Betterson v. The Town of Cutler Bay et al
Plaintiff: Melissa Antoinette Betterson
Defendant: The Town of Cutler Bay, Miami Dade County, Stephanie V Daniels, Major Leonard Ricelli, Officer C Castillo, Officer C. Romero-Arredondo and Rafael G Casals
Case Number: 1:2023cv24525
Filed: November 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re #19 Summons Returned Unexecuted. By 2/28/2024, Plaintiff shall file proof of service on Defendant, Officer C Castillo, or show cause why this Defendant should not be dismissed for failure to perfect service of process. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/22/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER that Defendants, Stephanie V. Daniels, Romero-Arredondo, Miami Dade County, the Town of Cutler Bay, and Rafael G. Casals, shall submit a single, combined response or separate answers within the time allowed for the last of these Defendants to respond. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/22/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties by 2/20/2024. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/22/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
January 22, 2024 Filing 22 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12. Leonard Ricelli served on 1/17/2024, response/answer due 2/7/2024. (wce)
January 22, 2024 Filing 21 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12. Rafael G Casals served on 1/17/2024, response/answer due 2/7/2024. (wce)
January 22, 2024 Filing 20 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 The Town of Cutler Bay served on 1/17/2024, response/answer due 2/7/2024. (wce)
January 22, 2024 Filing 19 Summons (Affidavit) Returned Unexecuted as to C Castillo. (wce)
January 22, 2024 Filing 18 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 Miami Dade County served on 1/16/2024, response/answer due 2/6/2024. (wce)
January 22, 2024 Filing 17 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 C. Romero-Arredondo served on 1/18/2024, response/answer due 2/8/2024. (wce)
January 22, 2024 Filing 16 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 Stephanie V Daniels served on 1/17/2024, response/answer due 2/7/2024. (wce)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying as moot #13 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/8/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
January 8, 2024 Filing 14 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Partial Filing Fee received on 1/8/2024 in the amount of $ 82.00, receipt number 17836. (wce)
January 8, 2024 Filing 13 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REINSTATE/REOPEN CLOSED/ DISMISSED CASE DUE TO JUDICIAL ERROR by Melissa Antoinette Betterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(wce)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER setting aside #10 Order; REOPENING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/8/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
January 8, 2024 Filing 11 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Partial Filing Fee received on 12/21/2023 in the amount of $ 80.00, receipt number 17773 (pcs)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (SET ASIDE PER DE#12) ORDER Dismissing Case / Closing Case (Without Prejudice). Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/5/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1) Modified text on 1/8/2024 (scn).
December 15, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Compliance re #8 Summons Issued. Pursuant to Order at DE#7 documents at DE#1, DE#7, and DE#8 provided to USM for service. (scn)
December 15, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Rafael G Casals, C Castillo, Stephanie V Daniels, Miami Dade County, Leonard Ricelli, C. Romero-Arredondo, The Town of Cutler Bay. (scn)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appoint Special Process Server and Motion for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program. The Clerk is instructed to process and send the summonses to the U.S. Marshal for service. Upon receipt of the Complaint and summonses, the United States Marshal shall promptly complete service and immediately thereafter file proof of service with the Clerk of the Court. Plaintiff shall submit the summonses to the Clerk to process by December 18, 2023. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/12/2023. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
December 12, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Order Directing Service of Summons and Complaint via the United States Marshal Service, Responses due by 12/27/2023. MOTION for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program by Melissa Antoinette Betterson. (scn)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER PROVIDING INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/1/2023. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to the extend Plaintiff does not need to prepay. Plaintiff to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee but Establishing Debt to Clerk, to be paid in installments, beginning with $70 on 12/30/2023, and $70 on the 30th of each month thereafter. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/1/2023. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
November 30, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Melissa Antoinette Betterson. (pc)
November 30, 2023 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pc)
November 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rafael G Casals, C Castillo, Stephanie V Daniels, Miami Dade County, Leonard Ricelli, C. Romero-Arredondo, The Town of Cutler Bay. Filing fees $ 402.00 (FEE NOT PAID). IFP Filed, filed by Melissa Antoinette Betterson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix)(pc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Betterson v. The Town of Cutler Bay et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Antoinette Betterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Town of Cutler Bay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami Dade County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie V Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Leonard Ricelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer C Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer C. Romero-Arredondo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafael G Casals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?