SCULLION v. Carnival Corporation et al
Plaintiff: MONICA SCULLION
Defendant: Carnival Corporation, One Spa World LLC and ONE SPA WORLD (BAHAMAS) LTD.
Case Number: 1:2023cv24817
Filed: December 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Response due 3/21/2024. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/15/2024. (dyg)
February 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss #11 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal DEFENDANTS CARNIVAL CORPORATION AND ONE SPA WORLD (BAHAMAS) LTD., MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS II, III AND IV OF PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT by MONICA SCULLION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Irazabal, Elizabeth)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss #11 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal DEFENDANTS CARNIVAL CORPORATION AND ONE SPA WORLD (BAHAMAS) LTD., MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS II, III AND IV OF PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT by Carnival Corporation, ONE SPA WORLD (BAHAMAS) LTD.. Responses due by 2/20/2024. (Michel, Lizbeth)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants, filed by MONICA SCULLION.(Irazabal, Elizabeth)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tyler James Canfield on behalf of Carnival Corporation, ONE SPA WORLD (BAHAMAS) LTD., One Spa World LLC. Attorney Tyler James Canfield added to party Carnival Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Tyler James Canfield added to party ONE SPA WORLD (BAHAMAS) LTD.(pty:dft), Attorney Tyler James Canfield added to party One Spa World LLC(pty:dft). (Canfield, Tyler)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement DEFENDANT ONE SPA WORLD (BAHAMAS) LTD.s CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by ONE SPA WORLD (BAHAMAS) LTD., One Spa World LLC identifying Other Affiliate ONE SPA WORLD (BAHAMAS) LTD. for ONE SPA WORLD (BAHAMAS) LTD., One Spa World LLC (Friedman, Darren)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carnival Corporation (Friedman, Darren)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, DEFENDANTS, CARNIVAL CORPORATION, ONE SPA WORLD, LLC, AND ONE SPA WORLD (BAHAMAS) LTD., MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS II, III AND IV by Carnival Corporation, ONE SPA WORLD (BAHAMAS) LTD., One Spa World LLC. Attorney Lizbeth M Michel added to party Carnival Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Lizbeth M Michel added to party ONE SPA WORLD (BAHAMAS) LTD.(pty:dft), Attorney Lizbeth M Michel added to party One Spa World LLC(pty:dft). Responses due by 1/25/2024. (Michel, Lizbeth)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by MONICA SCULLION. ONE SPA WORLD (BAHAMAS) LTD. served on 12/21/2023, response/answer due 1/11/2024. (Irazabal, Elizabeth)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by MONICA SCULLION. One Spa World LLC served on 12/21/2023, response/answer due 1/11/2024. (Irazabal, Elizabeth)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by MONICA SCULLION. Carnival Corporation served on 12/21/2023, response/answer due 1/11/2024. (Irazabal, Elizabeth)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Carnival Corporation, ONE SPA WORLD (BAHAMAS) LTD., One Spa World LLC. (rbe)
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (rbe)
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17157299, filed by MONICA SCULLION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s))(Irazabal, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCULLION v. Carnival Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONICA SCULLION
Represented By: Elizabeth Irazabal
Represented By: Jacqueline Garcell
Represented By: Jason Robert Margulies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival Corporation
Represented By: Darren Wayne Friedman
Represented By: Lizbeth M Michel
Represented By: Tyler James Canfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Spa World LLC
Represented By: Darren Wayne Friedman
Represented By: Lizbeth M Michel
Represented By: Tyler James Canfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONE SPA WORLD (BAHAMAS) LTD.
Represented By: Lizbeth M Michel
Represented By: Tyler James Canfield
Represented By: Darren Wayne Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?