Beck v. Carnival Corporation
Plaintiff: Mary Jane Beck
Defendant: Carnival Corporation, d/b/a Carnival Cruise Lines, Inc. and Carnival Corporation doing business as CARNIVAL CRUISE LINES
Case Number: 1:2023cv24636
Filed: December 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2024 Filing 8 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Mary Jane Beck (Butler, Frank)
January 26, 2024 Filing 7 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Defendant, Carnival Corporation's Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Parties by Carnival Corporation (Gordon, Michael)
January 25, 2024 Filing 6 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Counts I, II, and III of Plaintiff's Complaint by Carnival Corporation. Attorney Michael Charles Gordon added to party Carnival Corporation(pty:dft). Responses due by 2/8/2024. (Gordon, Michael)
January 4, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Mary Jane Beck. Carnival Corporation served on 1/4/2024, response/answer due 1/25/2024. (Butler, Frank)
January 3, 2024 Filing 4 Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Mary Jane Beck (Butler, Frank)
December 11, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Carnival Corporation. (rbe)
December 8, 2023 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (rbe)
December 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carnival Corporation, d/b/a Carnival Cruise Lines, Inc.. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17130945, filed by Mary Jane Beck. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Carnival Corp.)(Butler, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beck v. Carnival Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Jane Beck
Represented By: Frank D. Butler
Represented By: Griffin William Sher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival Corporation, d/b/a Carnival Cruise Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival Corporation doing business as CARNIVAL CRUISE LINES
Represented By: Michael Charles Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?