United States of America v. Saint-Hilaire
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Aniel Saint-Hilaire
Case Number: 1:2024cv20753
Filed: February 27, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Becerra
Referring Judge: Jose E Martinez
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2024 Filing 28 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jacqueline Becerra: Evidentiary Motion Hearing held on 4/24/2024 re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by United States of America. Plaintiff witness: continuation of Keith Hayes. Defendant witness sworn/testified: Aniel Saint-Hilaire. Order to follow. Attorney Appearance(s): Ayuban Antonio Tomas, Jeremy A. Rill, Hana Bilicki McQuillan, Court Reporter: Vernita Allen-Williams, 305-523-5048 / Vernita_Allen-Williams@flsd.uscourts.gov. (dgj)
April 23, 2024 Pursuant to ECF No. 27 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2024 at 02:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Jacqueline Becerra. (dgj)
April 22, 2024 Filing 27 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jacqueline Becerra: Evidentiary Motion Hearing held on 4/22/2024 re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by United States of America. Court admitted Plaintiff's exhibits 1 thru 47. Witnesses sworn/testified: Harold Lopez, irfan Bostanic, Carl Roundtree, Asya Hall, Jorge Blanco, Maureen Parkes, Luis Bravo, Johnnie Gibson, Sylvain Fieneant, Tia Brown and SA/IRS Keith Hayes. Case continued to 4/24/24 at 2:30 p.m. Attorney Appearance(s): Ayuban Antonio Tomas, Jeremy A. Rill, Hana Bilicki McQuillan, Court Reporter: Vernita Allen-Williams, 305-523-5048 / Vernita_Allen-Williams@flsd.uscourts.gov. (dgj)
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE is before the Court on Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. ECF No. #8 . The United States filed a Response in Opposition. ECF No. #9 . Upon due consideration of the Motion and Response, the pertinent portions of the record and the relevant legal authorities, for good cause shown it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time, ECF No. #8 , is GRANTED nunc pro tunc. Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to the Complaint, and Response in Opposition to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction, ECF Nos. #19 , #20 , are deemed timely filed. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Becerra on 4/22/2024. (nsy)
April 19, 2024 Filing 25 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rill, Jeremy)
April 19, 2024 Filing 24 Initial Disclosure(s) by Aniel Saint-Hilaire (Tomas, Ayuban)
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER **TIME CHANGE ONLY** Re-setting Hearing on #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for 4/22/2024 at 12:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Jacqueline Becerra. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Becerra on 4/18/2024. (dgj)
April 15, 2024 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of Counsel CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST PERSON AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ayuban Antonio Tomas on behalf of Aniel Saint-Hilaire (Tomas, Ayuban)
April 8, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hana Bilicki McQuillan on behalf of United States of America. Attorney Hana Bilicki McQuillan added to party United States of America(pty:pla). (McQuillan, Hana)
April 5, 2024 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Aniel Saint-Hilaire. Replies due by 4/12/2024. (Tomas, Ayuban)
April 5, 2024 Filing 19 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Aniel Saint-Hilaire. (Tomas, Ayuban)
April 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING HEARING. Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, ECF No. #4 , is hereby SET for hearing on April 22, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. at the James Lawrence King Federal Justice Building, 99 NE 4th Street, Courtroom 10-6, Miami, Florida 33132. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Becerra on 4/3/2024. (ad02)
April 1, 2024 Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Responses due by 4/5/2024. (ls)(per DE #17)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE is before the Court on the Government's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. ECF No. #4 . Defendant is hereby ORDERED to file his response to the Motion, ECF No. #4 , no later than Friday, April 5, 2024. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Becerra on 4/1/2024. (nsy)
March 28, 2024 Filing 16 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by United States of America identifying Other Affiliate Internal Revenue Service for United States of America (Rill, Jeremy)
March 28, 2024 Filing 15 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #14 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates. Note - Other Affiliates do not appear on the docket sheet. (ls)
March 28, 2024 Filing 14 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by United States of America (Rill, Jeremy)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Regarding Procedures regarding Certificate of Interested Parties and Joint Scheduling Reports. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Becerra on 3/27/2024. See attached document for full details. (ls)
March 25, 2024 Filing 12 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jacqueline Becerra: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 3/25/2024. Order to follow. Attorney Appearance(s): Ayuban Antonio Tomas, Jeremy A. Rill, Elizabeth A. Kirby, Court Reporter: Vernita Allen-Williams, 305-523-5048 / Vernita_Allen-Williams@flsd.uscourts.gov. (dgj)
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING HEARING. A telephonic hearing on Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time, ECF No. #8 , is hereby SET before the undersigned for Monday, March 25, 2024 at 2:00 p.m. The dial-in information is as follows: Telephone number: 866-390-1828; Passcode: 2046890. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Becerra on 3/22/2024. (nsy)
March 21, 2024 Filing 10 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to file Answer and Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction . Motion with Multiple Reliefs Filed as One Relief; ERROR - The Filer selected only one relief event and failed to select the additional corresponding events for each relief requested in the motion. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the instructions in the CM/ECF Attorney User's Manual. AND Filer Selected the Wrong Motion Relief(s); ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. ALSO, Document Not Linked; ERROR - The filed document was not linked to the related docket entry. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
March 21, 2024 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by United States of America. Replies due by 3/28/2024. (Rill, Jeremy) Modified Text on 3/21/2024 (ls).
March 20, 2024 Filing 8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Aniel Saint-Hilaire. Attorney Ayuban Antonio Tomas added to party Aniel Saint-Hilaire(pty:dft). Responses due by 4/3/2024. (Tomas, Ayuban) Modified Relief and to add document link on 3/21/2024 (ls). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction on 3/21/2024 (ls).
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Jacqueline Becerra for all further proceedings. Judge Jose E. Martinez no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 3/5/2024. See attached document for full details. (mno)
March 4, 2024 Filing 6 Amended CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Rill, Jeremy) Modified Text on 3/5/2024 (ls).
March 1, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by United States of America. Aniel Saint-Hilaire served on 2/28/2024, response/answer due 3/20/2024. (Rill, Jeremy)
March 1, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of IRS Revenue Agent Keith Hayes, #2 Exhibit 2 - Harold Lopez 2022 Tax Return, #3 Exhibit 3 - Harold Lopez Memorandum of Interview, #4 Exhibit 4 - Harold Lopez Affidavit, #5 Exhibit 5 - Irfan Bostanci 2021 Tax Return, #6 Exhibit 6 - Irfan Bostanci 2022 Tax Return, #7 Exhibit 7 - Irfan Bostanci Memorandum of Interview, #8 Exhibit 8 - Irfan Bostanci Affidavit, #9 Exhibit 9 - Mavrick Whitmore 2022 Tax Return, #10 Exhibit 10 - Mavrick Whitmore Memorandum of Interview, #11 Exhibit 11 - Mavrick Whitmore Affidavit, #12 Exhibit 12 - Johnnie Gibson 2022 Tax Return, #13 Exhibit 13 - Johnnie Gibson Memorandum of Interview, #14 Exhibit 14 - Johnnie Gibson Affidavit, #15 Exhibit 15 - Arold Guillod 2021 Tax Return, #16 Exhibit 16 - Arold Guillod 2022 Tax Return, #17 Exhibit 17 - Arold Guillod Memorandum of Interview, #18 Exhibit 18 - Fenelus Jeannithe 2021 Tax Return, #19 Exhibit 19 - Fenelus Jeannithe 2022 Tax Return, #20 Exhibit 20 - Fenelus Jeannithe Memorandum of Interview, #21 Exhibit 21 - Jerome Guerrier 2021 Tax Return, #22 Exhibit 22 - Jerome Guerrier 2022 Tax Return, #23 Exhibit 23 - Jerome Guerrier Memorandum of Interview, #24 Exhibit 24 - Jorge Blanco 2021 Tax Return, #25 Exhibit 25 - Jorge Blanco 2022 Tax Return, #26 Exhibit 26 - Jorge Blanco Memorandum of Interview, #27 Exhibit 27 - Luis Bravo 2021 Tax Return, #28 Exhibit 28 - Luis Bravo 2022 Tax Return, #29 Exhibit 29 - Luis Bravo Memorandum of Interview, #30 Exhibit 30 - Juan Mitton 2021 Tax Return, #31 Exhibit 31 - Juan Mitton 2022 Tax Return, #32 Exhibit 32 - Juan Mitton Memorandum of Interview, #33 Exhibit 33 - Sylvian Fieneant 2021 Tax Return, #34 Exhibit 34 - Sylvian Fieneant 2022 Tax Return, #35 Exhibit 35 - Sylvian Fieneant Memorandum of Interview, #36 Exhibit 36 - Maurice Clark 2021 Tax Return, #37 Exhibit 37 - Maurice Clark 2022 Tax Return, #38 Exhibit 38 - Maurice Clark Memorandum of Interview, #39 Exhibit 39 - Shatara Clark 2021 Tax Return, #40 Exhibit 40 -Shatara Clark 2022 Tax Return, #41 Exhibit 41 - Ammson Lafalaise 2021 Tax Return, #42 Exhibit 42 - Ammson Lafalaise 2022 Tax Return, #43 Exhibit 43 - Ammson Lafalaise Memorandum of Interview)(Rill, Jeremy)
February 27, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Aniel Saint-Hilaire. (nan)
February 27, 2024 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nan)
February 27, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Permanent Injunction against Aniel Saint-Hilaire. Filing fees $ 405.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Rill, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Saint-Hilaire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Kirby
Represented By: Jeremy A. Rill
Represented By: Hana Bilicki McQuillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aniel Saint-Hilaire
Represented By: Ayuban Antonio Tomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?