Blansett v. ABB INC. et al
Plaintiff: ROBERT BLANSETT
Defendant: ABB INC., CBS CORPORATION, FLOWSERVE CORPORATION, FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORP., HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC., ITE CIRCUIT BREAKER COMPANY, AIR & LIQUID SYSTEM CORPORATION, ALCATEL-LUCENT USA INC., ALFA LAVAL, INC., ANCHOR DARLING VALVE COMPANY, ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, A.O. SMITH CORPORATION, AURORA PUMP COMPANY, VIACOM, INC., CRANE CO., DOVER CORPORATION, EATON CORPORATION, ERICSSON, INC., DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION, FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION, FMC CORPORATION, GARDNER DENVER, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GOULDS PUMPS, INC., GRAYBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY, ALLIED SIGNAL, DELAVAL TURBINE, INC., ITT LLC, JENKINS BROS., JOHN CRANE, 1NC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, LTL MANAGEMENT, LLC, PHILADELPHIA GEAR CORPORATION, PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC., ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC., SQUARE D COMPANY, TACO, INC, WARREN PUMPS, LLC, WEIL-MCLAIN, Redco Corporation, Jenkins Brothers, John Crane, Inc., Taco, Inc., Blackmer Pump Company and Flowserve US Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv24586
Filed: December 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2024 Filing 122 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Keating Casbarro on behalf of Robert Blansett. Attorney Matthew Keating Casbarro added to party Robert Blansett(pty:pla). (Casbarro, Matthew)
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 121 PAPERLESS ORDER Requiring Amended Briefing. The parties premise, in part, their Motion to Remand briefings, ECF Nos. [84, 115, 119] on Defendant Alfa Laval, Inc.'s status as a government contractor. Upon Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, ECF No. #118 , the Court dismissed Alfa Laval, Inc. from the action. See ECF 120 . Accordingly, the Motion to Remand ECF #84 , is hereby DENIED without prejudice and with leave to refile. Defendants shall file an Amended Motion to Remand, given Defendant Alfa Laval's dismissal, and the parties shall adhere to the following briefing schedule:Amended Motion to Remand due on or before February 9, 2024.Responses due on or before February 23, 2024.Replies due on or before March 1, 2024. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 1/26/2024. (agh)
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 120 PAPERLESS ORDER on #118 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice ("Notice"). The Court having reviewed the Notice, the record, and being otherwise fully advised, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Defendant Alfa Laval, Inc. is hereby dismissed from this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 1/26/2024. (agh)
January 25, 2024 Filing 119 Plaintiff's REPLY to Response to Motion re #84 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Robert Blansett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Becerra, Jose Luis)
January 25, 2024 Filing 118 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Alfa Laval, Inc., only by Robert Blansett (Becerra, Jose Luis)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 117 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #116 Unopposed Motion of Brianna E. Donet to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendants Johnson & Johnson and LLT Management LLC. Brianna E. Donet is hereby DISCHARGED of all further responsibilities related to Defendants Johnson & Johnson and LLT Management LLC. The Clerk is directed to remove Brianna E. Donet from the CM/ECF electronic list of counsel to be served in this action. Ryan S. Cobbs, Amy Lane Hurwitz, and Ashley C. Drumm of Carlton Fields, P.A. shall remain counsel of record for Defendants Johnson & Johnson and LLT Management LLC. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 1/24/2024. (agh)
January 24, 2024 Filing 116 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Brianna E. Donet for / by Johnson & Johnson, LTL Management, LLC. Responses due by 2/7/2024. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw)(Donet, Brianna)
January 18, 2024 Filing 115 RESPONSE in Opposition re #84 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Alfa Laval, Inc., CBS Corporation, Foster Wheeler Energy Corp., General Electric Company. Replies due by 1/25/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Collings, Christopher)
January 16, 2024 Filing 114 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Anchor Darling Valve Company. (Horn, Hanson)
January 16, 2024 Filing 113 Amended Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by LTL Management, LLC (Donet, Brianna)
January 16, 2024 Filing 112 Amended Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Johnson & Johnson (Donet, Brianna)
January 16, 2024 Filing 111 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Anchor Darling Valve Company identifying Corporate Parent Superior Group, Inc. for Anchor Darling Valve Company (Horn, Hanson)
January 11, 2024 Filing 110 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the address and email information as submitted through attorney's PACER account for attorney Timothy Clark re #109 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name. Attorney is responsible for updating his secondary email address. (cw)
January 10, 2024 Filing 109 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Timothy Clark (Clark, Timothy)
January 9, 2024 Filing 108 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by ERICSSON, INC. identifying Corporate Parent Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson, Other Affiliate Investor AB, Other Affiliate AB Industrivarden for ERICSSON, INC. (McCormack, Catherine)
January 8, 2024 Filing 107 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hanson Douglas Horn on behalf of ANCHOR DARLING VALVE COMPANY. Attorney Hanson Douglas Horn added to party ANCHOR DARLING VALVE COMPANY(pty:dft). (Horn, Hanson)
January 5, 2024 Filing 106 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Redco Corporation f/k/a Crane Co. identifying Corporate Parent Spruce Lake Liability Management Holdco LLC for Redco Corporation f/k/a Crane Co. (Gonzalez, Alejandra)
January 5, 2024 Filing 105 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #101 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (pcs)
January 5, 2024 Filing 104 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #95 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (pcs)
January 4, 2024 Filing 103 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALFA LAVAL, INC. identifying Corporate Parent Alfa Laval AB for ALFA LAVAL, INC. (Pazos, Lucia)
January 4, 2024 Filing 102 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Scheduling Order Chart, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Proposed Scheduling Order, #3 Exhibit C - Defendants Proposed Scheduling Order)(Chung-Tims, Melanie)
January 4, 2024 Filing 101 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Redco Corporation f/k/a Crane Co. (Gonzalez, Alejandra)
January 4, 2024 Filing 100 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC. (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
January 4, 2024 Filing 99 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by GOULDS PUMPS, INC. identifying Corporate Parent Sapphire Topco Inc. for GOULDS PUMPS, INC. (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
January 4, 2024 Filing 98 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by ABB INC.(individually and as successor-in-interest to ITE IMPERIAL CO.) identifying Corporate Parent ABB Holdings Inc, Corporate Parent ABB ASEA Brown Boveri Ltd. for ABB INC. (Medina, Eduardo)
January 4, 2024 Filing 97 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by WEIL-MCLAIN identifying Corporate Parent Canvas WM, LLC, Other Affiliate Canvas SX, LLC for WEIL-MCLAIN (Rodriguez de Conte, Ashley)
January 4, 2024 Filing 96 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the address information as submitted through attorney's PACER account for attorney Monika Ledlova. (cw)
January 4, 2024 Filing 95 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by ERICSSON, INC. (McCormack, Catherine)
January 4, 2024 Filing 94 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by LTL MANAGEMENT, LLC (Donet, Brianna)
January 4, 2024 Filing 93 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by JOHNSON & JOHNSON (Donet, Brianna)
January 4, 2024 Filing 92 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #88 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (pcs)
January 4, 2024 Filing 91 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated address or email information for attorney Ashley Sabrina Rodriguez de Conte re #87 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name. Attorney has not followed the required procedures for updating their information with the Court. Attorney is instructed to file a Notice of Change of Address/Email Law Firm Name in all pending cases, and then go to their PACER account, Manage My Account, to complete the process of updating their information. See the Court's website for detailed instructions. #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/updating-your-information. (cw)
January 4, 2024 Filing 90 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated address or email information for attorney Monika Ledlova. Attorney has not followed the required procedures for updating their information with the Court. Attorney is instructed to go to their PACER account, Manage My Account, to complete the process of updating their information. See the Court's website for detailed instructions. #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/updating-your-information. (cw)
January 4, 2024 Filing 89 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Ferguson, Timothy)
January 4, 2024 Filing 88 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by WEIL-MCLAIN (Rodriguez de Conte, Ashley)
January 4, 2024 Filing 87 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Ashley Sabrina Rodriguez de Conte (Rodriguez de Conte, Ashley)
January 4, 2024 Filing 86 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Monika Ledlova (Ledlova, Monika)
January 4, 2024 Filing 85 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC. (Stepanova, Julia)
January 4, 2024 Filing 84 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court by ROBERT BLANSETT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Becerra, Jose Luis)
January 4, 2024 Filing 83 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by GARDNER DENVER, INC. identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll Rand Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for GARDNER DENVER, INC. (Kibbe, Rebecca)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 82 PAPERLESS ORDER striking #81 Notice of Taking Videotaped Deposition ("Notice"). Local Rule 26.1(b) of the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida provides that "discovery requests, responses, objections, notices or any associated proof of service shall not be filed with the Court until they are used in the proceeding or the court orders their filing." To date, the Notice has not been used in this proceeding, nor has the Court ordered its filing. Accordingly, the Notice is hereby STRICKEN. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 1/3/2024. (agh)
January 3, 2024 Filing 81 STRICKEN per Order DE 82 . NOTICE to Take Deposition of Robert Blansett by ROBERT BLANSETT.(Becerra, Jose Luis) Modified on 1/4/2024 (pcs).
January 3, 2024 Filing 80 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alejandra Desiree Gonzalez on behalf of Redco Corporation f/k/a Crane Co.. Attorney Alejandra Desiree Gonzalez added to party Redco Corporation f/k/a Crane Co.(pty:dft). (Gonzalez, Alejandra)
January 3, 2024 Filing 79 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by FMC CORPORATION (Reddin, John)
January 3, 2024 Filing 78 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent BP P.L.C. for ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY (Schulte, Thomas)
January 3, 2024 Filing 77 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #76 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (pcs)
January 2, 2024 Filing 76 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by GARDNER DENVER, INC. (Kibbe, Rebecca)
January 2, 2024 Filing 75 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by A.O. SMITH CORPORATION (Clark, Timothy)
January 2, 2024 Filing 74 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #71 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (pcs)
January 2, 2024 Filing 73 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by WEIL-MCLAIN. (Rodriguez de Conte, Ashley)
January 2, 2024 Filing 72 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ashley Sabrina Rodriguez de Conte on behalf of WEIL-MCLAIN. Attorney Ashley Sabrina Rodriguez de Conte added to party WEIL-MCLAIN(pty:dft). (Rodriguez de Conte, Ashley)
January 2, 2024 Filing 71 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by GARDNER DENVER, INC. (Kibbe, Rebecca)
December 29, 2023 Filing 70 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Monica Renee Brownewell Smith on behalf of PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC.. Attorney Monica Renee Brownewell Smith added to party PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC.(pty:dft). (Brownewell Smith, Monica)
December 24, 2023 Filing 69 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy Clark on behalf of A.O. SMITH CORPORATION. Attorney Timothy Clark added to party A.O. SMITH CORPORATION(pty:dft). (Clark, Timothy)
December 22, 2023 Filing 68 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by AIR & LIQUID SYSTEM CORPORATION. (Melaragno, Peter)
December 21, 2023 Filing 67 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS CORPORATION identifying Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc., Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Other Affiliate State Street Corporation for CBS CORPORATION (Collings, Christopher)
December 21, 2023 Filing 66 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY identifying Other Affiliate GE Power India Limited, Other Affiliate GE T&D India Limited, Other Affiliate GE Capital Canada Funding Company, Other Affiliate GE Capital European Funding Unlimited Company, Other Affiliate GE Capital Funding, LLC, Other Affiliate GE Capital UK Funding Unlimited Company, Other Affiliate AerCap Holdings N.V., Other Affiliate GE Capital International Funding Company Unlimited Company, Other Affiliate GE SCF Societe En Commandite Par Actions, Other Affiliate China XD Electric Co. Ltd, Other Affiliate GE Healthcare Technologies Inc., Other Affiliate General Electric Credit Corporation of Tennessee, as successor of GE Capital Franchise Finance Corporation, Other Affiliate Security Capital Group Incorporated, for itself and as successor to SUSA Partnership, L.P. for GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (Collings, Christopher)
December 21, 2023 Filing 65 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORP. identifying Other Affiliate John Wood Group PLC (Scotland) for FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORP. (Collings, Christopher)
December 21, 2023 Filing 64 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC. identifying Corporate Parent Schneider Electric Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Schneider Electric Industries SAS, Corporate Parent Schneider Electric Holding Amerique du Nord, Corporate Parent Schneider Electric SE for SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC. (Mason, W.)
December 21, 2023 Filing 63 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.. (Mason, W.)
December 21, 2023 Filing 62 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by W. Scott Mason on behalf of SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.. Attorney W. Scott Mason added to party SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.(pty:dft). (Mason, W.)
December 21, 2023 Filing 61 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amy Lane Hurwitz on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, LTL MANAGEMENT, LLC. Attorney Amy Lane Hurwitz added to party JOHNSON & JOHNSON(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Lane Hurwitz added to party LTL MANAGEMENT, LLC(pty:dft). (Hurwitz, Amy)
December 21, 2023 Filing 60 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brianna Elizabeth Donet on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, LTL MANAGEMENT, LLC. Attorney Brianna Elizabeth Donet added to party JOHNSON & JOHNSON(pty:dft), Attorney Brianna Elizabeth Donet added to party LTL MANAGEMENT, LLC(pty:dft). (Donet, Brianna)
December 21, 2023 Filing 59 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ashley Christina Pears Drumm on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, LTL MANAGEMENT, LLC. Attorney Ashley Christina Pears Drumm added to party JOHNSON & JOHNSON(pty:dft), Attorney Ashley Christina Pears Drumm added to party LTL MANAGEMENT, LLC(pty:dft). (Drumm, Ashley)
December 21, 2023 Filing 58 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Stephen Cobbs on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, LTL MANAGEMENT, LLC. Attorney Ryan Stephen Cobbs added to party JOHNSON & JOHNSON(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan Stephen Cobbs added to party LTL MANAGEMENT, LLC(pty:dft). (Cobbs, Ryan)
December 21, 2023 Filing 57 Defendant Ericsson Inc's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by ERICSSON, INC.. (McCormack, Catherine)
December 21, 2023 Filing 56 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Catherine A McCormack on behalf of ERICSSON, INC.. Attorney Catherine A McCormack added to party ERICSSON, INC.(pty:dft). (McCormack, Catherine)
December 21, 2023 Filing 55 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by WARREN PUMPS, LLC identifying Corporate Parent ESAB Corporation for WARREN PUMPS, LLC (Briscoe, Edward)
December 21, 2023 Filing 54 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Flowserve US Inc. identifying Corporate Parent FLOWSERVE CORPORATION, f/k/a DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION, Other Affiliate Durametallic Corporation for Flowserve US Inc. (Alley, Todd)
December 21, 2023 Filing 53 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blackmer Pump Company identifying Corporate Parent DOVER CORPORATION for its BLACKMER PUMP Division, Corporate Parent dover pumps and processing for Blackmer Pump Company (Alley, Todd)
December 21, 2023 Filing 52 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by PHILADELPHIA GEAR CORPORATION identifying Corporate Parent Thunder Basin Corporation for PHILADELPHIA GEAR CORPORATION (Briscoe, Edward)
December 19, 2023 Filing 51 STATUS REPORT Removal Status Report by CBS CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit state court records and proceedings)(Collings, Christopher)
December 19, 2023 Filing 50 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by PHILADELPHIA GEAR CORPORATION. Attorney Dino Gale Galardi added to party PHILADELPHIA GEAR CORPORATION(pty:dft). (Galardi, Dino)
December 18, 2023 Filing 49 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephanie Margarita Selman on behalf of FMC CORPORATION. Attorney Stephanie Margarita Selman added to party FMC CORPORATION(pty:dft). (Selman, Stephanie)
December 15, 2023 Filing 48 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melanie Erica Chung-Tims on behalf of FMC CORPORATION (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
December 15, 2023 Filing 47 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORP.. (Collings, Christopher)
December 15, 2023 Filing 46 NOTICE by FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORP. re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Collings, Christopher)
December 15, 2023 Filing 45 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher J. M. Collings on behalf of FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORP.. Attorney Christopher J. M. Collings added to party FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORP.(pty:dft). (Collings, Christopher)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 PAPERLESS ORDER striking 42 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss ("Motion"). On December 13, 2023, the Court entered an Order striking Defendant Alfa Laval Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss and requiring combined responses ("Order"), ECF No. #38 . Pursuant to the Order, Defendants shall file a single combined response within the time allowed for the last-served Defendant to respond. Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to strike the Motion. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 12/14/2023. (agh)
December 14, 2023 Filing 43 STRICKEN per DE 44 . Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM OF SUCCESSOR LIABILITY FOR CROSBY VALVE AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW by FMC CORPORATION. Attorney Melanie Erica Chung-Tims added to party FMC CORPORATION(pty:dft). Responses due by 12/28/2023 (Chung-Tims, Melanie) Modified on 12/15/2023 (pcs).
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #41 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. There are no motions currently pending before this Court. For clarity of the record, Defendants may refile their motions in accordance with the Court's Order Striking Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Requiring Combined Responses. See ECF No. #38 at 1. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 12/14/2023. (agh)
December 14, 2023 Filing 41 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Pending Motions to Dismiss filed by Publix Super Markets, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, and LTL Management LLC by ROBERT BLANSETT. Responses due by 12/28/2023 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Becerra, Jose Luis)
December 14, 2023 Filing 40 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by EATON CORPORATION identifying Corporate Parent Eaton Corporation plc (Ireland) for EATON CORPORATION (Melaragno, Peter)
December 14, 2023 Filing 39 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by AIR & LIQUID SYSTEM CORPORATION identifying Corporate Parent Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation for AIR & LIQUID SYSTEM CORPORATION (Briscoe, Edward)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER STRIKING #28 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND REQUIRING COMBINED RESPONSES. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 12/13/2023. See attached document for full details. (agh)
December 13, 2023 Filing 37 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. identifying Corporate Parent ESAB Corporation for IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. (Briscoe, Edward)
December 13, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Monika Ledlova on behalf of GARDNER DENVER, INC.. Attorney Monika Ledlova added to party GARDNER DENVER, INC.(pty:dft). (Ledlova, Monika)
December 13, 2023 Filing 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Charles Reddin on behalf of FMC CORPORATION. Attorney John Charles Reddin added to party FMC CORPORATION(pty:dft). (Reddin, John)
December 13, 2023 Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stuart L. Cohen on behalf of FMC CORPORATION. Attorney Stuart L. Cohen added to party FMC CORPORATION(pty:dft). (Cohen, Stuart)
December 13, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alejandra Carolina Gancedo on behalf of FMC CORPORATION. Attorney Alejandra Carolina Gancedo added to party FMC CORPORATION(pty:dft). (Gancedo, Alejandra)
December 13, 2023 Filing 32 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by TACO, INC (Medina, Eduardo)
December 13, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eduardo J Medina on behalf of TACO, INC. Attorney Eduardo J Medina added to party TACO, INC(pty:dft). (Medina, Eduardo)
December 12, 2023 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Caitlyn R. McCutcheon on behalf of GOULDS PUMPS, INC.. Attorney Caitlyn R. McCutcheon added to party GOULDS PUMPS, INC.(pty:dft). (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
December 12, 2023 Filing 29 Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc.'s ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC.. (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
December 12, 2023 Filing 28 STRICKEN per Order DE #38 . Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, Alfa Laval Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Memorandum of Law by ALFA LAVAL, INC.. Responses due by 12/27/2023 (Pazos, Lucia) Modified on 12/14/2023 (pcs).
December 12, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Julia Stepanova on behalf of PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC.. Attorney Julia Stepanova added to party PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC.(pty:dft). (Stepanova, Julia)
December 12, 2023 Filing 26 Gardner Denver, Inc.'s ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by GARDNER DENVER, INC.. (Kibbe, Rebecca)
December 12, 2023 Filing 25 Durametallic Corporation ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Flowserve US Inc.. (Alley, Todd)
December 12, 2023 Filing 24 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Blackmer Pump Company. (Alley, Todd)
December 11, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward Joy Briscoe on behalf of AIR & LIQUID SYSTEM CORPORATION. Attorney Edward Joy Briscoe added to party AIR & LIQUID SYSTEM CORPORATION(pty:dft). (Briscoe, Edward)
December 11, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter J. Melaragno on behalf of AIR & LIQUID SYSTEM CORPORATION. Attorney Peter J. Melaragno added to party AIR & LIQUID SYSTEM CORPORATION(pty:dft). (Melaragno, Peter)
December 11, 2023 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated address and email information as submitted through attorney's PACER account for Christopher J. M. Collings. It is the attorney's responsibility to update his secondary email addresses. See the Court's website for detailed instructions. #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/updating-your-information. (cw)
December 8, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd Carlton Alley on behalf of Blackmer Pump Company, Flowserve US Inc.. Attorney Todd Carlton Alley added to party Blackmer Pump Company(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Carlton Alley added to party Flowserve US Inc.(pty:dft). (Alley, Todd)
December 8, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Christopher J. M. Collings (Collings, Christopher)
December 8, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher J. M. Collings on behalf of CBS CORPORATION (Collings, Christopher)
December 8, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher J. M. Collings on behalf of GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (Collings, Christopher)
December 8, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melanie Erica Chung-Tims on behalf of ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC.. Attorney Melanie Erica Chung-Tims added to party ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC.(pty:dft). (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
December 7, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rebecca Carrie Kibbe on behalf of GARDNER DENVER, INC.. Attorney Rebecca Carrie Kibbe added to party GARDNER DENVER, INC.(pty:dft). (Kibbe, Rebecca)
December 7, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE by ALFA LAVAL, INC. re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, Joinder in Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint and Sworn Information Form, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons and Service of Process, #3 Exhibit 3 - Sargent Decl.) (Pazos, Lucia)
December 7, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lucia V. Pazos on behalf of ALFA LAVAL, INC.. Attorney Lucia V. Pazos added to party ALFA LAVAL, INC.(pty:dft). (Pazos, Lucia)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES.The parties are directed to prepare and file a joint scheduling report, as required by Local Rule 16.1, by January 4, 2024. In addition, by January 4, 2024, the parties, including governmental parties, must file Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 12/7/2023. See attached document for full details. (rbe)
December 6, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE by WARREN PUMPS, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, Warren Pumps, LLC's Notice of Filing its Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Warren Pumps, LLC's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint) (Melaragno, Peter)
December 6, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward Joy Briscoe on behalf of WARREN PUMPS, LLC. Attorney Edward Joy Briscoe added to party WARREN PUMPS, LLC(pty:dft). (Briscoe, Edward)
December 6, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward Joy Briscoe on behalf of IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.. Attorney Edward Joy Briscoe added to party IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.(pty:dft). (Briscoe, Edward)
December 6, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter J. Melaragno on behalf of WARREN PUMPS, LLC. Attorney Peter J. Melaragno added to party WARREN PUMPS, LLC(pty:dft). (Melaragno, Peter)
December 6, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter J. Melaragno on behalf of IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.. Attorney Peter J. Melaragno added to party IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.(pty:dft). (Melaragno, Peter)
December 6, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter J. Melaragno on behalf of EATON CORPORATION. Attorney Peter J. Melaragno added to party EATON CORPORATION(pty:dft). (Melaragno, Peter)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING REMOVAL STATUS REPORT. Counsel for the removing party is directed to file and serve a Removal Status Report no later than December 19, 2023. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 12/5/2023. See attached document for full details. (rbe)
December 5, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Kiernan Schulte on behalf of ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY. Attorney Thomas Kiernan Schulte added to party ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY(pty:dft). (Schulte, Thomas)
December 5, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, . Attorney Christopher J. M. Collings added to party GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Collings, Christopher)
December 5, 2023 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (rbe)
December 5, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Blansett v. ABB, Inc. et al.) Filing fee $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17119758, filed by CBS CORPORATION, f/k/a VIACOM, INC., successor by merger to CBS CORPORATION, f/k/a WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION. Answer Filed- Exhibit C pg. 170-181,189-227,229-267,267-303 / Motion To Dismiss Filed- Exhibit C- pg. 183-186. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Collings, Christopher) Modified text & attachment description on 12/5/2023 (rbe).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blansett v. ABB INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABB INC.
Represented By: Eduardo J Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION
Represented By: Christopher J. M. Collings
Represented By: Erin E. Dardis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLOWSERVE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORP.
Represented By: Christopher J. M. Collings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: Timothy John Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: Peter J. Melaragno
Represented By: Edward Joy Briscoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.
Represented By: W. Scott Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITE CIRCUIT BREAKER COMPANY
Represented By: Eduardo J Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIR & LIQUID SYSTEM CORPORATION
Represented By: Edward Joy Briscoe
Represented By: Peter J. Melaragno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALCATEL-LUCENT USA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALFA LAVAL, INC.
Represented By: Lucia V. Pazos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANCHOR DARLING VALVE COMPANY
Represented By: Hanson Douglas Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY
Represented By: Thomas Kiernan Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.O. SMITH CORPORATION
Represented By: Timothy Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AURORA PUMP COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIACOM, INC.
Represented By: Erin E. Dardis
Represented By: Christopher J. M. Collings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE CO.
Represented By: Alejandra Desiree Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOVER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EATON CORPORATION
Represented By: Peter J. Melaragno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERICSSON, INC.
Represented By: Catherine A McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION
Represented By: Christopher J. M. Collings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC CORPORATION
Represented By: Melanie Erica Chung-Tims
Represented By: Alejandra Carolina Gancedo
Represented By: John Charles Reddin
Represented By: Stephanie Margarita Selman
Represented By: Stuart L. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARDNER DENVER, INC.
Represented By: Monika Ledlova
Represented By: Rebecca Carrie Kibbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: Christopher J. M. Collings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULDS PUMPS, INC.
Represented By: Caitlyn R. McCutcheon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRAYBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLIED SIGNAL
Represented By: Timothy John Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELAVAL TURBINE, INC.
Represented By: Edward Joy Briscoe
Represented By: Peter J. Melaragno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENKINS BROS.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN CRANE, 1NC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: Brianna Elizabeth Donet
Represented By: Ashley Christina Pears Drumm
Represented By: Ryan Stephen Cobbs
Represented By: Amy Lane Hurwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LTL MANAGEMENT, LLC
Represented By: Ashley Christina Pears Drumm
Represented By: Ryan Stephen Cobbs
Represented By: Amy Lane Hurwitz
Represented By: Brianna Elizabeth Donet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILADELPHIA GEAR CORPORATION
Represented By: Dino Gale Galardi
Represented By: Edward Joy Briscoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS, INC.
Represented By: Monica Renee Brownewell Smith
Represented By: Julia Stepanova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC.
Represented By: Melanie Erica Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SQUARE D COMPANY
Represented By: W. Scott Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TACO, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN PUMPS, LLC
Represented By: Edward Joy Briscoe
Represented By: Peter J. Melaragno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEIL-MCLAIN
Represented By: Ashley Sabrina Rodriguez de Conte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redco Corporation
Represented By: Alejandra Desiree Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenkins Brothers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taco, Inc.
Represented By: Eduardo J Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackmer Pump Company
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US Inc.
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT BLANSETT
Represented By: Jose Luis Becerra
Represented By: Matthew Keating Casbarro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?