court Reporter: Ilona Lupowitz, 305-523-5737 / Ilona_lupowitz@flsd.uscourts.gov. (gp)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Jury Trial set for 1/13/2025 in Miami Division before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II. Calendar Call set for 1/7/2025 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II. Amended Pleadings due by 2/23/2024. Discovery due by 10/11/2024. Expert Discovery due by 10/11/2024. Joinder of Parties due by 2/23/2024. Mediation Deadline 10/18/2024. In Limine Motions due by 11/22/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2024. Motions due by 10/25/2024. Pretrial Stipulation due by 11/22/2024. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and this District's Magistrate Judge Rules, all discovery matters are hereby referred to United States Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 1/12/2024. See attached document for full details. (rbe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Markman Hearing set for 6/12/2024 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II Per Order DE #20 . Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 1/12/2024. See attached document for full details. (rbe)
January 11, 2024 Filing 19 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Socket Solutions, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stearns, Jason)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting [15, 16] Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for attorneys David Fink and Edward Rice. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 1/11/2024. (agh)
January 11, 2024 Filing 17 Plaintiff Socket Solutions, LLC's ANSWER to Counterclaim by Socket Solutions, LLC. (Stearns, Jason)
January 11, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for David Fink. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17205356 by Import Global, LLC. Responses due by 1/25/2024. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lieberman, Mendy)
January 11, 2024 Filing 15 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Edward H. Rice. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-17205205 by Socket Solutions, LLC. Responses due by 1/25/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certification, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Stearns, Jason)
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER setting status conference via Zoom on Tuesday, January 16, 2024 at 2:00 P.M.The Zoom conference can be accessed at https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1602475715?pwd=eFd0bmRRa2NPKzB4bHdTb2VJQXpVdz09. Meeting ID: 160 247 5715 Passcode: 245760 Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 1/9/2024. (agh)
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit. The Court will consider the pages in excess of the limit in the Motion for Preliminary Injunction, ECF No. #12 . Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 1/9/2024. (agh)
January 8, 2024 Filing 12 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Socket Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Declaration of Michael George Insalaco)(Stearns, Jason)
January 8, 2024 Filing 11 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Socket Solutions, LLC. (Stearns, Jason)
January 8, 2024 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement and certificate of interested parties by Import Global, LLC (Lieberman, Mendy)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. The parties are directed to prepare and file a joint scheduling report, as required by Local Rule 16.1, by January 11, 2024. In addition, by January 11, 2024, the parties, including governmental parties, must file Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 12/21/2023. See attached document for full details. (rbe)
December 21, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Import Global, LLC. Attorney Mendy Lieberman added to party Import Global, LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit c, #4 Exhibit d, #5 Exhibit e, #6 Exhibit f)(Lieberman, Mendy)
December 20, 2023 Filing 7 Plaintiff's NOTICE by Socket Solutions, LLC re #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Issued (Gottlieb, Sarah)
November 30, 2023 Filing 6 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Socket Solutions, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Michael G Insalaco for Socket Solutions, LLC (Stearns, Jason)
November 30, 2023 Filing 5 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Edward H. Rice, mailing date November 30, 2023, (pt)
November 30, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Import Global, LLC. (nwn)
November 30, 2023 Filing 3 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Complaint & Exhibits) (nwn)
November 29, 2023 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nwn)
November 29, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief Requested against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17106559, filed by Socket Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Patent No. 9509080, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s) To Defendant c/o Abraham Habosha, Registered Agent)(Stearns, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Socket Solutions, LLC v. Import Global, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Socket Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Jason Paul Stearns
Represented By: Sarah Anne Gottlieb
Represented By: Edward H. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Import Global, LLC
Represented By: Mendy Lieberman
Represented By: David Fink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?